Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Henry Edward Autrey
Case #: 4:23-cv-01705
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2023
Terminated:Mar 10, 2025
Defendant
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
Interested Party
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
Plaintiff
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable

GPO Mar 10 2025
OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is remanded to the Social Security Administration for the ALJ to either include the unchanging instructions limitation in the RFC or explain why she did not do so. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is reversed and remanded for further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/10/2025. (HMA)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
18 18 order A Docket Text Order Tue 04/22 1:48 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:15 MOTION to Seal Case Court Order by Plaintiff Laura Elizabeth Harris.(Young, Kelsey) ; DENIED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/22/2025. (CLH)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/21 4:21 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION to Seal Case Court Order filed by Plaintiff Laura Elizabeth Harris. (Young, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/21 8:27 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Seal Case Court Order filed by Defendant Leland Dudek. (Blank, Shane)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 19, 2025
15 15 motion Seal Case Sat 04/19 12:19 PM
MOTION to Seal Case Court Order by Plaintiff Laura Elizabeth Harris.(Young, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Suggestions in Support of Motion to Seal Court Order
Monday, March 10, 2025
14 14 order Judgment - (Case) Tue 03/11 7:42 AM
JUDGMENT. In accordance with the Opinion, Memorandum and Order dated this same date, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), the decision of the Commissioner is reversed.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this matter is remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/10/2025. (HMA)
Related: [-]
13 13 9 pgs order Memorandum & Order Tue 03/11 7:40 AM
OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is remanded to the Social Security Administration for the ALJ to either include the unchanging instructions limitation in the RFC or explain why she did not do so. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is reversed and remanded for further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/10/2025. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
12 12 motion Social Security Reply Brief Wed 05/15 5:00 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY REPLY BRIEF by Plaintiff Laura Elizabeth Harris. (Young, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
11 11 motion Social Security Cross Brief (govt only) Wed 05/01 9:05 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY CROSS BRIEF re8 SOCIAL SECURITY BRIEF by Defendant Martin O'Malley. (Blank, Shane)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Fri 04/19 10:50 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Extension to file the following: Brief in Support of the Commissioner's Decision; ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING MAY 6, 2024. (Social Security Cross Brief due by 5/6/2024.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/19/2024. (JEB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 04/18 11:00 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Brief in Support of the Commissioner's Decision ;Proposed extension date May 6, 2024 by Defendant Martin O'Malley. (Blank, Shane)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
8 8 motion Social Security Brief Fri 03/22 7:36 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY BRIEF by Plaintiff Laura Elizabeth Harris. (Young, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
6 6 notice Certified Social Security Transcript Notice of Filing Wed 02/21 11:13 AM
CERTIFIED Social Security Transcript Notice of Filing by Defendant Martin O'Malley(Blank, Shane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transcript 1,
Att: 2 Transcript 2,
Att: 3 Transcript 3,
Att: 4 Transcript 4,
Att: 5 Transcript 5,
Att: 6 Transcript 6,
Att: 7 Transcript 7,
Att: 8 Transcript 8,
Att: 9 Transcript 9,
Att: 10 Transcript 10,
Att: 11 Transcript 11
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Administrative Record Wed 02/21 12:18 PM
Docket Text ORDER re:5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Administrative Record. Additional time is GRANTED up to and including March 21, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 2/21/2024. (CLH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Administrative Record Tue 02/20 9:34 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Administrative Record; proposed extension date March 21, 2024 by Defendant Martin O'Malley. (Blank, Shane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
4 4 misc Entry of Appearance Wed 12/27 11:53 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Shane Kyle Blank for Defendant Martin O'Malley. (Blank, Shane)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
3 3 order Case Management Order Fri 12/22 11:30 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/22/2023. (KXS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
2 2 misc Social Security Identification Form Thu 12/21 1:09 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY IDENTIFICATION FORM as to Plaintiff Laura Elizabeth Harris. (Young, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Social Security) Thu 12/21 1:09 PM
Social Security COMPLAINT with receipt number AMOEDC-10341078, in the amount of $405 Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - No,, filed by Laura Elizabeth Harris.(Young, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Original Filing Form
misc Case Opening Notification Thu 12/21 3:27 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry Edward Autrey. Administrative Transcript Due 2/20/2024 (JBH)
Related: [-]