Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Cecilia M Altonaga
Referred: John J O'Sullivan
Case #: 0:14-cv-62570
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2014
Terminated:Feb 19, 2015
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2015 11:10 PM EDT
Defendant
U.S. Legal Support, Inc.
Represented By
Alexander D. Del Russo
Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A.
contact info
Allison Oasis Kahn
Carlton Fields Jorden Burt P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Gayle Hardison
Represented By
Alexander D. Del Russo
Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A.
contact info
Allison Oasis Kahn
Carlton Fields Jorden Burt P.A.
contact info
Mediator
Dana Gallup
Plaintiff
John Graeler
Represented By
Matthew S. Sarelson
Matthew Seth Sarelson, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, February 23, 2015
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/23 11:38 AM
NOTICE by Gayle Hardison, U.S. Legal Support, Inc. of Filing Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice (Kahn, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice
Thursday, February 19, 2015
25 25 order Administrative Order Thu 02/19 7:59 PM
Administrative Order Closing Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/19/2015. (ps1)
Related: [-]
24 24 adr Mediation Report Thu 02/19 10:05 AM
FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Dana M. Gallup. Disposition: Settled in full.(Gallup, Dana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 12, 2015
23 23 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 02/12 4:08 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Gayle Hardison. (Kahn, Allison)
Related: [-]
22 22 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 02/12 4:06 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by U.S. Legal Support, Inc.. (Kahn, Allison)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 11, 2015
21 21 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 02/11 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allison Oasis Kahn on behalf of Gayle Hardison. Attorney Allison Oasis Kahn added to party Gayle Hardison(pty:dft). (Kahn, Allison)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 02/11 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander D. Del Russo on behalf of Gayle Hardison. Attorney Alexander D. Del Russo added to party Gayle Hardison(pty:dft). (Del Russo, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 06, 2015
19 19 order Order ~Util - Set Answer Due Deadline Fri 02/06 1:23 PM
ORDER re16 Amended Complaint filed by John Graeler; U.S. Legal Support, Inc. shall file a response by 2/12/2015. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/6/2015. (ps1)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 02, 2015
18 18 notice Notice of Compliance Mon 02/02 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Compliance proof of service on Defendant Gayle Hardison by John Graeler re15 Order on Motion for Leave to File,17 Order to Show Cause (Sarelson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order to Show Cause Mon 02/02 9:50 AM
ORDER requiring Plaintiff to comply with the Court's15 Order to file proof of service by 2/6/2015. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/2/2015. (ps1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 15, 2015
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 01/15 7:04 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by John Graeler.(Sarelson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 14, 2015
15 15 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 01/14 5:09 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, and as ordered by the Judge by 1/16/15. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/14/2015. (ps1)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Leave to File Document Wed 01/14 3:54 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by John Graeler.(Sarelson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint
Thursday, December 11, 2014
13 13 order Order Scheduling Mediation Thu 12/11 3:06 PM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Dana Gallup; Mediation Hearing set for 6/22/2015 10:00 AM; Mediation report due by close of business on 6/22/2015. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/11/2014. (ps1)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Thu 12/11 12:15 PM
NOTICE by U.S. Legal Support, Inc. of Filing Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation (Kahn, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 03, 2014
11 11 misc Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/03 1:55 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Graeler identifying Other Affiliate Conrad & Scherer, LLP, Other Affiliate Gayle Hardison for John Graeler (Sarelson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 19, 2014
10 10 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Judge Wed 11/19 12:08 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 10/5/2015 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 9/29/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Amended Pleadings due by 1/14/2015., Discovery due by 6/8/2015., Expert Discovery due by 6/8/2015., Joinder of Parties due by 1/14/2015., Mediation Deadline 6/22/2015., In Limine Motions due by 7/28/2015., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/28/2015), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 6/22/2015), and ORDER REFERRING Certain Matters to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/19/2014. (ar2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 18, 2014
9 9 misc Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/18 4:54 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Legal Support, Inc. (Kahn, Allison)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Tue 11/18 4:50 PM
SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by U.S. Legal Support, Inc.(Kahn, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Joint Proposed Scheduling Order
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/18 4:46 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allison Oasis Kahn on behalf of U.S. Legal Support, Inc.. Attorney Allison Oasis Kahn added to party U.S. Legal Support, Inc.(pty:dft). (Kahn, Allison)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 13, 2014
6 6 STATUS REPORT Defendant's Removal Status Report by U.S. Legal Support, Inc. (Del Russo, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 12, 2014
5 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 12/3/2014. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/12/2014. (ps1)
Related: [-]
4 4 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases; Removal Status Report due by 11/26/2014. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/12/2014. (ps1)
Related: [-]
3 3 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by U.S. Legal Support, Inc.. (Del Russo, Alexander)
Related: [-]
2 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (ar2)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT) Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-7229967, filed by U.S. Legal Support, Inc..(Del Russo, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-State Court Docket Sheet and Pleadings