Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Stephanie L Haines
Case #: 3:23-cv-00313
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 19, 2024 5:47 AM EDT
Defendant
COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By
Paul G Lees
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote, P.C
contact info
Defendant
COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC
Represented By
Paul G Lees
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote, P.C
contact info
Defendant
MCDONALD'S CORPORATION
Represented By
Elizabeth B McRee
Jones Day
contact info
Katherine J. McLay
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
MCDONALD'S USA, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth B McRee
Jones Day
contact info
Katherine J. McLay
Jones Day
contact info
Plaintiff
T.M.
Represented By
David M. Koller
Koller Law
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
TAYLOR ENGLISH
702 Turnpike Ave
Clearfield, PA 16830
ThirdParty Plaintiff
COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By
Paul G Lees
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote, P.C
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC
Represented By
Paul G Lees
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote, P.C
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
49 49 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Time Thu 05/08 3:31 PM
ORDER granting48 Joint Motion of Counsel for an Extension of Time to Complete ADR. The parties have until July 18, 2025 to complete ADR and report back to the Court the results of the private mediation. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 5/8/2025. (dlg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
48 48 motion Extend Time Wed 05/07 5:37 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Complete ADR by COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC., COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC. (Lees, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
47 47 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Wed 05/07 5:36 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC., COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC. (Lees, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
46 46 minutes Telephonic Status Conference Thu 05/01 10:28 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stephanie L. Haines: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/30/2025. The Court convened a post-discovery status conference, which it converted to a general status conference because the parties had not yet completed ADR. Counsel for all parties entered their appearances. The Court confirmed with the parties that ADR remained incomplete and directed them to file a new ADR stipulation within seven (7) days. The Court further ordered that the ADR process be completed within sixty (60) days. The Court advised the parties that, if ADR is unsuccessful, it will schedule a post-discovery status conference. There being no further matters to address, the Court concluded the conference. (Court Reporter: Shirley Hall) (dag)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
45 45 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 04/11 3:46 PM
TEXT ORDER - A Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for 4/30/2025 at 2:30 PM before Judge Stephanie L. Haines. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 4/11/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter. (dlg) Modified text on 4/11/2025. (dlg)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
44 44 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 01/31 1:24 PM
ORDER - Upon Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend the Fact Discovery Deadline in these matters by thirty (30) days, any response and/or argument thereto, and for good cause show, it is hereby ORDERED and DECREED that said motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT: 1) Fact discovery in these matters must be completed by February 28, 2025; and 2) All other outstanding deadlines as established by this Court's November 4, 2024, Order (ECF Doc. No.41 ) remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 1/31/2025. (dlg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
43 43 order Order Reassigning Case Thu 01/30 8:32 AM
ORDER - In accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 137(a) and LCvR 40(G), this case is reassigned from Senior U.S. District Judge Kim R. Gibson to U.S. District Judge Stephanie L. Haines. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 1/30/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
42 42 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 01/29 7:17 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Thirty (30) Days by T.M.. (Koller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
41 41 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 11/05 12:59 PM
ORDER granting40 Joint Motion to Extend the Discovery and Subsequent Deadlines by Ninety Days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERRED THAT: 1) Fact Discovery in these matters must be completed by January 29, 2025; 2) ADR must be completed in these matters by March 31, 2025; and 3) To the extent not otherwise addressed, all other outstanding deadlines are extended by ninety (90) days. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 11/4/2024. (dlg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
40 40 4 pgs motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 10/31 10:47 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Subsequent Deadlines by 90 Days by T.M.. (Koller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order,
Att: 2 1 pgs Certificate of Service
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
39 39 14 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 06/05 1:13 PM
ORDER granting38 Motion for Protective Order - STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 6/5/2024. (dlg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
38 38 3 pgs motion Protective Order Tue 06/04 1:10 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by MCDONALD'S CORPORATION, MCDONALD'S USA, LLC. (McLay, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 17 pgs Proposed Protective Order
37 37 1 pgs service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Tue 06/04 1:07 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC., COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC. TAYLOR ENGLISH served on 5/30/2024, answer due 6/20/2024. (bjr) Modified text on 6/4/2024. (cel)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Wrong event selected Tue 06/04 1:08 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re36 Affidavit of Service. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed. This message is for informational purposes only. (bjr)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Tue 06/04 2:56 PM
Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from TAYLOR ENGLISH on 6/20/2024 (cel)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
36 36 service Affidavit of Service Mon 06/03 4:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Third Party Complaint served on Taylor English on 05/30/2024, filed by COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC., COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC. (Lees, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
35 35 2 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 05/23 1:17 PM
Summons Issued as to TAYLOR ENGLISH (bjr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
34 34 2 pgs service Praecipe to Issue Summons Wed 05/22 4:12 PM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC., COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC (Lees, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Summons
33 33 2 pgs service Summons/Return of Service Returned Unexecuted Wed 05/22 3:45 PM
Summons/Return of Service Returned Unexecuted by COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC., COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC as to TAYLOR ENGLISH. (Lees, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
32 32 3 pgs minutes Case Management Conference Fri 05/17 1:35 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kim R. Gibson: The Court held an Initial Rule 16 Case Management Conference with counsel for the parties appearing by telephone. The Court began by asking counsel for Plaintiff to provide a brief description of the claims. Counsel for Plaintiff explained that the facts of the present case bear a strong resemblance to another case before the Court, Gordon v. Coyle Management, Inc. (No. 3:24-cv-1), and the same counsel represents the respective parties in each case. An Initial Rule 16 conference for Gordon was scheduled for May 16, 2024, at 1:00 PM, and the same conference was scheduled for T.M. at 2:00 PM. The Court clarified, and the parties agreed, that the conference commemorated by this memorandum served as an Initial Rule 16 Case Management Conference for both cases --- Gordon and T.M. Counsel for Plaintiff then briefly described the factual background and the operative claims for both cases, and as more fully stated in said Hearing Memo. (Court Reporter: None) (dlg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/25 3:42 PM
ORDER granting25 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Purpose of Discovery, and as more fully stated in said Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 4/24/2024. (dlg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Wed 04/24 4:10 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion to Continue Initial Rule 16 Case Management Conference. It is further Ordered that the Initial Rule 16 Case Management Conference is rescheduled to May 16, 2024, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 4/24/2024. (dlg)
Related: [-]
29 29 4 pgs adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Wed 04/24 3:40 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC., COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC. (Lees, Paul)
Related: [-]
28 28 5 pgs misc Proposed Initial Scheduling Order Wed 04/24 3:39 PM
Proposed Initial Scheduling Order by COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC., COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC. (Lees, Paul)
Related: [-]
27 27 10 pgs misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 04/24 3:34 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lees, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
26 26 4 pgs respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 04/23 7:06 PM
BRIEF in Support re25 Motion to Consolidate Cases for Purpose of Discovery filed by MCDONALD'S CORPORATION, MCDONALD'S USA, LLC. (McLay, Katherine)
Related: [-]
25 25 2 pgs motion Consolidate Cases Tue 04/23 7:05 PM
Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Purpose of Discovery by MCDONALD'S CORPORATION, MCDONALD'S USA, LLC. (McLay, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order
24 24 3 pgs motion Continue Tue 04/23 6:28 PM
Consent MOTION to Continue Initial Rule 16 Case Management Conference by MCDONALD'S CORPORATION, MCDONALD'S USA, LLC. (McLay, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order
Thursday, April 04, 2024
23 23 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/04 1:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth B McRee on behalf of MCDONALD'S CORPORATION, MCDONALD'S USA, LLC. (McRee, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
22 22 9 pgs cmp Third Party Complaint Mon 04/01 10:59 PM
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against TAYLOR ENGLISH, filed by COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC., COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC. (Lees, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 30 pgs Exhibit
Thursday, March 28, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/28 4:21 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Elizabeth B. McRee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 3/28/2024. (dlg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
20 20 2 pgs motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Wed 03/27 4:25 PM
MOTION for attorney Elizabeth B. McRee, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-8187410) by MCDONALD'S CORPORATION, MCDONALD'S USA, LLC. (McRee, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit A (Affidavit of E. McRee),
Att: 2 1 pgs Proposed Order
19 19 3 pgs order Case Management Order Wed 03/27 11:16 AM
ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 and 16.2, an Initial Rule 16 Case Management Conference shall be held TELEPHONICALLY on April 30, 2024, at 2:00 p.m., and as more fully stated in said Order Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 3/27/2024. (dlg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit "A" - Stipulation Selecting ADR Process,
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit "B" - Fed.R.Civ. P. 26(f) Report,
