California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:23-cv-06607
Nature of Suit430 Other Statutes - Banks and Banking
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2023
Terminated:Mar 22, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 19, 2024 2:35 AM PDT
Defendant
First Republic Bank
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Defendant
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
3501 Fairfax Drive
Arlington, VA 22226
Plaintiff
Gloria Tang
Represented By
Abraham H Tang
Long Williamson & Delis
contact info
Abraham H. Tang
Law Office Of Abraham Tang
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 22, 2024
13 13 1 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 03/22 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Entire Complaint against All Defendants by Gloria Tang (Tang, Abraham)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Wed 03/13 3:09 PM
REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/22/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2024 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, March 22, 2024, by no later than 12:00PM. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/13 1:59 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 3/13/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Wed 03/13 1:00 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 03/13 12:43 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gloria Tang.. (Tang, Abraham)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 03/08 6:43 AM
SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/14/2024. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 03/01 7:08 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/7/2024. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 01/04 6:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, First Republic Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 12/26 1:03 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 12/26 10:32 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/9/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 12/26 2:25 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Please refile as a single summons with all defendants listed An attachment can be used if space is limited. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:2 Proposed Summons filed by Gloria Tang (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 12/22 4:01 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Gloria Tang (Tang, Abraham)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 12/22 3:49 PM
Proposed Summons. (Tang, Abraham)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/22 3:40 PM
COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Gloria Tang against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-18968052.). Filed by Gloria Tang.(Tang, Abraham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet