Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:21-bk-21964

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:23-ap-01288
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2023
Terminated:Jun 28, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Harold Wrobel
Represented By
Harold Wrobel
contact info
Plaintiff
Marcia T. Dunn, Trustee
66 West Flagler Street Suite 400
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
David Blansky
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Friday, June 28, 2024
11 11 court Close Adversary Case Fri 06/28 8:12 AM
Adversary Case 1:23-ap-1288 Closed. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Fri 06/14 11:06 AM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T. Dunn, Trustee. (Blansky, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Document Fri 06/14 11:04 AM
Notice of Settlement with Defendant. Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T. Dunn, Trustee Related [+]. (Blansky, David)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia T. Dunn, Trustee
Friday, April 26, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/26 4:34 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T. Dunn, Trustee Related [+]. (Blansky, David)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
Thursday, April 04, 2024
7 7 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Thu 04/04 2:32 PM
Re-Notice of Scheduling Conference Re:1 Adversary Complaint.) Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2024 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
6 6 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Thu 03/07 12:18 PM
Re-Notice of Scheduling Conference Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2024 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary Complaint.
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Tue 01/16 12:06 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T. Dunn, Trustee Related [+]. (Blansky, David)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia T. Dunn, Trustee,2 Summons in an Adversary Proceeding,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 01/16 12:03 PM
Summons Service Executed on Harold Wrobel 12/28/2023 Filed by Plaintiff Marcia T. Dunn, Trustee, Defendant Harold Wrobel. (Blansky, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 12/27 12:16 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 03/07/2024 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Marcia T. Dunn, Trustee
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Wed 12/27 12:14 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Harold Wrobel Answer Due 1/26/2024 (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/21 4:48 PM
Adversary case 23-01288 Complaint by Marcia T. Dunn, Trustee against Harold Wrobel. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Blansky, David)
Related: [-]