New York Western District Court
Judge:Frank P Geraci, Jr
Case #: 6:23-cv-06727
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jun 17, 2024 4:26 AM EDT
Defendant
Cayuga Health System
Represented By
Daniel J. Moore
Harris Beach LLP
contact info
Daniel J. Palermo
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Schuyler Hospital
Represented By
Daniel J. Moore
Harris Beach LLP
contact info
Daniel J. Palermo
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michele R. Myers
Represented By
James G. Mermigis
The Mermigis Law Group, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
19 19 misc Letter Tue 02/18 9:44 AM
Letter filed by Schuyler Hospital, Cayuga Health System regarding supplemental jurisdiction . (Moore, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
18 18 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 02/04 1:53 PM
DECISION AND ORDER: Defendants' motion to dismiss (ECF No.12 ) is GRANTED with respect to the federal-law claims. By February 18, 2025, the parties may file supplemental letters addressing whether the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's NYSHRL claim. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 2/4/2025. (MFM)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/06 3:48 PM
NOTICE by Schuyler Hospital, Cayuga Health System NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY BUSINESS OR CONTACT INFORMATION (Moore, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 01/02 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel J. Palermo (Palermo, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
15 15 respm Reply/Response Fri 07/19 11:42 AM
REPLY/RESPONSE to re14 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion REPLY Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Cayuga Health System, Schuyler Hospital. (Moore, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
14 14 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 07/08 11:58 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Notice of Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment filed by Michele R. Myers. (Mermigis, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
13 13 order Text Order Fri 06/07 9:57 AM
TEXT ORDER re:12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Cayuga Health System, Schuyler Hospital. Response due by 7/8/24. Reply due by 7/22/24. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 6/7/2024. (MFM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 06/06 3:55 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Notice of Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment by Cayuga Health System, Schuyler Hospital.(Moore, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Rebecca Gould in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss
Monday, April 29, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/29 10:25 AM
TEXT ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise move against Plaintiff's complaint by June 8, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 4/29/2024. (MDS)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/26 2:28 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Cayuga Health System, Schuyler Hospital.(Palermo, Daniel)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/26 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Palermo on behalf of Cayuga Health System, Schuyler Hospital (Palermo, Daniel)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/26 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Moore on behalf of Cayuga Health System, Schuyler Hospital (Moore, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/23 10:56 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele R. Myers. Schuyler Hospital served on 4/17/2023, answer due 5/8/2023. (DMK)
Related: [-]
utility E-Filing Notification Affidavit Of Service Not Summons Returned Tue 04/23 10:57 AM
E-Filing Notification: Please note for future reference that the proper event is summons returned executed. No action required7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint vs. Schuyler Hospital and Cayuga Health served on Reyna Florentno on 04/17/2024, filed by Michele R. Myers. (Mermigis, James) (DMK)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Mon 04/22 11:21 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint vs. Schuyler Hospital and Cayuga Health served on Reyna Florentno on 04/17/2024, filed by Michele R. Myers. (Mermigis, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 04/05 11:59 AM
Summons Issued as to Cayuga Health System, Schuyler Hospital. (DMK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Thursday, April 04, 2024
5 5 service Original Summons Filed Thu 04/04 3:38 PM
Original Summons Filed. (Mermigis, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
utility E-Filing Notification Wrong Event Used Tue 02/20 9:46 AM
E-Filing Notification: Incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use Original Summons Filed event and included Case Number on document. Please refile using correct event with Case Number included on Summons.3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele R. Myers. (Mermigis, James) (DMK)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
4 4 misc Continuation of Exhibits Mon 02/19 4:00 PM
CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Michele R. Myers. Request for Issuance of Summons filed by Michele R. Myers. (Mermigis, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/19 3:57 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele R. Myers. (Mermigis, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
2 2 misc Continuation of Exhibits Thu 12/21 12:57 PM
CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Michele R. Myers. Civil Cover Sheet filed by Michele R. Myers. (Mermigis, James)
Related: [-]
utility E-Filing Notification Thu 12/21 10:34 AM
E-Filing Notification: re1 COMPLAINT - Attorney is directed to file a civil cover sheet, pursuant to Local Rule 3. No judge assignment will be made until filing is entered on the docket. Please utilize the Continuation of Exhibits event, located within the Responses and Replies category. (TMK)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 12/21 3:26 PM
Case Assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
Related: [-]
adr Automatic Referral to Mediation Thu 12/21 3:27 PM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation: the ADR Plan is available for download at[LINK:http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution] .(TMK)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Thu 12/21 3:27 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TMK)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Thu 12/21 3:28 PM
Original Summons Not Submitted. (TMK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/20 4:35 PM
COMPLAINT Michele R. Myers against Cayuga Health System, Schuyler Hospital $ 405 receipt number CNYWDC-5062625, filed by Michele R. Myers.(Mermigis, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Termination,
Att: 2 Exhibit Initial Accommodation Approved,
Att: 3 Exhibit Accommodation Rescinded,
Att: 4 Exhibit Right to Sue Letter,
Att: 5 Exhibit Request for a Religious Accommodation