City of Toledo v. 3M Company et al.
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-06798 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Dec 19, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Ohio Northern, 3:23-cv-02282 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 16, 2024 6:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
DuPont de Nemours Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fire Products GP Holding LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls International PLC
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Angus International Safety Group LTD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Central Sprinkler LLC
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Toledo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 17, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Kathleen Borland, City of Eau Claire, City of Scottsdale, City of Coral Springs, City of Plant City, City of South Gate, City of Monroe, City of Ruston, City of Natchitoches, County Of Moore, City of Prescott, Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans, California Water Service Company, City of Shreveport, Connecticut Water Company, South Adams County Water and Sanitation District, City of San Jose California, City of Benwood, City of Lake Charles, City of Burbank, City of Adelanto, City of Plantation, County of San Joaquin, City of Watertown, City of Mansfield, Town of Prescott Valley, City of Loxley, Immokalee Water & Sewer District, Sacramento County, City of Fairborn, Alameda County Water District, City of Lathrop, City of Zephyrhills, City of Pompano Beach, City of Clovis, Howard County Maryland, Pasco County, City of Toledo.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Summy, Scott) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, December 21, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 12/20 2:06 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Ohio Northern (associated as of 12/19/2023), 3:23-cv-02282, City of Toledo v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-06798-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 3:23-cv-02282. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
Order [non-document] granting Defendant Arkema, Inc.'s8 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Heidi Levine. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge James R. Knepp II on 12/6/2023. (B,JL) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/20/2023.] | ||
Thursday, November 30, 2023 | ||
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Unopposed6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answers due 28 days from the date of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's decision on whether to transfer to the Multidistrict Litigation. Judge James R. Knepp II on 11/30/2023.(S,DM) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/20/2023.] | ||
Notice to Attorney Heidi Levine. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/20/2023.] | ||
Notice to Attorney Damon C. Williams. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/20/2023.] | ||
Notice to Attorney Ameena Aluddin. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/20/2023.] | ||
Notice to Attorney Brandon Taylor. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/20/2023.] | ||
Tuesday, November 28, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, November 27, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (K,AR) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/20/2023.] | ||
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (K,AR) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 12/20/2023.] |