Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Harry D Leinenweber
Case #: 1:14-cv-09061
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2014
Terminated:Jun 18, 2015
Last checked: Thursday May 14, 2015 11:26 AM CDT
Defendant
The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Represented By
Lingzhi Zhao
Zhao & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Michael J. Robins
Robins & Associates LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Luxottica USA LLC
Represented By
Jessica Lea Bloodgood
Greer Burns & Crain, Ltd.
contact info
Amy Crout Ziegler
Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.
contact info
Kevin W. Guynn
Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.
contact info
Paul G. Juettner
Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.
contact info
Justin R. Gaudio
Greer Burns & Crain Ltd
contact info

GPO Jun 18 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/18/2015:Mailed notice(wp, )

Docket last updated: 01/24/2025 8:32 PM CST
Wednesday, November 12, 2014
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Daniel Martin. (lcw, )
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by Luxottica USA LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-10051117.(Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Schedule A
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Luxottica USA LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Luxottica USA LLC by Jessica Lea Bloodgood (Bloodgood, Jessica)
Related: [-]
5 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Luxottica USA LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
Related: [-]
6 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Luxottica USA LLC by Kevin W. Guynn (Guynn, Kevin)
Related: [-]