Colorado District Court
Judge:S Kato Crews
Case #: 1:23-cv-03370
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2023
Terminated:Nov 08, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 18, 2024 2:17 AM MDT
Defendant
Archdiocese of Denver
Represented By
Susan S. Sperber
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
Defendant
Archdiocese of Denver Mortuary
Represented By
Susan S. Sperber
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
Defendant
Catholic Funeral and Cemetery Services
Represented By
Susan S. Sperber
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michaelia J. Maxey
2275 Court Place #117
Denver, CO 80205
Represented By
Deborah Yim
Primera Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, November 08, 2024
28 28 utility Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings - PUBLIC Fri 11/08 4:17 PM
Utility Setting Deadlines/Hearings: pursuant to 24 Order Text Only Entry Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/4/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2024 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Judge S. Kato Crews. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
27 27 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Fri 11/08 8:43 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to 26 Minute Order. Text Only Entry. (jrobe, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
26 26 order Minute Order Thu 11/07 1:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER re:25 Stipulation of Dismissal of Case filed by Catholic Funeral and Cemetery Services, Archdiocese of Denver Mortuary, Archdiocese of Denver. The parties have filed a stipulation of dismissal pursuant Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), which is self-effectuating and requires no further action on the part of the Court. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. SO ORDERED by Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/7/2024. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal of Case Thu 11/07 1:43 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case With Prejudice (Joint) by Defendants Catholic Funeral and Cemetery Services, Archdiocese of Denver, Archdiocese of Denver Mortuary.(Sperber, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
24 24 order Order Tue 11/05 10:27 AM
ORDER Setting Final Pretrial Conference . The deadline to file dispositive motions was set for 11/4/2024 and none have been filed. Therefore, a Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/11/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before U.S. District Judge S. Kato Crews. By 12/4/2024, the parties shall file a proposed final pretrial order and email a WORD version to crews_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov . Parties shall refer to this Court's Standing Order for Civil Cases when preparing the proposed final pretrial order. Parties should be prepared to set a trial date within one to two months out from this conference. Lead counsel who will try the case must be in attendance. SO ORDERED by Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/5/2024. Text Only Entry (skcja, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
23 23 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/03 11:44 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 4/2/2024. Discovery due by 10/4/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 11/4/2024. (trvo, )
Related: [-]
22 22 minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 04/03 11:43 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 4/2/2024. FTR: C205. (trvo, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
21 21 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 03/26 3:22 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants Archdiocese of Denver, Archdiocese of Denver Mortuary, Catholic Funeral and Cemetery Services. (Sperber, Susan)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 03/26 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Attorney Deborah Yim by Deborah Yim on behalf of Michaelia J. MaxeyAttorney Deborah Yim added to party Michaelia J. Maxey(pty:pla) (Yim, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/18 10:59 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service via USPS by Clerk of Court re 18 Advisement to Pro Se Litigants of Available Resources to Michaelia J. Maxey, 2275 Court Place, #117, Denver, CO 80205. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order Mon 03/18 10:57 AM
ADVISEMENT TO PRO SE LITIGANTS OF AVAILABLE RESOURCES: Since Plaintiff is not represented by counsel the Court would like to make Plaintiff aware of a couple of resources available to people representing themselves in the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado. The first is the Federal Pro Se Clinic which provides free legal assistance to people representing themselves in the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado. The Clinic helps to prepare responsive pleadings, assist with other common pleadings, answers procedural questions, and explains legal concepts such as jurisdiction, venue, and service of process. Plaintiff may contact the Clinic by phone (303-824-5395) or online at www.cobar.org/cofederalproseclinic. The second is the Federal Limited Appearance Program (FLAP) . FLAP aims to address the difficulty pro se parties in civil litigation sometimes face when appearing in court for certain non-dispositive hearings or conferences--such as scheduling conferences, status conferences, discovery hearings, and settlement conferences--by providing those litigants with a volunteer attorney who appears with them in court. Information about FLAP may be found online at www.cobar.org/For-Members/Young-Lawyers-Division/YLD-Application. By U.S. District Judge S. Kato Crews on 3/18/2024. Text Only Entry (skcja, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Fri 03/15 12:17 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service via USPS by Clerk of Court re 16 Order Referring Case to Michaelia J. Maxey, 2275 Court Place, #117, Denver, CO 80205. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 03/15 12:00 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose for all motions. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the parties by motion, this Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at their discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Standing Order and Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By U.S. District Judge S. Kato Crews on 3/15/2024. Text Only Entry (skcja, )
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Letter Reassigning Case Fri 03/15 10:24 AM
CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to U.S. District Judge S. Kato Crews Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-03370-SKC. (Text Only Entry) (sphil, )
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Fri 03/15 8:36 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Archdiocese of Denver, Archdiocese of Denver Mortuary, Catholic Funeral and Cemetery Services All parties do not consent.. (Sperber, Susan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/20 4:03 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Archdiocese of Denver, Archdiocese of Denver Mortuary, Catholic Funeral and Cemetery Services.(Sperber, Susan)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 02/20 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Susan S. Sperber on behalf of Archdiocese of Denver, Archdiocese of Denver Mortuary, Catholic Funeral and Cemetery ServicesAttorney Susan S. Sperber added to party Archdiocese of Denver(pty:dft), Attorney Susan S. Sperber added to party Archdiocese of Denver Mortuary(pty:dft), Attorney Susan S. Sperber added to party Catholic Funeral and Cemetery Services(pty:dft) (Sperber, Susan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Thu 02/08 3:22 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re9 Order to Michaelia J. Maxey at 2275 Court Place #117 Denver, CO 80205. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
Related: [-]
9 9 3 pgs order Order Thu 02/08 3:21 PM
ORDER SETTING CONSENT DEADLINE AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 2/8/2024. Consent Form due by 3/19/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/26/2024. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/2/2024, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. The parties shall attend by calling 571-353-2301, Guest meeting ID- 868150043. All attendees shall please mute their phone when not speaking and not use speaker phone. (trvo, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
11 11 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Thu 02/08 4:07 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Michaelia J. Maxey. One party consents. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
8 8 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Tue 02/06 6:32 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michaelia J. Maxey. Archdiocese of Denver served on 1/30/2024, answer due 2/20/2024; Archdiocese of Denver Mortuary served on 1/30/2024, answer due 2/20/2024; Catholic Funeral and Cemetery Services served on 1/30/2024, answer due 2/20/2024.(sphil, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Return of Service,
Att: 2 Return of Service
Friday, January 05, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/05 2:16 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re1 Employment Discrimination Complaint for Service of Proces. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USMS Service Forms
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
6 6 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Tue 01/02 11:21 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 01/02 11:19 AM
ORDER DRAWING CASE by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 1/2/2024.. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 12/27 1:40 PM
ORDER Granting2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 12/26/2023.(sphil, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
3 3 misc Case Assigned to Judge Thu 12/21 2:10 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 12/21 2:06 PM
Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), by Plaintiff Michaelia J. Maxey. (blaws)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/21 2:05 PM
EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION COMPLAINT against Archdiocese of Denver, Archdiocese of Denver Mortuary, Catholic Funeral and Cemetery Services, filed by Michaelia J. Maxey. (blaws)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Continuation of Main Document,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 EEOC Form 5,
Att: 5 EEOC Form 161