Att: 3 6 pgs Exhibit "C" - Initial Scheduling Order
Monday, March 18, 2024
18 18 39 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/18 6:48 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC., COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC. (Lees, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/13 3:35 PM
ORDER re15 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer, filed by COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC, COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC. - By stipulation of the undersigned counsel, Plaintiff T.M., a minor, by and through her mother and natural guardian J.T. and Defendants, Coyle Management, Inc. and Coyle Properties Limited II, LLC, stipulate to an extension of time through March 18, 2024 for Defendants, Coyle Management, Inc. and Coyle Properties Limited II, LLC, to answer Plaintiff's Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED, Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 3/13/2024. (dlg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
16 16 51 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/12 7:21 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by MCDONALD'S CORPORATION, MCDONALD'S USA, LLC. (McLay, Katherine)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 03/12 11:29 AM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC., COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC Answer due from COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC. on 3/18/2024; COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC on 3/18/2024. (Lees, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order
Thursday, February 29, 2024
14 14 2 pgs misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Thu 02/29 6:33 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by MCDONALD'S CORPORATION, MCDONALD'S USA, LLC. (McLay, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Tue 02/27 3:01 PM
ORDER granting12 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer filed by MCDONALD'S USA, LLC, MCDONALD'S CORPORATION; Answer due from MCDONALD'S USA, LLC, on 3/12/2024 and MCDONALD'S CORPORATION on 3/12/2024. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 2/27/24. (cel)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.A Tue 02/27 8:40 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re11 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 3/5/2024. (bjr)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Tue 02/27 3:02 PM
Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from MCDONALD'S CORPORATION, MCDONALD'S USA, LLC on 3/12/2024. (cel)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
12 12 1 pgs misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 02/26 4:26 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by MCDONALD'S USA, LLC, MCDONALD'S CORPORATION Answer due from MCDONALD'S USA, LLC on 3/12/2024; MCDONALD'S CORPORATION on 3/12/2024. (McLay, Katherine)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/26 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine J. McLay on behalf of MCDONALD'S CORPORATION, MCDONALD'S USA, LLC. (McLay, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/16 2:35 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Paul G. Lees to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 1/16/2024. (dlg)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs misc Proposed Order Tue 01/16 1:12 PM
Proposed Order re8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC., COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC. (Lees, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
8 8 3 pgs motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Fri 01/12 3:55 PM
MOTION for attorney Paul G. Lees to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-8065802) by COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC., COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC. (Lees, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Affidavit Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing
7 7 2 pgs misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Fri 01/12 3:46 PM
Disclosure Statement by COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC., COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC. (Lees, Paul)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/12 3:42 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC., COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC. COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC. waiver sent on 1/12/2024, answer due 3/12/2024; COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC waiver sent on 1/12/2024, answer due 3/12/2024. (Lees, Paul)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/12 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul G Lees on behalf of COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC., COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC. (Lees, Paul)
Related: [-]
misc QC - No Proposed Order Attached Fri 01/12 4:43 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. ERROR: Proposed Order, which is required for all motions in civil cases per Local Rule LCvR7, was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (bjr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
4 4 1 pgs misc Errata (to be used by filers) Tue 01/09 5:48 PM
Errata re3 Waiver of Service Executed, Quality Control message - Generic Correction by T.M.. Reason for Correction: Completed Waiver Form. (Koller, David)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply) Tue 01/09 2:45 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re3 Waiver of Service Executed. ERROR: Missing Information. CORRECTION: Refile as Errata. (bjr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/08 6:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by T.M.. MCDONALD'S CORPORATION waiver sent on 12/29/2023, answer due 2/27/2024; MCDONALD'S USA, LLC waiver sent on 12/29/2023, answer due 2/27/2024. (Koller, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
2 2 1 pgs adr Notice of ADR Designation Tue 01/02 11:42 AM
NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Fri 12/22 5:09 PM
COMPLAINT against COYLE MANAGEMENT, INC., COYLE PROPERTIES LIMITED II, LLC, MCDONALD'S CORPORATION, MCDONALD'S USA, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8038494), filed by T.M.. (rtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Civil Cover Sheet