Colorado District Court
Judge:Charlotte N Sweeney
Referred: Michael E Hegarty
Case #: 1:23-cv-03379
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2023
Terminated:Dec 05, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 18, 2024 2:22 AM MDT
Consol Plaintiff
Azucena Juarez Espino
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Brenda Escalera Zamudio
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Adan Flores Velazquez
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Hilario Andazola Saena
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Genovevo Marquez Ruiz
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Petra Gonzalez Reta
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Carlos Monterroza Pena
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Ruben Ordonez
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Sergio Morales Lopez
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Andres Yah Kantun
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Karina Hall
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Fabian Gonzalez Gutierrez
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Mayra Vazquez Gonzalez
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Edgar Gaytan George
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Norma Apodaca Duran
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Hilario De La Cruz Garcia
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Victor Varguez Ceballos
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Silvestre Gallegos Barrios
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Marcelo Hermosillo Armenta
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Alexis Duarte Aragonez
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Erika Marturin Almeida
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
USA
Represented By
Julia M. Prochazka
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
Julia M. Prochazka
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Robert Mather
Represented By
Julia M. Prochazka
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Lorenza Jimenez Sanchez
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Consol Plaintiff
Fanny Vazquez Michel
Terminated: 06/14/2024
Represented By
Shawn David Meade
Myrights Immigration Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, December 05, 2024
48 48 order Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 12/05 3:58 PM
MINUTE ORDER : Pursuant to the Restricted Document at ECF No.47 this case and all member cases are dismissed. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 12/5/24. Text Only Entry (jdyne)
Related: [-]
47 47 misc Stipulation of Dismissal of Case Thu 12/05 1:40 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Defendants USA, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Robert Mather. (Prochazka, Julia)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
46 46 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Party Mon 10/21 1:34 PM
ORDER granting45 Joint Motion to Dismiss Party and Replace Lead Plaintiff. The Court orders that Plaintiff Lorenza Jimenez Sanchez be dismissed as her claims are now moot. The Court directs that the Clerk of Court remove Plaintiff Lorenza Jimenez Sanchez as lead Plaintiff and replace her name with Plaintiff Hilario Andazola Saenz as the new lead Plaintiff in this case. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 10/21/2024. Text Only Entry(cnsja, )
Related: [-]
45 45 motion Dismiss Party Mon 10/21 10:55 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party and Replace Lead Plaintiff by Defendants Robert Mather, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, USA. (Prochazka, Julia)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
44 44 order Minute Order Fri 09/06 10:11 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to43 Notice re: voluntary dismissal of consolidated case 23-cv-03383-CNS, plaintiff Adan Flores Velazquez is DISMISSED. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 9/6/24. Text Only Entry (jdyne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
43 43 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/04 8:55 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Related Case by Defendants Robert Mather, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, USA (Prochazka, Julia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
42 42 notice Notice of Supplemental Authorities Thu 07/11 9:43 AM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities re:27 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Robert Mather, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, USA (Prochazka, Julia)
Related: [-]
41 41 notice Notice of Supplemental Authorities Thu 07/11 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities Amended re:31 Notice of Supplemental Authorities by Defendants Robert Mather, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, USA (Prochazka, Julia)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
40 40 utility Terminate Party - PUBLIC Fri 06/14 10:35 AM
Party Fanny Vazquez Michel terminated pursuant to the39 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Related Case filed in this case on 6/13/2024. Text Only Entry. (ccuen, ) Modified to edit docket text on 6/14/2024 (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
39 39 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/13 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Related Case by Defendants Robert Mather, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, USA (Prochazka, Julia)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
38 38 notice Notice of Supplemental Authorities Mon 06/10 10:37 AM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities re:27 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Robert Mather, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, USA (Prochazka, Julia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
37 37 misc Restricted Doc. - Level 1 - Viewable by Case Participants & Court Tue 04/30 4:46 PM
RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1 - Plaintiffs' Surreply to Defendants27 Motion to Dismiss: by Consol Plaintiffs Erika Marturin Almeida, Alexis Duarte Aragonez, Marcelo Hermosillo Armenta, Silvestre Gallegos Barrios, Victor Varguez Ceballos, Hilario De La Cruz Garcia, Norma Apodaca Duran, Azucena Juarez Espino, Edgar Gaytan George, Mayra Vazquez Gonzalez, Fabian Gonzalez Gutierrez, Karina Hall, Andres Yah Kantun, Sergio Morales Lopez, Fanny Vazquez Michel, Ruben Ordonez, Carlos Monterroza Pena, Petra Gonzalez Reta, Genovevo Marquez Ruiz, Hilario Andazola Saena, Adan Flores Velazquez, Brenda Escalera Zamudio, Plaintiff Lorenza Jimenez Sanchez. (filed under level 1 Restriction pursuant to 36 Order 0 (angar, )
Related: [-]
36 36 order Order on Motion for Leave Tue 04/30 3:51 PM
ORDER granting34 First Motion for Leave to File a Surreply. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to file the surreply located at ECF No. 34-1. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 4/30/2024. Text Only Entry(cnsja, )
Related: [-]
35 35 order Order on Motion to Strike Tue 04/30 3:45 PM
ORDER granting33 Unopposed Motion to Strike32 Notice of Supplemental Authorities. ECF No.32 is STRICKEN. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 4/30/2024. Text Only Entry(cnsja, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
34 34 motion Leave Fri 04/26 2:38 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiff Lorenza Jimenez Sanchez.(Meade, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Document
Thursday, April 25, 2024
33 33 motion Strike Thu 04/25 4:51 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Strike32 Notice of Supplemental Authorities by Defendants Robert Mather, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, USA. (Prochazka, Julia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Supplemental Authorities Thu 04/18 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities by Plaintiff Lorenza Jimenez Sanchez (Meade, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Supplemental Authorities Tue 04/16 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities re:27 MOTION to Dismiss ,30 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendants Robert Mather, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, USA (Prochazka, Julia)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
30 30 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/08 5:08 PM
REPLY to Response to27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Robert Mather, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, USA. (Prochazka, Julia)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
29 29 respm Response to Motion Mon 03/25 5:34 PM
RESPONSE to27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Lorenza Jimenez Sanchez. (Meade, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
28 28 order Memorandum Tue 03/19 9:36 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding27 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Robert Mather, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, USA. Motion27 is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 3/19/2024. Text Only Entry (cnsja, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
27 27 motion Dismiss Mon 03/18 12:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Robert Mather, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, USA. (Prochazka, Julia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
26 26 minutes Status Conference Thu 03/14 12:44 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 3/14/2024. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
25 25 order Minute Order Tue 03/12 12:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the information provided in Plaintiffs' Response to Order to Show Cause at ECF24 , the Court hereby discharges its Order to Show Cause at ECF 22 . The Court resets the Status Conference for March 14, 2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Entered by Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/12/24. Text Only Entry (mehlc5)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Tue 03/12 11:46 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 22 by Plaintiff Lorenza Jimenez Sanchez. (Meade, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
23 23 minutes Status Conference Tue 03/12 8:56 AM
COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 3/11/2024. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order to Show Cause Mon 03/11 5:59 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte , due to Plaintiffs' counsel's failure to appear at the Status Conference scheduled for March 11, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. ECF 18 . On December 21, 2023, Plaintiff Jimenez Sanchez filed this "mandamus action to compel Defendants and those acting under them to take all appropriate action immediately to adjudicate the Plaintiff's Application for Provisional Unlawful Presence Waiver (I-601A)." ECF1 at 1. On February 22, 2024, District Judge Sweeney granted the Parties' Joint Motion to Consolidate, consolidating this case with the above-referenced twenty-two other related cases. ECF17 . The next day, I set a Status Conference for March 11, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. ECF 18 . At the March 11, 2024 Status Conference, counsel for Defendants appeared yet Plaintiffs' counsel made no appearance. Though not required, I tried--unsuccessfully--calling Plaintiffs' counsel while on the record. Nearly eight hours have passed since the Status Conference and neither Plaintiffs' counsel nor anyone else on his behalf has contacted the Court regarding Plaintiffs' counsel's absence. THEREFORE, Plaintiffs are ORDERED to show cause in writing no later than March 15, 2024 , as to why this Court should not recommend dismissing their cases for Plaintiffs' failure to appear at the Status Conference and the resulting failure to prosecute these cases. If Plaintiffs fail to comply with this Order, the Court may recommend dismissing their claims without further notice. Entered by Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/11/24. Text Only Entry (mehlc5)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
21 21 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint Tue 02/27 10:33 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants USA, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Robert Mather. All Defendants. (Prochazka, Julia)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
20 20 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 02/23 1:32 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all motions . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 2/23/2024. Text Only Entry (cnsja.)
Related: [-]
19 19 minutes Discovery Hearing Fri 02/23 12:43 PM
Docketing Error (cthom, ) Modified on 2/23/2024 (cthom, ). Modified on 2/23/2024 (cthom, )
Related: [-]
18 18 order Minute Order Fri 02/23 12:14 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court will hold a status conference on March 11, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Litigants and counsel whose offices are located outside of the Denver metropolitan area or who cannot reasonably make a personal appearance may appear at the status conference remotely. Please contact Chambers at (303) 844-4507 at least two business days prior to the status conference to arrange remote appearance. Entered by Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/23/24. Text Only Entry (mehlc5)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Thu 02/22 3:40 PM
ORDER Granting16 Motion to Consolidate Cases. All future pleadings shall be filed in the lead case, Jimenez Sanchez v. United States, et al., 23-cv-3379-CNS. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 2/22/2024.(sphil, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
16 16 motion Consolidate Cases Wed 02/21 10:17 AM
Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendants Robert Mather, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, USA.(Prochazka, Julia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Friday, February 16, 2024
15 15 misc Reassigning Magistrate Judge Fri 02/16 9:01 AM
REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a) and the approval of the Chief Judge, this case is reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty in the referral capacity. (Text only entry) (agarc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 02/09 9:08 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 8 February 2024. This case was assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c). The signed Consent-Non-Consent Form13 indicates that at least one party has declined to consent. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). Case randomly reassigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. All future pleadings shall be designated as: 23-cv-03379-CSN. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Thu 02/08 5:21 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Robert Mather, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, USA All parties do not consent.. (Prochazka, Julia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/31 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Related Cases by Defendants Robert Mather, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, USA (Prochazka, Julia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
11 11 order Minute Order Thu 01/25 2:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#8] is February 8, 2024. by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 1/25/2024. Text Only Entry (kaslc2, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 01/24 10:04 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Julia M. Prochazka on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Julia M. Prochazka added to party Robert Mather(pty:dft), Attorney Julia M. Prochazka added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Julia M. Prochazka added to party USA(pty:dft) (Prochazka, Julia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
9 9 misc Summons Issued Tue 12/26 1:04 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (schap, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
8 8 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Tue 12/26 1:00 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (schap, )
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Tue 12/26 1:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the clerk shall assign this case to judicial officers under D.C. COLO.LCivR 40.1. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/26/2023. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella for all further proceedings. (schap, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
6 6 misc Summons Request Fri 12/22 1:52 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Robert Mather by Plaintiff Lorenza Jimenez Sanchez. (Meade, Shawn)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Summons Request Fri 12/22 1:50 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services by Plaintiff Lorenza Jimenez Sanchez. (Meade, Shawn)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Request Fri 12/22 1:49 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to United States of America by Plaintiff Lorenza Jimenez Sanchez. (Meade, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
3 3 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Thu 12/21 4:37 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (tgall, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Thu 12/21 4:36 PM
Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/21 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9455099)Attorney Shawn David Meade added to party Lorenza Jimenez Sanchez(pty:pla), filed by Lorenza Jimenez Sanchez.(Meade, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet