California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:23-cv-10650
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2023
Terminated:Dec 30, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jun 17, 2024 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
George Cardona
Defendant
Yvette Roland
Defendant
Brandon Stallings
Defendant
Cynthia Valenzuela
State Bar of California 845 S. Figueroa Street
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Defendant
Andrew Vasicek
State Bar of California 845 S. Figueroa Street
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Plaintiff
Benjamin Pavone
Represented By
Benjamin Pavone
Pavone And Fonner LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
18 18 misc Response Tue 01/02 3:59 PM
RESPONSE filed by Defendants George Cardona, Yvette Roland, Brandon Stallings, Cynthia Valenzuela, Andrew Vasicekto Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,,15 Defendants' Response to December 22, 2023 Order (Grandt, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 30, 2023
17 17 motion Dismiss (cause or other) Sat 12/30 7:15 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Pavone. (Pavone, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
16 16 notice Deficiency in Summons Tue 12/26 8:55 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request9 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
15 15 order Temporary Restraining Order Fri 12/22 4:18 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H Wu: Attached hereto is the Courts Ruling on Plaintiffs Application2 . The Court DENIES Plaintiffs Application for a TRO. While normally this Court would set a hearing date for the preliminary injunction motion, the question arises as to whether this Court could issue any substantive preliminary injunctive relief in light of its ruling on the Younger abstention issue. Thus, the Court will set a hearing solely on that matter for January 4, 2023, at 8:30 a.m. The parties are to file simultaneous briefs of no more than five pages addressing that subject by January 2, 2024. (jag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
14 14 motion Supplement Thu 12/21 8:38 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement Declaration iso TRO re APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoin Discipline Trial 2 (Second Supplemental Declaration) filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Pavone. (Pavone, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
13 13 10 pgs order Order Thu 12/21 12:38 PM
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Thu 12/21 12:18 PM
Notice of TRO to Defendants Benjamin Pavone. (Pavone, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Amicus Brief (Leave to File) Appeal In Forma Pauperis Amend/Correct Thu 12/21 10:06 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Appeal in forma pauperis , Supplemental NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoin Discipline Trial 2 Supplemental Declaration filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Pavone. (Pavone, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 12/21 10:00 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Pavone, (Pavone, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Summons Request Thu 12/21 9:58 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Pavone. (Pavone, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
8 8 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Wed 12/20 2:35 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Deficiency in Summons Wed 12/20 2:33 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: Please put Central District of California. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Wed 12/20 2:32 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet, 2 Summons are attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 12/20 2:24 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 12/20 2:24 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 12/20 2:23 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 12/20 1:51 PM
APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoin Discipline Trial filed by Plaintiff Benjamin L Pavone. (Pavone, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of TRO,
Att: 2 Declaration w-Exhibits (V1),
Att: 3 Declaration w-Exhibits (V2),
Att: 4 Declaration w-Exhibits (V3),
Att: 5 Declaration w-Exhibits (V4),
Att: 6 Proposed TRO,
Att: 7 Proposed OSC (P/I)
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 12/20 1:44 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-36609371 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Benjamin L Pavone. (Attorney Benjamin Pavone added to party Benjamin L Pavone(pty:pla))(Pavone, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibits,
Att: 4 Exhibits,
Att: 5 Exhibits,
Att: 6 Exhibits