New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Natasha C Merle
Referred: James R Cho
Case #: 1:23-cv-09458
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 19, 2024 5:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Zu Ji Gao
655 51st St Floor 1
Brooklyn, NY 11220
Defendant
Tristate Auto Service Center, Inc.
1769 McDonald Ave
Brooklyn, NY 11230
Plaintiff
Manheim Remarketing, Inc.
Represented By
Nicholas Gaunce
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
NextGear Capital, Inc.
Represented By
Nicholas Gaunce
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott LLC
contact info

GPO Jan 11 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiffs motion 3 for preliminary injunction is granted. Based on the documents that the Plaintiffs have submitted, the Court is satisfied that Plaintiffs have made a sufficient showing of a likelihood of success on the merits and irreparable harm in the absence of the injunction. Plaintiff's counsel shall attached their exhibits A & B to this Memorandum and Order, because the copies filed are corrupt and the Court was not able to either print them or create new PDF documents to attach to this decision. Plaintiff shall serve the attached Memorandum and Order with exhibits, upon the defendants and file proof of service. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/11/2024. (MI)
GPO Feb 27 2025
# (1) Appendix) (JDP)REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 26 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Manheim Remarketing, Inc. The Court respectfully recommends granting the motion for default judgment filed on behalf of plaintiff Manheim Remarketing, Inc. against defendants Tristate Auto Service Center, Inc. and Zu Ji Gao, jointly and severally, and awarding plaintiff Manheim $2,634,155 on its breach of contract claim. The Court further recommends awarding pre-judgment interest from December 20, 2023 at the rate of $649.52 per day, through the date of entry of judgment. The Court also recommends awarding Manheim $25,566.88 in attorneys' fees and $3,859.11 in costs. Objections to R&R due by 3/13/2025.The Court directs plaintiffs' counsel to serve a copy of this Report and Recommendation by overnight mail and first-class mail on defendants and to file proof of service on ECF by March 3, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 2/27/2025. (Attachments:
GPO Mar 24 2025
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Judge Cho's R&R 37 is fully adopted as the opinion of the Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Plaintiff Manheim Remarketing, Inc.'s motion for default judgment on the breach of contract and guaranty claims 26 against defendants Tristate Auto Service Center, Inc. and Zu Ji Gao, jointly and severally, is GRANTED. The Court awards plaintiff Manheim Remarketing, Inc. $2,634,155, plus (i) pre-judgment interest at the rate of $649.52 per day from December 20, 2023, through entry of judgment and (ii) $25,566.88 in attorneys' fees and $3,859.11 in costs. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed not to enter judgment or close the caseat this time. Plaintiffs shall file a letter by April 7, 2025, indicating how each plaintiff intends to proceed with all remaining claims. ORDER ATTACHED. Ordered by Judge Natasha C. Merle on 3/24/2025. (AG)

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
45 45 motion Permanent Injunction Wed 05/21 3:12 PM
First MOTION for Permanent Injunction against Tristate and Gao by Manheim Remarketing, Inc.. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support Affidavit of Matt Easler with Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Permanent Injunction,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, May 02, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 05/02 4:10 PM
ORDER granting44 Motion for Extension of Time to File by Manheim Remarketing, Inc. -- Plaintiff's motion44 is granted. Plaintiff shall file its motion for permanent injunction and dismissal by May 21, 2025. Ordered by Judge Natasha C. Merle on 5/2/2025. (AG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
44 44 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 05/01 11:59 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File re Motion for Permanent Injunction and Dismissal by Manheim Remarketing, Inc.. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
43 43 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/11 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc. without Prejudice as to NextGear Only (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
order Order(Other) Tue 04/08 4:11 PM
ORDER re41 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document re Motion for Permanent Injunction and Dismissal filed by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc. -- In light of plaintiffs' letter41 , the Court sets the following deadlines. Plaintiff NextGear shall file a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule Civil Procedure 41 on or before April 14, 2025. Plaintiff Manheim shall file a motion to resolve all remaining claims, and/or a notice of voluntary dismissal as to all remaining claims it does not seek to resolve by motion, by May 7, 2025. Ordered by Judge Natasha C. Merle on 4/8/2025. (AG)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 04/09 8:44 AM
ORDER terminating41 Motion for Leave to File by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc. See docket order entered on 4/08/2025. Ordered by Judge Natasha C. Merle on 4/8/2025. (AG)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
41 41 motion Leave to File Document Mon 04/07 11:29 AM
Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document re Motion for Permanent Injunction and Dismissal by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
42 42 misc Mail Returned Wed 04/09 11:24 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. "Copies of 3/24/2025 Order" Mail sent to Tristate Auto Service Center, Inc. 1769 McDonald Avenue Brooklyn, NY 11230. "Return to sender." (DLMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
40 40 2 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations Order on Motion for Default Judgment Mon 03/24 2:41 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS : Judge Cho's R&R37 is fully adopted as the opinion of the Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Plaintiff Manheim Remarketing, Inc.'s motion for default judgment on the breach of contract and guaranty claims26 against defendants Tristate Auto Service Center, Inc. and Zu Ji Gao, jointly and severally, is GRANTED. The Court awards plaintiff Manheim Remarketing, Inc. $2,634,155, plus (i) pre-judgment interest at the rate of $649.52 per day from December 20, 2023, through entry of judgment and (ii) $25,566.88 in attorneys' fees and $3,859.11 in costs. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed not to enter judgment or close the caseat this time. Plaintiffs shall file a letter by April 7, 2025, indicating how each plaintiff intends to proceed with all remaining claims. ORDER ATTACHED . Ordered by Judge Natasha C. Merle on 3/24/2025. (AG)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
39 39 misc Mail Returned Fri 03/21 12:39 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. copies of 2/27/2025 R&R mailed to Tristate Auto Service Center, Inc., 1769 McDonald Avenue, Brooklyn, NY 11230 Did Not Delivered. (DLMP)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 01, 2025
38 38 misc Affidavit/Affirmation Sat 03/01 9:42 PM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re37 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re26 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc. by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - GAO,
Att: 2 B - Tristate
Thursday, February 27, 2025
37 37 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 02/27 2:49 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re:26 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Manheim Remarketing, Inc. The Court respectfully recommends granting the motion for default judgment filed on behalf of plaintiff Manheim Remarketing, Inc. against defendants Tristate Auto Service Center, Inc. and Zu Ji Gao, jointly and severally, and awarding plaintiff Manheim $2,634,155 on its breach of contract claim. The Court further recommends awarding pre-judgment interest from December 20, 2023 at the rate of $649.52 per day, through the date of entry of judgment. The Court also recommends awarding Manheim $25,566.88 in attorneys' fees and $3,859.11 in costs. Objections to R&R due by 3/13/2025. The Court directs plaintiffs' counsel to serve a copy of this Report and Recommendation by overnight mail and first-class mail on defendants and to file proof of service on ECF by March 3, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 2/27/2025. (JDP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix
Monday, August 19, 2024
36 36 service Affidavit of Service Mon 08/19 5:10 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for 8.15.24 Text Order served on Zu Ji Gao on 08/19/2024, filed by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
35 35 service Affidavit of Service Mon 08/19 5:09 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for 8.15.24 Text Order served on Tristate Auto Service on 08/16/2024, filed by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
34 34 service Affidavit of Service Thu 08/15 1:07 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for July 8, 2024 Text Order and Supporting Documents Amended - Personal Service served on Zu Ji Gao on 07/09/2024, filed by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 08/15 2:21 PM
Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held on 8/15/2024 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Appearance by Nicholas Gaunce for plaintiffs. Defendants failed to appear despite receiving notice of the hearing. Plaintiffs'26 motion for default judgment taken under advisement. By 8/19/2024 , plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Order on defendants and file proof of service on ECF. (Cisco Recording.) (SGC)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
33 33 misc Status Report Mon 08/12 6:18 PM
STATUS REPORT Requesting Entry of Judgment for Manheim by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Supplemental,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Sec of State Docs
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
32 32 service Affidavit of Service Tue 08/06 4:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on TRISTATE AUTO SERVICE on August 6, 2024, filed by Manheim Remarketing, Inc.. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
31 31 service Affidavit of Service Tue 08/06 4:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on TRISTATE AUTO SERVICE on August 6, 2024, filed by Manheim Remarketing, Inc.. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
30 30 service Affidavit of Service Tue 08/06 4:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on ZU JI GAO on August 6, 2024, filed by Manheim Remarketing, Inc.. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 08/01 2:47 PM
Minute Entry for motion hearing held on 8/1/2024 before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Appearance by Anthony Bush for plaintiffs. Defendants failed to appear despite receiving notice of the hearing. Discussion held regarding plaintiffs'26 motion for default judgment. The Court identified certain deficiencies with respect to service of process on defendants and requested further information about plaintiff Nextgear Capital Inc.'s ("Nextgear") standing to sue. By 8/12/2024 , plaintiffs shall file a status report advising the Court whether plaintiffs will re-serve defendants (and withdraw their motion for default judgment without prejudice and with leave to renew), or supplement their submissions regarding service. In addition, if the motion is not withdrawn, plaintiffs shall address whether Nextgear, as opposed to Manheim Remarketing, Inc., is a proper plaintiff. Telephonic conference scheduled for 8/15/2024 at 12:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. The parties are directed to call 571-353-2301 and enter Meeting ID 709-478-501# . If any party has difficulty accessing the conference, please contact Chambers at 718-613-2110. By 8/6/2024 , plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Order on defendants and file proof of service on ECF. (Cisco Recording.) (EJS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
29 29 service Affidavit of Service Thu 07/11 2:58 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Text Order and Docket served on John Doe, Rep of Tristate on July 11, 2024, filed by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Affidavit of Service Thu 07/11 2:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Text Order and Docket served on Zu Ji Gao, personally on July 9 2024, filed by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
27 27 service Affidavit of Service Tue 07/09 2:03 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Scheduling Order and Dockeet served on Secretary of State on 07/09/2024, filed by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
order Scheduling Order Mon 07/08 2:23 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER re:26 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc. A Telephone Conference will be held on 8/1/2024 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. The parties are directed to call 571-353-2301 and enter Meeting ID 709-478-501# . If any party has difficulty accessing the conference, please contact Chambers at 718-613-2110. Counsel and the parties should be prepared to discuss plaintiffs' pending motion for default judgment (Dkt. 26), including service of process and plaintiff Nextgear Capital's standing to seek damages. By 7/11/2024 , plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Order and the full docket sheet on defendants, and file proof of service on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 7/8/2024. (JDP)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
order Order Referring Motion Mon 05/13 8:34 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: The26 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by plaintiffs is respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Cho for a Report and Recommendation. Ordered by Judge Natasha C. Merle on 5/13/2024. (AG)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
26 26 1 pgs motion Default Judgment Fri 05/10 12:34 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Judgment,
Att: 2 1 pgs Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 4 pgs Declaration of Counsel,
Att: 4 190 pgs Exhibit 1 - Complaint,
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit 2 - AOS Tristate,
Att: 6 2 pgs Exhibit 3 - AOS Gao,
Att: 7 3 pgs Exhibit 4 - Defaults,
Att: 8 4 pgs Exhibit 5 - Gaunce Bio,
Att: 9 7 pgs Exhibit 6 - Bush Bio,
Att: 10 27 pgs Exhibit 7 - Summaries & Invoices,
Att: 11 4 pgs Declaration of Easler,
Att: 12 5 pgs Exhibit A - AR Summary,
Att: 13 49 pgs Exhibit B - Invoices,
Att: 14 5 pgs Exhibit C - T&Cs,
Att: 15 3 pgs Exhibit D - SCRA Search,
Att: 16 2 pgs Exhibit E - Credit Memo,
Att: 17 17 pgs Memorandum in Support
Friday, April 12, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 04/12 3:44 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Zu Ji Gao has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Zu Ji Gao is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JP)
