Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Deborah L Thorne
Case #: 1:23-bk-17127
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Jan 31, 2024
Claims Deadline:Apr 24, 2024

Debtor
Andrell International, LLC
6833 Auburn Rd.
Utica, MI 48315
Represented By
Ben L Schneider
Schneider & Stone
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
David P Leibowitz, ESQ
Law Offices of David P Leibowitz LLC 3478 N. Broadway - Unit 234
Chicago, IL 60657
Represented By
David P Leibowitz, ESQ
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


Docket last updated: 01/25/2024 11:31 AM CST
Thursday, December 21, 2023
1 1 12 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7a) Thu 12/21 2:30 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Fee Amount $338, Filed by Ben L Schneider on behalf of Andrell International, LLC (Schneider, Ben)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certification of Relatedness Thu 12/21 2:39 PM
Certification of Relatedness Filed by Ben L Schneider on behalf of Andrell International, LLC. (Schneider, Ben)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd none Thu 12/21 2:40 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 23-17127 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47324024. Fee Amount $ 338.00 (Schneider, Ben) Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
4 4 court Reassignment of Related Case Local Rule 1015 Thu 12/21 2:50 PM
Per Local Rule 1015-1 case related to case number 23-15728 and therefore assigned to Judge Deborah L. Thorne. Related [+]. (Pilafov, Maria)
Related: [-] 2 Certification of Relatedness
5 5 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Asset Corporation) Thu 12/21 3:11 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/17/2024 at 01:00 PM at Zoom - Leibowitz: Meeting ID 839 802 6639, Passcode 8540408143, Phone 1-872-201-2451. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]