Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Mark H Cohen
Referred: Justin S Anand
Case #: 1:23-cv-05760
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2023
Terminated:May 23, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 11, 2024 4:46 AM EDT
Defendant
ABC Corps 1-10
Defendant
IHeartmedia+Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By
Jacqueline Elise Kalk
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Michelle A Christy
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Marko Joseph Mrkonich
Littler Mendelson, Mn
contact info
Defendant
John/Jane Doe 1-10
Plaintiff
Namon Jones
Represented By
Jason Castle
The Castle Firm, LLC
contact info
John A. Moore
The Moore Law Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 10, 2025
25 25 misc Status Report Mon 03/10 10:51 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT by IHeartmedia+Entertainment, Inc.. (Johnson-Massie, Dionysia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
24 24 1 pgs misc Status Report Tue 12/10 7:15 PM
STATUS REPORT - Joint by IHeartmedia+Entertainment, Inc.. (Johnson-Massie, Dionysia)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/10 7:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Colby J Ellis on behalf of IHeartmedia+Entertainment, Inc. (Ellis, Colby)
Related: [-]
22 22 3 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/10 6:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dionysia L. Johnson-Massie on behalf of IHeartmedia+Entertainment, Inc. (Johnson-Massie, Dionysia)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
21 21 2 pgs respm Response (Non-Motion) Fri 09/20 4:12 PM
RESPONSE re20 Response (Non-Motion) filed by IHeartmedia+Entertainment, Inc.. (Mrkonich, Marko)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
20 20 respm Response (Non-Motion) Fri 09/13 12:43 AM
RESPONSE re19 Status Report filed by Namon Jones. (Castle, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
19 19 misc Status Report Wed 09/11 5:22 PM
STATUS REPORT by IHeartmedia+Entertainment, Inc.. (Mrkonich, Marko)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Wed 08/28 11:41 AM
ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report as to the status of the arbitration within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. The parties are further ORDERED to file a joint status report every ninety (90) days thereafter until the arbitration has been completed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 8/28/24. (ces)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
17 17 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Report and Recommendation Thu 05/23 4:24 PM
ORDER. The Court APPROVES AND ADOPTS the Non-Final Report and Recommendation15 as the Opinion and Order of the Court. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant iHeartMedia + Entertainment, Inc. 's Motion to Dismiss and, if applicable, Compel Arbitration5 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED as to Defendant's request to compel arbitration but DENIED as to Defendant's request to dismiss this action. It is further ORDERED that this action is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pending completion of arbitration pursuant to the terms of the governing Employment Agreement and Arbitration Agreement. The parties are DIRECTED to file joint status reports with the Court as to the status of the arbitration every ninety (90) days after the date of this Order and to notify this Court within thirty (30) days of the completion of the arbitration if there are any remaining issues for the Court's consideration, and to file either an appropriate motion or stipulation as to whether Plaintiffs claims may be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 5/23/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 05/23 4:26 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand terminated from case. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 05/22 1:45 PM
Submission of15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re5 MOTION to Dismiss and, if Applicable, and Compel Arbitration filed by IHeartmedia+Entertainment, Inc. to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Fri 05/03 2:42 PM
ORDER for Service of15 Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 5/3/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Report and Recommendation Fri 05/03 2:42 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that5 Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration5 be GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Defendants request to dismiss this action be DENIED, because the Federal Arbitration Act provides that an action be stayed during the pendency of arbitration proceedings. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Defendants request to compel arbitration be GRANTED, that Plaintiff be ORDERED to submit his claims to arbitration if he elects to pursue arbitration, and that this action be STAYED pending the outcome of the arbitration. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the parties be ORDERED to file joint status reports with the Court as to the status of the arbitration every ninety (90) days after the date of the District Courts final Order on Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the parties be ORDERED to notify the Court within thirty (30) days of the completion of the arbitration proceedings, and to file any appropriate motion or stipulation as to whether Plaintiffs claims may be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 5/3/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/02 10:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER Granting12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason Castle by CRD at the direction of the Clerk's Office. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/2/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lme)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 04/02 2:54 PM