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 04/12 3:36 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Tristate Auto Service Center, Inc. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Tristate Auto Service Center, Inc. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
order Order(Other) Tue 04/02 12:51 PM
ORDER: Thirty (30) days after the Clerk enters default, counsel shall move for default judgment in accordance with the District Judge's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 4/2/2024. (SGC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
23 23 2 pgs misc Status Report Mon 04/01 6:24 PM
STATUS REPORT Second by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs misc Request for Certificate of Default Mon 04/01 5:55 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Declaration,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit A - SCRA Search,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit B - Clerk's Certificate of Default
21 21 misc Request for Certificate of Default Mon 04/01 5:09 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Declaration,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit A - Proposed Form of Cert of Default
Monday, March 04, 2024
20 20 1 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/04 9:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by NextGear Capital, Inc., Manheim Remarketing, Inc.. Zu Ji Gao served on 2/23/2024, answer due 3/15/2024. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
order Status Report Order Fri 03/01 9:09 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel is directed to submit a status report letter by 4/1/2024 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 3/1/2024. (SGC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
19 19 2 pgs misc Status Report Thu 02/29 5:23 PM
STATUS REPORT as to 1/30/24 Order by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Process Server Notification
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
order Status Report Order Tue 01/30 12:58 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel is directed to submit a status report letter by 2/29/2024 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 1/30/2024. (SGC)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/22 1:54 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Natasha C. Merle. Judge Frederic Block no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (BBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
18 18 1 pgs service Summons Returned Unexecuted Fri 01/12 3:31 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by NextGear Capital, Inc., Manheim Remarketing, Inc. as to Tristate Auto Service Center, Inc.. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
17 17 3 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Thu 01/11 5:08 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiffs motion3 for preliminary injunction is granted. Based on the documents that the Plaintiffs have submitted, the Court is satisfied that Plaintiffs have made a sufficient showing of a likelihood of success on the merits and irreparable harm in the absence of the injunction. Plaintiff's counsel shall attached their exhibits A & B to this Memorandum and Order, because the copies filed are corrupt and the Court was not able to either print them or create new PDF documents to attach to this decision. Plaintiff shall serve the attached Memorandum and Order with exhibits, upon the defendants and file proof of service. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/11/2024. (MI)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs motion Temporary Restraining Order Thu 01/11 11:10 AM
Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Extending Restraints Pursuant to Rule 65(b) by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order
minutes Motion Hearing Thu 01/11 5:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Nicholas Gaunce, Esq. for the plaintiff and no appearance for the defendants. Oral argument held on 1/11/2024. The Plaintiffs motion3 for an order to show cause for a TRO and injunctive relief was discussed. The Court grants plaintiffs motion3 for the reasons stated on the record. Plaintiffs second motion16 extending the TRO is Denied as moot. An order will be issued. (Court Reporter: Nicole Sesta 718 613 2758) (MI)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for TRO Thu 01/11 5:10 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Dismissing as moot, plaintiff's motion16 to extend the TRO. See minute entry dated 1-11-24 and entry17 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/11/2024. (MI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
15 15 2 pgs misc Declaration Wed 01/10 9:02 PM
DECLARATION re7 Order to Show Cause,, Supplemental of Counsel by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit 1 - Subpoena,
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit 2 - Bank Statement
14 14 2 pgs misc Declaration Wed 01/10 5:19 PM
DECLARATION re7 Order to Show Cause,, of Kevin Connelly by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit 1 - dispatch sheet,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit 2 - picture,
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit 3 - profile
13 13 2 pgs misc Declaration Wed 01/10 5:08 PM
DECLARATION re7 Order to Show Cause,, of Matt Easler by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit 1 - NY DMV Records,
Att: 2 16 pgs Exhibit 2 - CARFAX Records
12 12 1 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/10 11:08 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by NextGear Capital, Inc., Manheim Remarketing, Inc.. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/10 11:07 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by NextGear Capital, Inc., Manheim Remarketing, Inc.. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
10 10 3 pgs misc Declaration Tue 01/09 5:45 PM
DECLARATION re6 Summons Issued,1 Complaint,,, by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit 1 - Status Update,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit 2 - Photograph,
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit 3 - Secretary of State Information,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit 4 - Dealership Authorization,
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit 5 - Removal,
Att: 6 3 pgs Exhibit 6 - Acknowledge Terms and Conditions,
Att: 7 5 pgs Exhibit 7 - FedEx Receipt
9 9 1 pgs service Summons Returned Unexecuted Tue 01/09 3:54 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by NextGear Capital, Inc., Manheim Remarketing, Inc. as to Zu Ji Gao. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/09 3:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by NextGear Capital, Inc., Manheim Remarketing, Inc.. Tristate Auto Service Center, Inc. served on 1/5/2024, answer due 1/26/2024. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
7 7 55 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 12/28 5:15 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: An in person oral argument is scheduled before J. Block on January 11, 2024 @ 3:30 pm in Courtroom 10C, 10th Fl. in the Brooklyn Courthouse. By January 5, 2024 the defendant shall serve and file their opposition to plaintiff's motion for an order to show cause. By December 30, 2023 the plaintiff shall serve a copy of their order to show cause with all supporting papers and this docket entry upon the defendants and then file proof of service. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the date and time of this in person oral argument. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 12/28/2023. (MI)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 12/28 12:58 PM
Summons Issued as to Zu Ji Gao, Tristate Auto Service Center, Inc.. (AF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Tristate Auto Service Center, Inc.
5 5 1 pgs misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 12/28 12:51 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (AF)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Thu 12/28 12:46 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (AF)
Related: [-]
3 3 55 pgs motion Show Cause Thu 12/28 12:06 PM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Gaunce, Nicholas) Modified on 12/28/2023 (MI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 2 pgs Declaration of Stephen Smith,
Att: 3 2 pgs Declaration of Joey Hughes,
Att: 4 5 pgs Declaration of Nicholas M. Gaunce,
Att: 5 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 12/28 12:42 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Motions referred to James R. Cho. (AF)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 12/28 5:18 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: In Person Oral Argument set for 1/11/2024 03:30 PM before Judge Frederic Block. (MI)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
2 2 1 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/22 3:52 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Manheim, Inc. for Manheim Remarketing, Inc., NextGear Capital, Inc.. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/22 3:49 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17405945 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by NextGear Capital, Inc., Manheim Remarketing, Inc.. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 21 pgs Exhibit 1 - Note,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit 2 - UCC-1,
Att: 3 6 pgs Exhibit 3 - Individual Guaranty,
Att: 4 49 pgs Exhibit 4 - Invoices,
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit 5 - Signature to T & Cs,
Att: 6 13 pgs Exhibit 6 - T & C s,
Att: 7 2 pgs Exhibit 7 - PMSI Notice,
Att: 8 3 pgs Exhibit 8 - Certified Mailing Receipt,
Att: 9 2 pgs Declaration Stephen Smith Dec,
Att: 10 2 pgs Declaration Joey Hughes Dec,
Att: 11 5 pgs Affidavit Gaunce Affirmation,
Att: 12 55 pgs Proposed Order Order to Show Cause,
Att: 13 6 pgs Memorandum in Support of Law ISO Order to Show Cause,
Att: 14 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet,
Att: 15 2 pgs Proposed Summons as to Gao,
Att: 16 2 pgs Proposed Summons as to Tristate