New Mexico District Court
Case #: 1:23-mj-01779
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Dec 21, 2023 12:40 AM MST
Defendant
Mario Chavez (1)
Represented By
Alicia Mieko LaPado
Business Law Southwest LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sarah Jane Mease
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/21/2023 1:36 AM MST
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
Set Hearings as to Mario Chavez: Initial Appearance - Rule 32.1 set for 12/20/2023 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (eh)
Related: [-]
Arrest (Rule 32.1) of Mario Chavez. (eh)
Related: [-]
1 1 Rule 32.1 Documents (Petition, Warrant and Transfer Out) Received as to Mario Chavez. (eh)
Related: [-]