Submission of5 MOTION to Dismiss and, if Applicable, Compel Arbitration to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (lme)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 03/26 10:16 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re:5 MOTION to Dismiss. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a response to the Motion to Dismiss is extended until March 29, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 3/25/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time Mon 03/25 2:30 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File Response re:5 MOTION to Dismiss and, if Applicable, Compel Arbitration by Namon Jones.(Moore, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, March 15, 2024
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Fri 03/15 10:15 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:12 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason Castle Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jason Castle added appearing on behalf of Namon Jones. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Fri 03/15 1:33 PM
Clerk's Notation re6 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
12 12 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/14 11:00 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Jason Castle Pro Hac Vice.by Namon Jones. (Moore, John)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Thu 03/14 2:47 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:10 APPLICATION for Admission of Marko J. Mrkonich Pro Hac Vice(Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13284941).Attorney Marko Joseph Mrkonich added appearing on behalf of IHeartmedia+Entertainment, Inc.. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Thu 03/14 2:52 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:11 APPLICATION for Admission of Michelle A. Christy Pro Hac Vice(Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13285012). Attorney Michelle Christy added appearing on behalf of IHeartmedia+Entertainment, Inc.. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/14 4:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER Granting11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michelle A. Christy by CRD at the direction of the Clerk's Office. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/14/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lme)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/14 4:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER Granting10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice OF Marko J. Mrkonich by CRD at the direction of the Clerk's Office. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/14/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lme)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
11 11 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/13 4:07 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Michelle A. Christy Pro Hac Vice.by IHeartmedia+Entertainment, Inc.. (Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/13 4:03 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Marko J. Mrkonich Pro Hac Vice.by IHeartmedia+Entertainment, Inc.. (Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Wed 03/13 9:11 AM
RETURN of7 APPLICATION for Admission of Marko J. Mrkonich Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13284941) to attorney for correction. Reason for return: 1. Applicant listed incorrect district. 2. Local counsel's address on application must match address on file with the court. Please correct and resubmit. (cpp)
Related: [-]
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Wed 03/13 9:37 AM
RETURN of9 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason Castle Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13285737) to attorney for correction. Reason for return: 1. Applicant must list the specific courts to which they have been admitted. 2. Local counsel listed incorrect GA Bar number. Please correct and resubmit. (cpp)
Related: [-]
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Wed 03/13 10:12 AM
RETURN of8 APPLICATION for Admission of Michelle A. Christy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13285012) to attorney for correction. Reason for return: 1. Applicant listed incorrect division. 1. Local counsel's address on application must match address on file with court. Please correct and resubmit. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
9 9 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/12 4:51 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Jason Castle Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13285737).by Namon Jones. (Moore, John)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/12 3:03 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Michelle A. Christy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13285012).by IHeartmedia+Entertainment, Inc.. (Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/12 2:59 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Marko J. Mrkonich Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13284941).by IHeartmedia+Entertainment, Inc.. (Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/11 4:46 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by IHeartmedia+Entertainment, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent iHeartMedia, Inc. for IHeartmedia+Entertainment, Inc.. (Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
5 5 motion Dismiss Fri 03/08 12:52 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and, if Applicable, Compel Arbitration with Brief In Support by IHeartmedia+Entertainment, Inc..(Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Vicki Moreno,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Marko Mrkonich
Thursday, March 07, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/07 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Elise Kalk on behalf of IHeartmedia+Entertainment, Inc. (Kalk, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
3 3 service Return of Service Executed Fri 02/16 3:47 PM
Return of Service Executed by Namon Jones. Namon Jones served on 2/16/2024, answer due 3/8/2024. (Moore, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 12/20 8:22 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to IHeartmedia+Entertainment, Inc. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/20 8:21 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Namon Jones. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13099445)(jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet