Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Case #: 6:23-cv-00881
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 19, 2024 5:01 AM CDT
Defendant
ZT Group Int'l, Inc.
Represented By
John Michael Guaragna
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Plaintiff
ACQIS LLC
Represented By
Gregory S. Tamkin
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Case L. Collard
Dorsey & Whitnay LLP
contact info
Paige Arnette Amstutz
Scott, Douglass & Mcconnico, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
55 55 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/25 1:15 PM
ORDER GRANTING52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David R. Knudson for ZT Group Int'l, Inc.,David R. Knudson for ZT Group Int'l, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cav)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
54 54 motion Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 04/23 4:41 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by ZT Group Int'l, Inc..(Guaragna, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
53 53 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Tue 04/22 10:42 AM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ZT Group Int'l, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. for ZT Group Int'l, Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
52 52 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/17 2:40 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for David R. Knudson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-20061991) by on behalf of ZT Group Int'l, Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
Related: [-]