California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-02567
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 20, 2023 11:27 PM PST
Defendant
David Rodriguez Segovia (1)
Represented By
Douglas C. Brown
Law Offices Of Douglas C. Brown
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Elizabet F. Brown
Doj-Usao
contact info
Sarah Eve Goldwasser
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info

GPO Jun 11 2024
JUDGMENT as to David Rodriguez Segovia (1), Count(s) 1, 2s, Dismissed on the government's oral motion; Count(s) 1s, Committed to custody of BOP for a term of 13 months and 1 day. 1 year supervised release to follow. Special assessment of $100.00 waived. No fine. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson (sjt)

Docket last updated: 12/21/2023 12:17 AM PST
Saturday, November 25, 2023
Arrest of David Rodriguez Segovia. (no document attached) (dxj) [3:23-mj-04274-KSC]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to David Rodriguez Segovia.(dxj) [3:23-mj-04274-KSC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to David Rodriguez Segovia: Initial Appearance set for 11/27/2023 before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. (no document attached) (fjp) [3:23-mj-04274-KSC]
Related: [-]
3 3 **DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN9 ** NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Elizabet F. Brown appearing for USA. (Brown, Elizabet)Attorney Elizabet F. Brown added to party USA(pty:pla) (stn). Modified on 11/29/2023 (stn). [3:23-mj-04274-KSC]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Initial Appearance as to David Rodriguez Segovia held on 11/27/2023. Appointed Attorney Douglas C. Brown(n/a) for David Rodriguez Segovia. Government oral motion to detain(Flight). ( Detention Hearing - RF set for 11/30/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford.) Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 12/7/23 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Arraignment set for 12/19/23 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford.) (Interpreter Rodolfo Martinez). (CD# 11/27/2023 KSC 23-1:2:09-2:15;2:45-2:46). (Plaintiff Attorney David Kete AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Stephanie Kim FD-S/A). (aje) [3:23-mj-04274-KSC]
Related: [-]
5 5 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to David Rodriguez Segovia (no document attached) (aje) [3:23-mj-04274-KSC]
Related: [-]
6 6 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight)by USA as to David Rodriguez Segovia. (no document attached) (aje) [3:23-mj-04274-KSC]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by David Rodriguez Segovia (cxl) [3:23-mj-04274-KSC]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER as to David Rodriguez Segovia: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 11/27/23. (aje) [3:23-mj-04274-KSC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
9 9 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by USA as to David Rodriguez Segovia (Brown, Elizabet) (stn). [3:23-mj-04274-KSC]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Elizabet F. Brown appearing for USA. (Brown, Elizabet) (stn). [3:23-mj-04274-KSC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
11 11 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 by David Rodriguez Segovia (Brown, Douglas) (rxc). [3:23-mj-04274-KSC]
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s): Preliminary Hearing vacated re11 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 (no document attached) (ecf) [3:23-mj-04274-KSC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Detention Hearing as to David Rodriguez Segovia held on 11/30/2023. USA oral motion for detention; motion granted. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Order of detention to be filed by Court. (Interpreter Daniel Novoa). (CD# 11/30/2023 KSC 1003-1010). (Plaintiff Attorney David Kete AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Doug Brown CJA). (no document attached) (ecf) [3:23-mj-04274-KSC]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER OF DETENTION as to David Rodriguez Segovia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 11/30/2023. (rxc) [3:23-mj-04274-KSC]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
15 15 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Brown, Elizabet) (stn). [3:23-mj-04274-KSC]
Related: [-]
16 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Sarah Eve Goldwasser appearing for USA. co-counsel with Elizabet Brown (Goldwasser, Sarah)Attorney Sarah Eve Goldwasser added to party USA(pty:pla)(stn). [3:23-mj-04274-KSC]
Related: [-]
17 17 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Sarah Eve Goldwasser appearing for USA. (Goldwasser, Sarah) (stn). [3:23-mj-04274-KSC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
18 18 INFORMATION as to David Rodriguez Segovia (1) count(s) 1. (ecf)
Related: [-]
19 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Arraignment on Information as to David Rodriguez Segovia (1) Count 1 held on 12/19/2023. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 1/19/2024 01:30 PM before Judge Todd W. Robinson. (Interpreter Mylene Green). (CD# 12/19/2023 KSC 942-957). (Plaintiff Attorney Allison Rogge AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Douglas Brown CJA). (ecf)
Related: [-]
20 20 MOTION for Discovery by David Rodriguez Segovia. (Brown, Douglas) (cxl1).
Related: [-]