Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Matthew W Mcfarland
Case #: 1:23-cv-00838
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2023
Terminated:Feb 21, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 19, 2024 5:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Interact Media, LLC
Plaintiff
Growella Inc.
Represented By
Ashley Earle
Ulmer & Berne LLP
contact info
John Francis Bennett
Frost Brown Todd LLP
contact info
Ava M. Abner
Frost Brown Todd LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 02/21 9:29 AM
***Civil Case Terminated per14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (zmc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 02/16 4:43 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Growella Inc. (Bennett, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 02/07 10:20 AM
NOTATION ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the parties' Stipulation (Doc.13 ). In the Stipulation, the signatory for Defendant is Steve Lazuka, pro se, on behalf of Defendant Interact Media, LLC d/b/a Zerys. This entry has no legal effect because a limited liability company "cannot appear in federal court except through an attorney." Doherty v. Am. Motors Corp., 728 F.2d 334, 340 (6th Cir. 1984). However, in the interest of justice and judicial economy, the Court will construe the stipulation as a motion by Plaintiff for an extension of time. For good cause, the motion is GRANTED and Defendant shall file a response to the Complaint (Doc.1 ) by February 28, 2024. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 02/07/2024. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation Mon 02/05 11:48 AM
STIPULATION ALLOWING DEFENDANT AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by Plaintiff Growella Inc.. (Earle, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
12 12 2 pgs misc Stipulation Fri 01/26 4:30 PM
STIPULATION ALLOWING DEFENDANT AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by Plaintiff Growella Inc.. (Earle, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/25 5:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Interact Media, LLC. (Bennett, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/22 5:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Interact Media, LLC. Interact Media, LLC served on 1/17/2024, answer due 2/7/2024. (Bennett, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Tue 01/16 9:48 AM
Summons Issued as to Interact Media, LLC. (bjc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 01/12 3:35 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Bennett, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
7 7 misc Supplemental - Supporting (non motion) Thu 01/04 4:17 PM
Supplemental Memorandum Supporting Exhibit 39 to Complaint by Plaintiff Growella Inc.. (Bennett, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 39
6 6 notice Notice of Non-Compliance of Local Rule 5.1(c) (Clerk's Notice) Thu 01/04 10:15 AM
Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket5 Supplemental - Supporting (non motion) filed by Growella Inc.., and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket5 Supplemental - Supporting (non motion) filed by Growella Inc.. as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 1/5/2024. (bjc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
5 5 misc Supplemental - Supporting (non motion) Wed 01/03 5:32 PM
Supplemental Memorandum Supporting Exhibit 39 to Complaint by Plaintiff Growella Inc.. (Bennett, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 39
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 12/27 11:08 AM
Summons Issued as to Interact Media, LLC. (zmc)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Wed 12/27 10:57 AM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (zmc)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/22 2:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Growella Inc. d/b/a Homebuyer.com. (Bennett, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/22 2:25 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Interact Media, LLC d/b/a Zerys ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9743010), filed by Growella Inc. d/b/a Homebuyer.com. (Bennett, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21,
Att: 22 Exhibit 22,
Att: 23 Exhibit 23,
Att: 24 Exhibit 24,
Att: 25 Exhibit 25,
Att: 26 Exhibit 26,
Att: 27 Exhibit 27,
Att: 28 Exhibit 28,
Att: 29 Exhibit 29,
Att: 30 Exhibit 30,
Att: 31 Exhibit 31,
Att: 32 Exhibit 32,
Att: 33 Exhibit 33,
Att: 34 Exhibit 34,
Att: 35 Exhibit 35,
Att: 36 Exhibit 36,
Att: 37 Exhibit 37,
Att: 38 Exhibit 38,
Att: 39 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 40 Summons Form