Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Jane J Boyle
Case #: 3:23-cv-02838
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2023
Terminated:Jan 14, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 19, 2024 5:08 AM CDT
Defendant
Omoyele Sowore
441 Jefferson Avenue
Haworth, NJ 07641
Defendant
Sahara Reporters Inc
146 West 29th Suite 7E
New York, NY 10001
Defendant
Sahara Reporters Media Group Inc
146 West 29th Suite 7E
New York, NY 10001
Plaintiff
Lilian Onoh
10440 N. Central Expy Suite 800
Dallas, TX 75231
Represented By
Steven W Thornton
Westerburg & Thornton PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Gabriel Taminu Aduda
Terminated: 01/29/2024
Defendant
Geoffrey Jideofor Kwusik Onyeama
Terminated: 01/29/2024
Defendant
Sahara Reporters LLC
Terminated: 01/29/2024
146 West 29th Suite 7E
New York, NY 10001


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
44 44 order Judgment Tue 01/14 10:54 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT: On January 13, 2025, this Court GRANTED Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's Complaint for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Doc. 43, Mem. Op. & Order. It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Plaintiff takes nothing. This is a FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT that disposes of all parties and all remaining claims and controversies in the above-captioned case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 1/14/2025) (ndt)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
43 43 5 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Mon 01/13 12:56 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting32 Motion to Dismiss. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 1/13/2025) (cfk)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
42 42 respm Reply Mon 11/25 5:53 PM
REPLY filed by Sahara Reporters Media Group Inc, Sahara Reporters Inc, Omoyele Sowore re:32 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Brown, Douglass)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
41 41 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Wed 11/13 8:54 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting40 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants' deadline to file their reply in support of their motion to dismiss is extended to November 25, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 11/13/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
40 40 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 11/12 2:17 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to32 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Sahara Reporters Media Group Inc, Sahara Reporters Inc, Omoyele Sowore (Brown, Douglass)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 01, 2024
39 39 respm Response/Objection Fri 11/01 5:50 PM
RESPONSE filed by Lilian Onoh re:32 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Thornton, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Exhibit(s),
Att: 3 Exhibit(s)
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
38 38 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Tue 10/29 8:33 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting37 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's deadline to reply is extended to November 1, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 10/29/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
37 37 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 10/28 3:46 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to32 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Lilian Onoh (Thornton, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
36 36 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Tue 10/15 8:46 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting35 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's deadline to file a reply is extended to October 29, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 10/15/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
35 35 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 10/14 11:09 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to32 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Lilian Onoh (Thornton, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
34 34 respm Appendix in Support Tue 09/24 2:55 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Sahara Reporters Inc, Sahara Reporters LLC, Sahara Reporters Media Group Inc, Omoyele Sowore re32 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Brown, Douglass)
Related: [-]
33 33 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Tue 09/24 2:52 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Sahara Reporters Inc, Sahara Reporters LLC, Sahara Reporters Media Group Inc, Omoyele Sowore re32 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Brown, Douglass)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Dismiss Tue 09/24 2:51 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Sahara Reporters Inc, Sahara Reporters LLC, Sahara Reporters Media Group Inc, Omoyele Sowore (Brown, Douglass)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
31 31 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Motion to Vacate Tue 09/24 8:16 AM
ORDER: The Court finds good cause to vacate entry of16 default judgment. Defendants' Amended28 Motion to Vacate Clerk's Entry of Default Judgment is GRANTED and Plaintiff's17 Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED as moot. Defendants are ordered to file a response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint within 21 days of this order. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 9/23/2024) (agc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
30 30 respm Reply Tue 08/13 10:35 PM
REPLY filed by Sahara Reporters Inc, Sahara Reporters Media Group Inc, Omoyele Sowore re:28 MOTION to Vacate16 Clerk's Entry of Default (Brown, Douglass)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
29 29 respm Response/Objection Tue 07/30 9:07 PM
RESPONSE filed by Lilian Onoh re:23 MOTION to Vacate16 Clerk's Entry of Default ,28 MOTION to Vacate16 Clerk's Entry of Default (Thornton, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
28 28 motion Vacate Thu 07/18 2:12 PM
AMENDED MOTION to Vacate16 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Sahara Reporters Inc, Sahara Reporters Media Group Inc, Omoyele Sowore with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (ykp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
27 27 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 07/18 1:10 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting26 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Motion to Vacate Clerk's Entry of Default. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter Document 26-1 as of the date of this order). As Defendants have been granted leave to file their Amended Motion to Vacate Clerk's Entry of Default, the Court DENIES as moot Defendants'23 Original Motion to Vacate Clerk's Entry of Default. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/18/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
26 26 motion Leave to File Tue 07/16 3:44 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Motion to Vacate Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Sahara Reporters Inc, Sahara Reporters Media Group Inc, Omoyele Sowore (Brown, Douglass)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1-Motion to Vacate Entry of Default,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
25 25 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Wed 07/10 3:58 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting22 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Court deems timely Defendants' July 9, 2024 response to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/10/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
24 24 respm Response/Objection Tue 07/09 5:17 PM
RESPONSE filed by Sahara Reporters Inc, Sahara Reporters Media Group Inc, Omoyele Sowore re:17 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants (Brown, Douglass)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Vacate Tue 07/09 12:08 PM
MOTION to Vacate16 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Sahara Reporters Inc, Sahara Reporters Media Group Inc, Omoyele Sowore with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Brown, Douglass)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-Pierre Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B-Sowore Declaration,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 07/03 9:16 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to17 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants filed by Sahara Reporters Inc, Sahara Reporters Media Group Inc, Omoyele Sowore with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Brown, Douglass)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 28, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 06/28 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas S Leatherbury on behalf of Sahara Reporters Inc, Sahara Reporters LLC, Sahara Reporters Media Group Inc, Omoyele Sowore. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Leatherbury, Thomas)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 06/28 11:59 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Blackmer Steffensen on behalf of Sahara Reporters Inc, Sahara Reporters LLC, Sahara Reporters Media Group Inc, Omoyele Sowore. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Steffensen, Peter)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 06/28 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Veronica Portillo Kendrick on behalf of Sahara Reporters Inc, Sahara Reporters LLC, Sahara Reporters Media Group Inc, Omoyele Sowore. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Kendrick, Veronica)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 06/28 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglass Griffin Brown on behalf of Sahara Reporters Inc, Sahara Reporters LLC, Sahara Reporters Media Group Inc, Omoyele Sowore. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Brown, Douglass)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
17 17 motion Default Judgment Thu 06/13 2:35 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants filed by Lilian Onoh with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Thornton, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit(s),
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 25, 2024
16 16 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 04/25 11:40 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sahara Reporters Inc, Sahara Reporters Media Group Inc, Omoyele Sowore. (ndt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
15 15 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Wed 04/24 9:51 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Default Judgment filed by Lilian Onoh. (Thornton, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
14 14 service Summons Returned Wed 03/27 10:31 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sahara Reporters Inc ; served on 3/21/2024. (Thornton, Steven)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Wed 03/27 10:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sahara Reporters Media Group Inc ; served on 3/21/2024. (Thornton, Steven)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Wed 03/27 10:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Omoyele Sowore ; served on 3/21/2024. (Thornton, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
11 11 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/18 3:30 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice10 Motion for Substituted Service. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 3/18/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/11 10:38 AM
MOTION filed by Lilian Onoh (Thornton, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, January 29, 2024
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/29 12:54 PM
Plaintiff's First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sahara Reporters Inc, Sahara Reporters Media Group Inc, Omoyele Sowore filed by Lilian Onoh. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ykp)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order Mon 01/29 9:57 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff's7 Motion to Dismiss Defendants Geoffrey Jideofor Kwusike Onyeama, Gabriel Taminu Aduda, and Sahara Reporters, LLC is GRANTED. Accordingly, Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Geoffrey Jideofor Kwusike Onyeama, Gabriel Taminu Aduda, and Sahara Reporters, LLC are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. In addition, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's6 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter Document 6-1 as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 1/29/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
7 7 motion Dismiss Mon 01/22 11:16 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants filed by Lilian Onoh (Thornton, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 motion Amend/Correct Mon 01/22 11:14 AM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct5 Response/Objection Original Complaint filed by Lilian Onoh (Thornton, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s)
5 5 respm Response/Objection Mon 01/22 11:11 AM
RESPONSE filed by Lilian Onoh re:4 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer (Thornton, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer Wed 01/17 8:48 AM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS Onoh to SHOW CAUSE in writing no later than 1/22/2024, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 1/16/2024) (cfk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 12/26 9:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Gabriel Taminu Aduda, Geoffrey Jideofor Kwusik Onyeama, Sahara Reporters Inc, Sahara Reporters LLC, Sahara Reporters Media Group Inc, Omoyele Sowore. (kcr)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
2 2 qcref Boyle Tue 12/26 9:40 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/22 1:00 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Lilian Onoh. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14266957) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Thornton, Steven)
Related: [-]