Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sam A Lindsay
Referred: David L Horan
Case #: 3:23-cv-02845
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2023
Terminated:Jun 28, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 19, 2024 5:09 AM CDT
Defendant
RAB Inc
Represented By
Eugene Xerxes Martin, IV
Martin Golden Lyons Watts Morgan PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dylan Burgess
Represented By
Katherine Hendler Fayne
Katherine Fayne Law PLLC
contact info
Anthony I Paronich
Paronich Law PC
contact info
Andrew Roman Perrong
Perrong Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago
Friday, June 28, 2024
25 25 order Judgment Fri 06/28 11:19 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of RAB Inc against Dylan Burgess. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 6/28/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations Fri 06/28 11:18 AM
Order Accepting23 Findings and Recommendations re:16 Motion to Dismiss filed by RAB Inc. Accordingly, the court grants16 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; and dismisses with prejudice this action and all claims by Plaintiff. Plaintiff's request to amend is denied. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 6/28/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
23 23 motion Findings and Recommendations Thu 06/06 9:06 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re:12 Motion to Dismiss,16 Motion to Dismiss. The Court should grant Defendant RAB, Inc's Motion to Dismiss and dismiss Plaintiff Dylan Burgess's claims with prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 6/6/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
22 22 respm Reply Thu 03/14 5:19 PM
REPLY filed by RAB Inc re:16 MOTION to Dismiss (Martin, Eugene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) Document 21 - Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant RAB, Inc.'s MTD
Monday, March 04, 2024
21 21 respm Response/Objection Mon 03/04 6:25 PM
RESPONSE filed by Dylan Burgess re:16 MOTION to Dismiss (Perrong, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
20 20 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/27 4:11 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions due by 7/31/2024. Discovery due by 6/28/2024. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 2/27/2024) (agc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
19 19 misc Status Report Mon 02/26 6:00 PM
STATUS REPORT OF RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE filed by Dylan Burgess. (Perrong, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
18 18 4 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Fri 02/02 11:51 AM
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Responses due by 3/4/2024. Replies due by 4/19/2024. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 2/2/2024) (cfk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
17 17 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Thu 02/01 12:49 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by RAB Inc re16 MOTION to Dismiss (Martin, Eugene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Ex. B
16 16 motion Dismiss Thu 02/01 12:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by RAB Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Martin, Eugene)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
15 15 order Status Report Order Tue 01/23 2:35 PM
ORDER REQUIRING CONFERENCE AND JOINT STATUS REPORT: Joint Status Report due by 2/27/2024. Plaintiff's counsel and Defendant's counsel shall confer in person or by telephone not later than 2/6/2024. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/23/2024) (sxf)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Tue 01/23 11:31 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendant RAB, Inc.'s12 Motion to Dismiss does not comply with the requirements of the Court's9 Standing Order on Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss, including the requirement to include a Certificate of Conference. Defendant RAB, Inc. must either amend or supplement its motion to comply with the Standing Order's requirements -- or, after complying with the Standing Order's requirements, and if appropriate based on the results of the required conference, advise the Court that it will withdraw its motion -- by Wednesday, February 14, 2024. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/23/2024.)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Tue 01/23 10:59 AM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by RAB Inc re12 MOTION to Dismiss (Martin, Eugene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Ex. B
12 12 motion Dismiss Tue 01/23 10:56 AM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by RAB Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Eugene Xerxes Martin, IV added to party RAB Inc(pty:dft) (Martin, Eugene)
Related: [-]
utility Modify Hearings/Deadlines (Optional) Mon 01/29 10:45 AM
Hearing terminated in15 Order, due to hearing being set in error. (mcrd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
11 11 8 pgs order Order Tue 01/09 11:20 AM
STANDING ORDER ON FILING MATERIALS UNDER SEAL. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/9/2024) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
10 10 3 pgs order Order Tue 01/09 11:19 AM
STANDING ORDER ON REQUESTS FOR HEARINGS AND ORAL ARGUMENTS. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/9/2024) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
9 9 4 pgs order Order Tue 01/09 11:16 AM
STANDING ORDER ON FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/9/2024) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
8 8 24 pgs order Order Tue 01/09 11:10 AM
STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY AND NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/9/2024) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 01/05 10:38 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 1/4/2024) (oyh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Wed 01/03 5:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to RAB Inc ; served on 1/2/2024. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 12/26 1:16 PM
Summons Issued as to RAB Inc. (kcr)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
4 4 qcref Lindsay Tue 12/26 1:15 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 12/22 4:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dylan Burgess. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Fayne, Katherine)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 12/22 4:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dylan Burgess. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Fayne, Katherine)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/22 4:39 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against RAB Inc filed by Dylan Burgess. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14267938) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Fayne, Katherine)
Related: [-]