District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Amit P Mehta
Case #: 1:23-cv-03793
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2023
Terminated:Mar 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 18, 2024 4:18 AM EDT
Defendant
MERRICK B. GARLAND
Represented By
Sian Jones
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
UR M. JADDOU
Washington, DC 20529
Represented By
Sian Jones
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS
Represented By
Sian Jones
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
NASIR L. KAMBO
Represented By
Sadaf F. Ahmed
Jeelani Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Brian Jacob Kholodovsky
Birg Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 14, 2024
10 10 misc Case Transferred Out Thu 03/14 10:13 AM
Case transferred to the USDC for the District of New Jersey pursuant to9 Order on Motion to Transfer Case; Sent to Court via extraction. (mg)
Related: [-]
misc Receipt and Acknowledgment of Transfer Papers Mon 03/18 7:50 AM
Receipt on 3/14/2024 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 2:24-cv-02896 sent by USDC for the District of New Jersey. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Transfer Case Mon 03/04 5:42 PM
ORDER granting Defendants'8 Consent Motion to Transfer and Extend. The Clerk of the Court shall transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/4/24. (lcapm2)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Transfer Case Mon 03/04 3:21 PM
Consent MOTION to Transfer Case by MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS.(Jones, Sian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/04 3:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sian Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Sian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Wed 02/28 7:58 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR M. JADDOU served on 1/12/2024; ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS served on 1/12/2024 (Ahmed, Sadaf)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Wed 02/28 7:55 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/12/2024. (Ahmed, Sadaf)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Wed 02/28 7:52 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/3/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/3/2024. (Ahmed, Sadaf)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 11, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Sun 02/11 5:55 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sadaf F. Ahmed on behalf of NASIR L. KAMBO Substituting for attorney Brian J. Kholodovsky (Ahmed, Sadaf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Thu 12/21 4:37 PM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zrtw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/21 3:48 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10577000) filed by NASIR L KAMBO.(Kholodovsky, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 12/21 4:19 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zrtw)
Related: [-]