New York Southern District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Vyskocil
Case #: 1:23-cv-11056
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:206(d) FLSA: Prohibition of Sex Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2023
Terminated:May 02, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 18, 2024 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
David Lackowitz
in his professional capacity Moses & Singer LLP 405 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10174
Represented By
Vernee Ciara Pelage
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson, P.C.( Melville)
contact info
Defendant
Moses & Singer LLP
in his personal capacities Moses & Singer LLP 405 Lexington Ave.
New York, NY 10174
Represented By
Vernee Ciara Pelage
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson, P.C.( Melville)
contact info
Defendant
Paul Roder
in his professional capacity Moses & Singer LLP 405 Lexington Ave
New York, NY 10174
Represented By
Vernee Ciara Pelage
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson, P.C.( Melville)
contact info
Defendant
Dean Swagert
in his professional capacity Moses & Singer LLP 405 Lexington Ave.
New York, NY 10174
Represented By
Vernee Ciara Pelage
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson, P.C.( Melville)
contact info
Defendant
Philippe Zimmerman
in his professional capacity Moses & Singer LLP 405 Lexington Ave
New York, NY 10174
Represented By
Vernee Ciara Pelage
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Lisa Marie Griffith
Littler Mendelson, P.C.( Melville)
contact info
Plaintiff
Megan Daneshrad
individually, and on behalf of similarly situated female employees Seppinni Law 40 Broad St. 7th Fl.
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Shane Seppinni
Seppinni LLP
contact info
Zachary L. Rubin
Seppinni Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Thursday, May 02, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/02 11:38 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court is in receipt of a letter from the plaintiff stating that the parties have reached a settlement in principle [ECF No. 16]. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the parties are unable to memorialize their settlement in writing and as long as the application to restore the action is made by June 2, 2024. If no such application is made by that date, today's dismissal of the action is with prejudice. See Muze, Inc. v. Digital On Demand, Inc., 356 F.3d 492, 494 n.1 (2d Cir. 2004). The Clerk of Court respectfully is directed to terminate the letter motion at ECF No. 16. ( Motions due by 6/2/2024.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 5/2/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
16 16 motion Stay Wed 05/01 3:17 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay Pending Settlement addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Shane Seppinni dated May 1, 2024. Document filed by Megan Daneshrad..(Seppinni, Shane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/30 2:38 PM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re14 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 Amended Complaint,, addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Vernee C. Pelage dated April 25, 2024. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 4/30/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/30 2:39 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: David Lackowitz(in his personal capacities ) answer due 5/17/2024; David Lackowitz(in his professional capacity) answer due 5/17/2024; Moses & Singer LLP answer due 5/17/2024; Paul Roder(in his professional capacity) answer due 5/17/2024; Paul Roder(in his personal capacities ) answer due 5/17/2024; Dean Swagert(in his professional capacity) answer due 5/17/2024; Dean Swagert(in his personal capacities ) answer due 5/17/2024; Philippe Zimmerman(in his professional capacity) answer due 5/17/2024; Philippe Zimmerman(in his personal capacities ) answer due 5/17/2024. (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 04/25 10:39 AM
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 Amended Complaint,, addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Vernee C. Pelage dated April 25, 2024. Document filed by David Lackowitz(in his personal capacities ), David Lackowitz(in his professional capacity), Moses & Singer LLP, Paul Roder(in his professional capacity), Paul Roder(in his personal capacities ), Dean Swagert(in his professional capacity), Dean Swagert(in his personal capacities ), Philippe Zimmerman(in his professional capacity), Philippe Zimmerman(in his personal capacities )..(Pelage, Vernee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/10 4:36 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary L. Rubin on behalf of Megan Daneshrad..(Rubin, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/02 4:15 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Verne C. Pelage dated 3/28/2024. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 4/2/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/02 4:17 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: David Lackowitz(in his personal capacities ) answer due 5/3/2024; David Lackowitz(in his professional capacity) answer due 5/3/2024; Moses & Singer LLP answer due 5/3/2024; Paul Roder(in his professional capacity) answer due 5/3/2024; Paul Roder(in his personal capacities ) answer due 5/3/2024; Dean Swagert(in his professional capacity) answer due 5/3/2024; Dean Swagert(in his personal capacities ) answer due 5/3/2024; Philippe Zimmerman(in his professional capacity) answer due 5/3/2024; Philippe Zimmerman(in his personal capacities ) answer due 5/3/2024. (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 03/28 1:00 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Verne C. Pelage dated 3/28/2024. Document filed by David Lackowitz(in his personal capacities ), David Lackowitz(in his professional capacity), Moses & Singer LLP, Paul Roder(in his professional capacity), Paul Roder(in his personal capacities ), Dean Swagert(in his professional capacity), Dean Swagert(in his personal capacities ), Philippe Zimmerman(in his professional capacity), Philippe Zimmerman(in his personal capacities )..(Pelage, Vernee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/20 10:58 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against David Lackowitz(in his personal capacities ), David Lackowitz(in his professional capacity), Moses & Singer LLP, Paul Roder(in his professional capacity), Paul Roder(in his personal capacities ), Dean Swagert(in his professional capacity), Dean Swagert(in his personal capacities ), Philippe Zimmerman(in his professional capacity), Philippe Zimmerman(in his personal capacities ) with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Megan Daneshrad. Related document:1 Complaint..(Seppinni, Shane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Lori Anne Douglass, Esq.
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Conference Wed 03/06 11:01 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER terminating4 Letter Motion for Conference re:4 LETTER MOTION for Conference re:1 Complaint (Pre-Motion Letter) addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Lisa M. Griffith dated 2/26/2024. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file any amended complaint by March 20, 2024. This is Plaintiff's last opportunity to amend her pleading in response to any argument raised in the pre-motion letters, and failure to file an amended complaint by March 20, 2024 will be considered a waiver of this opportunity. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to any amended complaint within 14 days of its filing. If Defendants respond with a motion to dismiss, further briefing of that motion shall take place on the schedule set forth in Local Civil Rule 6.1(b). If Plaintiff elects not to file an amended complaint by March 20, 2024, Defendants shall file their contemplated motion by March 25, 204. Further briefing shall take place on the schedule set forth in Local Civil Rule 6.1(b) Any request for an extension or adjournment shall be made by letter filed on ECF at least 48 hours before the deadline. The Clerk of Court respectfully is directed to terminate the letter motion at ECF No. 4. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/6/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 03/06 11:06 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2024. Motions due by 3/25/2024. (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
8 8 respm Response to Motion Tue 03/05 5:00 PM
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Shane D. Seppinni dated March 5, 2024 re:4 LETTER MOTION for Conference re:1 Complaint (Pre-Motion Letter) addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Lisa M. Griffith dated 2/26/2024. Response to Defendants' Letter Response at ECF 7 dated 3/5/2024 . Document filed by Megan Daneshrad..(Seppinni, Shane)
Related: [-]
7 7 respm Response in Support of Motion Tue 03/05 9:36 AM
LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from LIsa M. Griffith dated 3/5/2024 re:4 LETTER MOTION for Conference re:1 Complaint (Pre-Motion Letter) addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Lisa M. Griffith dated 2/26/2024. Response to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Letter Motion . Document filed by David Lackowitz(in his personal capacities ), David Lackowitz(in his professional capacity), Moses & Singer LLP, Paul Roder(in his professional capacity), Paul Roder(in his personal capacities ), Dean Swagert(in his professional capacity), Dean Swagert(in his personal capacities ), Philippe Zimmerman(in his professional capacity), Philippe Zimmerman(in his personal capacities )..(Griffith, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/01 1:06 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vernee Ciara Pelage on behalf of David Lackowitz(in his personal capacities ), David Lackowitz(in his professional capacity), Moses & Singer LLP, Paul Roder(in his professional capacity), Paul Roder(in his personal capacities ), Dean Swagert(in his professional capacity), Dean Swagert(in his personal capacities ), Philippe Zimmerman(in his professional capacity), Philippe Zimmerman(in his personal capacities )..(Pelage, Vernee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
5 5 respm Response to Motion Thu 02/29 6:24 PM
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Shane Seppinni dated February 29, 2024 re:4 LETTER MOTION for Conference re:1 Complaint (Pre-Motion Letter) addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Lisa M. Griffith dated 2/26/2024. . Document filed by Megan Daneshrad..(Seppinni, Shane)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
4 4 motion Conference Mon 02/26 5:17 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference re:1 Complaint (Pre-Motion Letter) addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Lisa M. Griffith dated 2/26/2024. Document filed by David Lackowitz(in his personal capacities ), David Lackowitz(in his professional capacity), Moses & Singer LLP, Paul Roder(in his professional capacity), Paul Roder(in his personal capacities ), Dean Swagert(in his professional capacity), Dean Swagert(in his personal capacities ), Philippe Zimmerman(in his professional capacity), Philippe Zimmerman(in his personal capacities )..(Griffith, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/08 11:52 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. David Lackowitz(in his personal capacities ) waiver sent on 12/28/2023, answer due 2/26/2024; David Lackowitz(in his professional capacity) waiver sent on 12/28/2023, answer due 2/26/2024; Moses & Singer LLP waiver sent on 12/28/2023, answer due 2/26/2024; Paul Roder(in his professional capacity) waiver sent on 12/28/2023, answer due 2/26/2024; Paul Roder(in his personal capacities ) waiver sent on 12/28/2023, answer due 2/26/2024; Dean Swagert(in his professional capacity) waiver sent on 12/28/2023, answer due 2/26/2024; Dean Swagert(in his personal capacities ) waiver sent on 12/28/2023, answer due 2/26/2024; Philippe Zimmerman(in his professional capacity) waiver sent on 12/28/2023, answer due 2/26/2024; Philippe Zimmerman(in his personal capacities ) waiver sent on 12/28/2023, answer due 2/26/2024. Document filed by Megan Daneshrad..(Seppinni, Shane)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Mon 01/08 11:46 AM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Philippe Zimmerman, Dean Swagert, Paul Roder, David Lackowitz added. Party added pursuant to1 Complaint.Document filed by Megan Daneshrad. Related document:1 Complaint..(Seppinni, Shane)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 12/22 1:30 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Shane Seppinni. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: David Lackowitz, Moses & Singer LLP, Paul Roder, Dean Swagert, Philippe Zimmerman, Megan Daneshrad. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Fri 12/22 1:31 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Shane Seppinni re: Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF in their professional capacities. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 12/22 1:35 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Shane Seppinni. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code Blank. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:206(d) FLSA: Prohibition of Sex Discrimination. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 12/22 1:37 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 12/22 1:37 PM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 12/22 1:37 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 12/21 10:49 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Seppinni, Shane)
Related: [-]
1 1 39 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/21 7:43 AM
COMPLAINT against David Lackowitz, Moses & Singer LLP, Paul Roder, Dean Swagert, Philippe Zimmerman. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28723652)Document filed by Megan Daneshrad..(Seppinni, Shane)
Related: [-]