Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Victoria M Calvert
Referred: Christopher C Bly
Case #: 1:23-cv-05881
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jun 17, 2024 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc.
Plaintiff
El-Shaddai Cooper
3055 Highgreen Trial
College Park, GA 30349
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Chipotle Mexican Grill
Terminated: 06/11/2024


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 01/28 1:25 PM
Submission of21 MOTION,19 Motion to Amend,20 MOTION to CompelMOTION to Amend, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (vs)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/17 9:03 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 Motion to Amend Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Bulat, Betsy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
25 25 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 01/14 6:29 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION to CompelMOTION to Amend Defendant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Bulat, Betsy)
Related: [-]
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 01/14 6:25 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION to Preserve Evidence and for Spoliation Sanctions filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Bulat, Betsy)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/03 12:17 PM
ORDER: The docket entry for Doc.19 SHOULD BE MODIFIED to reflect that it is a motion for leave to amend. If Defendant opposes the motion for leave to file an amended complaint, any response should be filed by January 17, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 1/3/2025. (jbu)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/03 12:17 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to El-Shaddai Cooper re23 Order,. (jbu)
Related: [-]
utility Docket Correction Fri 01/03 12:21 PM
Notification of Docket Correction re19 Motion to Amend. Converted Amended Complaint to Motion to Amend Complaint per23 Order. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
22 22 discov Certificate of Service Fri 01/03 8:54 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by El-Shaddai Cooper.(jbu)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 01/03 8:53 AM
MOTION to Preserve Evidence and for Spoliation Sanctions by El-Shaddai Cooper.(jbu)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
20 20 motion Compel Amend Fri 01/03 8:52 AM
MOTION to Compel Clarification and Amend Defendant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by El-Shaddai Cooper.(jbu)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
19 19 motion Amend Fri 01/03 8:48 AM
MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by El-Shaddai Cooper.(jbu) Modified on 1/3/2025 - converted to a motion per23 order (jbu)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Fri 12/06 1:42 PM
Submission of14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (jtj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 12/04 4:21 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc., Chipotle Mexican Grill. (Bulat, Betsy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Tue 12/03 11:56 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Steve C. Jones recused. Case reassigned to Judge Victoria M. Calvert for all further proceedings NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:23-cv-05881-VMC-CCB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/03/2024. (rsg)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 12/03 11:57 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to El-Shaddai Cooper re17 Order of Recusal. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 11/21 3:09 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by El-Shaddai Cooper. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
15 15 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/08 5:50 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc.. (Bulat, Betsy)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 11/08 5:48 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc..(Bulat, Betsy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination
Friday, October 04, 2024
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 10/04 3:12 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc.. (Bulat, Betsy)
Related: [-]
service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 10/04 4:25 PM
Per13 - WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc. waiver mailed on 9/9/2024, answer due 11/8/2024. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/23 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Betsy Bulat on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc. (Bulat, Betsy)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/23 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Maya Simone Marshall on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc. (Marshall, Maya)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
10 10 3 pgs service Request for Waiver of Service Mon 09/09 3:10 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to Chipotle Mexican Grill c/o Corporation Service Company on 9/9/2024. (Complaint, Initial Disclosures Form, Order, and one SASE mailed.) If waiver not returned by 10/15/2024, prepare personal service package. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
9 9 service Proposed Summons Mon 09/09 2:47 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS & USM 285 FORMS filed by El-Shaddai Cooper. (rsg)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Response (Non-Motion) Mon 09/09 2:41 PM
RESPONSE re6 Order, filed by El-Shaddai Cooper. (rsg)
Related: [-]
7 7 discov Initial Disclosures Mon 09/09 2:37 PM
Initial Disclosures by El-Shaddai Cooper. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 08/26 5:19 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to El-Shaddai Cooper re6 Order, Forms Sent. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
6 6 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Directing Service by Clerk ~Util - Directing Service by USM ~Util - Forms Sent ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Fri 08/23 12:02 PM
ORDER Under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d), officers of the court are charged with issuing and effecting service of process. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff the USM 285 form, summons, and the initial disclosures form. Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete the USM 285 form, summons, and the initial disclosures form, and to return to the Clerk of Court one of each for each Defendant named in the complaint within 21 days from the entry date of this Order. Upon receipt of forms, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare a service waiver package for each Defendant. In the event a Defendant does not return the Waiver of Service form to the Clerk of Court within Thirty-five(35) days following the date the service waiver package was mailed, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare and transmit to the U.S. Marshal's Service a service package for each Defendant who failed to return the waiver form. Plaintiff is ORDERED to serve upon each Defendant or counsel for Defendant, via hand-delivery or first-class mail, a copy of every further pleading, motion, or other document that Plaintiff submits to the Clerk of Court. Plaintiff is also ORDERED to keep the Court and Defendant advised of Plaintiff's current address and telephone number at all times during the pendency of this action. See LR 41.2B, 83.1D(3), NDGa. Forms sent to party: USM 285; Summons; Initial Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 8/23/2024. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 06/12 5:05 PM
Submission of4 Amended Complaint (Proposed Summons) to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
5 5 service Proposed Summons Wed 06/12 5:04 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc. (rsg)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 06/12 5:03 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chipotle Mexican Grill Inc.with Jury Demand filed by El-Shaddai Cooper.(rsg)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
3 3 cmp Complaint Fri 05/10 4:05 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by El-Shaddai Cooper.(rsg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 9 pgs order Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 05/10 4:00 PM
ORDER granting1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; however, process will not issue at this time. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to file an amended complaint more clearly setting forth the facts supporting his claims, as discussed above, within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff is advised that failure to amend the complaint will result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed for want of prosecution. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned after 30 days or upon the filing of an amended complaint, whichever is earlier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 5/10/2024. (rsg)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/10 4:02 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to El-Shaddai Cooper re2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 12/20 3:41 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by El-Shaddai Cooper.(jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 12/20 3:42 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (jkb)
Related: [-]