California Southern District Court
Judge:Ruth Bermudez Montenegro
Referred: Michelle M Pettit
Case #: 3:23-cv-02321
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2023
Terminated:Feb 21, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 18, 2024 1:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Gregory Ahern
Defendant
Tiffani Alvidrez
Defendant
Anthony Gurriso-Enbrecht
Defendant
Keetha Mills
Defendant
Alexandra Rosouli
Defendant
California State Lottery Commission
Plaintiff
Michael Harmon McLemore
299 17th St.
San Diego, CA 92101


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, March 10, 2025
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/11 11:17 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Harmon McLemore. (jpp)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
4 4 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 02/24 9:03 AM
ORDER (1) granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (2) Dismissing Case. Signed by District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 2/21/2025. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/23 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Proposed Notice, consent, and reference of a civil action to a Magistrate Judge by Michael Harmon McLemore. (Document only signed by Plaintiff, Motion for IFP filed 12/20/2023). (jpp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 12/21 10:02 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Harmon McLemore. (ggv) (anh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/21 10:01 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Gregory Ahern, Tiffani Alvidrez, California State Lottey Commission, Anthony Gurriso-Enbrecht, Keetha Mills, Alexandra Rosouli, IFP Filed, filed by Michael Harmon McLemore. The new case number is 3:23-cv-2321-RBM-MMP. Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro and Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit are assigned to the case. (Michael Harmon McLemore)(ggv) (anh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet