California Central District Court
Judge:Michelle Williams Court
Referred: Stephanie S Christensen
Case #: 2:23-cv-10742
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2023
Terminated:Jan 22, 2025
Case in other court:California Superior Court, County of Los Angeles, 23STCV09703
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 19, 2024 2:37 AM PDT
Cross Claimant
Sunrise NPL, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company
Represented By
Kimberly D Lewis
Ervin Cohen And Jessup LLP
contact info
Cross Claimant
Sunrise NPL, LLC
Represented By
Stanton Lawrence Stein
Russ August And Kabat
contact info
Erica Sang-Ah Kim
Russ August And Kabat
contact info
Kimberly D Lewis
Ervin Cohen And Jessup LLP
contact info
Peter S Selvin
Ervin Cohen And Jessup LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
Holy Hutton LLC
Cross Defendant
ROES
Cross Defendant
Las Vegas 26 Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Jeffre Todd Lowe
Law Offices Of Benjamin Donel And Associates Apc
contact info
Cross Defendant
Holy Huton LLC
Cross Defendant
Benjamin Donel
Represented By
Jeffre Todd Lowe
Law Offices Of Benjamin Donel And Associates Apc
contact info
Cross Defendant
Easy Financial LLC
Represented By
Jeffre Todd Lowe
Law Offices Of Benjamin Donel And Associates Apc
contact info
Defendant
Justin Ehrlich
Defendant
Sunrise NPL, LLC
Represented By
Stanton Lawrence Stein
Russ August And Kabat
contact info
Erica Sang-Ah Kim
Russ August And Kabat
contact info
Kimberly D Lewis
Ervin Cohen And Jessup LLP
contact info
Defendant
Churchill MRA Funding I, LLC
Represented By
Kimberly D Lewis
Ervin Cohen And Jessup LLP
contact info
Peter S Selvin
Ervin Cohen And Jessup LLP
contact info
Defendant
Travis Masters
Defendant
Sorabh Maheshwari
Defendant
Derrick Land
Defendant
Luke Alexander Ware
Plaintiff
Las Vegas 26 Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Jeffre Todd Lowe
Law Offices Of Benjamin Donel And Associates Apc
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Cross Defendant
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (as acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of cross-defendant First Republic Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver)
Terminated: 01/25/2024
Represented By
Matthew S Henderson
Parker Ibrahim And Berg LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Terminated: 01/12/2024
Represented By
Scott S. Humphreys
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
First Republic Bank
Terminated: 01/25/2024
Defendant
DOES
Terminated: 01/23/2024


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
90 90 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 01/23 11:43 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (DKT.89 ) by Judge Michelle Williams Court. The Court, having considered the Parties' stipulation and good cause appearing, hereby ORDERS that the Complaint filed by Las Vegas and the Cross-Complaint filed by Sunrise are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and fees. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
89 89 stip Dismiss Case Tue 01/21 5:20 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant Churchill MRA Funding I, LLC.(Selvin, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order