Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 9:23-cr-80219
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Dec 21, 2023 2:35 AM EST
Defendant
Michael Gordon Douglas (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Gregory Schiller
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 10:09 PM EDT
Monday, December 04, 2023
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Michael Gordon Douglas (1). (spe) [9:23-mj-08589-RMM]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Seal by USA as to Michael Gordon Douglas. (spe) [9:23-mj-08589-RMM]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal as to Michael Gordon Douglas (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 12/4/2023. See attached document for full details. (spe) [9:23-mj-08589-RMM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
5 5 MOTION to Unseal Proceedings by USA as to Michael Gordon Douglas. (spe) [9:23-mj-08589-RMM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER granting5 Motion to Unseal Proceedings as to Michael Gordon Douglas (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 12/13/2023. See attached document for full details. (spe) [9:23-mj-08589-RMM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
7 7 INDICTMENT as to Michael Gordon Douglas (1) count(s) 1-7 w/forfeiture. (spe) (spe).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (12/19/2023) Restricted Unredacted Indictment