California Central District Court
Judge:John F Walter
Referred: A Joel Richlin
Case #: 2:23-cv-10662
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jun 17, 2024 1:23 AM PDT
Defendant
Barbie Jean Bostick
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Clifton Walker
Represented By
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T. Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J. Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
19 19 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Tue 07/30 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Clifton Walker. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 07/22 4:00 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing, no later than July 31, 2024, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
17 17 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Mon 05/20 12:24 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Barbie Jean Bostick. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
16 16 motion Clerk to Enter Default Thu 05/16 1:03 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Barbie Jean Bostick filed by plaintiff Clifton Walker. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 05/09 12:42 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing, no later than May 16, 2024, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 04/25 2:49 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Clifton Walker, upon Defendant Barbie Jean Bostick served on 4/17/2024, answer due 5/8/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon BARBIE JEAN BOSTICK, defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 04/10 2:24 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiff shall respond in writing, no later than May 9, 2024, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
12 12 misc Response Mon 04/08 4:20 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Clifton Walkerto Order to Show Cause,,11 re: Lack of Service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 04/03 3:08 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTIONPlaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing, no later than April 8, 2024, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. No oral argument on this matter will be heard unless otherwise ordered by the Court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause will result in the dismissal of this action. (sr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
10 10 misc Declaration Thu 12/28 4:35 PM
DECLARATION of Jason Yoon re: Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff Clifton Walker. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
9 9 22 pgs order Order Tue 12/26 3:12 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. Both the Court and counsel bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in Federal Court. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 12/21 11:55 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Barbie Jean Bostick. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 12/21 11:43 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 12/21 11:42 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 12/21 11:42 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 12/20 3:06 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Clifton Walker. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 12/20 3:05 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 12/20 3:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Clifton Walker. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 12/20 3:04 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36610763 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Clifton Walker(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]