Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Wendy W Berger
Referred: Robert M Norway
Case #: 6:23-cv-02467
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause29:2102 Notice Required Before Plant Closings and Mass Layoffs
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2023
Terminated:Nov 18, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 19, 2024 5:45 AM EDT
Defendant
Embanet-Compass Knowledge Group Inc.
Represented By
Jason Devon Byrd, Jr.
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Shawn Matthew Clark
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Mediator
Carlos Burruezo
Represented By
Carlos J. Burruezo
Burruezo & Burruezo, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexis Marquez
Represented By
Brandon J. Hill
Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, PA
contact info
Luis A. Cabassa
Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, PA
contact info
Amanda E. Heystek
Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, December 26, 2024
40 40 2 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 12/26 2:03 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Alexis Marquez. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
39 39 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 11/18 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ELA)
Related: [-]
38 38 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 11/18 12:03 PM
ORDER Dismissing Case with Prejudice re 36 Plaintiff's Notice of Settlement. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 11/18/2024. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
37 37 2 pgs adr Mediation report Fri 11/15 1:21 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on November 15, 2024. Hearing outcome: Settled.. (Burruezo, Carlos)
Related: [-]
36 36 2 pgs notice Notice of settlement Fri 11/15 1:09 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Alexis Marquez (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
35 35 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 11/13 10:57 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Shawn Matthew Clark and Jason Devon Byrd, Jr. of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 11/13 8:18 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 33 Motion to Conduct Mediation via zoom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 11/13/2024. (JBS)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
33 33 3 pgs motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/11 12:15 PM
Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Conduct Mediation Via Zoom by Alexis Marquez. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
32 32 2 pgs notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Mon 11/11 12:09 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on November 15, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. before Carlos Burruezo.(Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
31 31 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 09/13 1:45 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re28 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Embanet-Compass Knowledge Group Inc..(Byrd, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Affidavit Declaration of Jim McGill iso Refendant's Response in Opposition,
Att: 2 4 pgs Declaration of Megan Prince iso Refendant's Response in Opposition
Thursday, August 15, 2024
30 30 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Thu 08/15 4:55 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant's 29 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's 28 Motion to Certify Class on or before September 13, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 8/15/2024. (MLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
29 29 3 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Tue 08/13 2:50 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Named Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class by Embanet-Compass Knowledge Group Inc.. (Byrd, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
28 28 26 pgs motion Certify Class Wed 07/31 5:58 PM
MOTION to Certify Class by Alexis Marquez.(Hill, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 8 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 7 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 4 42 pgs Deposition Transcript of Jim McGill,
Att: 5 32 pgs Deposition Transcript of Amanda Strieter,
Att: 6 94 pgs Deposition Transcript of Alexis Marquez,
Att: 7 Declaration of Alexis Marquez,
Att: 8 Declaration of Brandon J. Hill,
Att: 9 Declaration of Luis A. Cabassa,
Att: 10 Declaration of Amanda E. Heystek
Thursday, May 09, 2024
27 27 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/09 8:03 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re26 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply in Further Support of21 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Alexis Marquez. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
26 26 motion Leave to File Amicus Brief / Document Wed 05/08 4:53 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply in Further Support of21 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Embanet-Compass Knowledge Group Inc.. (Byrd, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
25 25 21 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/08 8:39 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Alexis Marquez. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
24 24 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Thu 03/28 3:10 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply. Plaintiff may file his response to the Motion to Dismiss on or before April 8, 2024. No further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 3/28/2024. (JBS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Wed 03/27 5:22 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Alexis Marquez. (Hill, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
22 22 order Case Management Scheduling Order Fri 03/22 11:58 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/29/2024 Joinder of Parties due by 3/29/2024 Discovery due by 12/2/2024 Dispositive motions due by 1/2/2025 Pretrial statement due by 5/5/2025 All other motions due by 4/2/2025 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 10/1/2024 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 10/31/2024 Trial Status Conference set for 5/13/2025 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger Jury Trial set for the June 2025 trial term commencing on 6/2/2025 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Conduct mediation hearing by 12/16/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/22/2024. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
21 21 16 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 03/08 2:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Embanet-Compass Knowledge Group Inc.. (Byrd, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
20 20 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/06 4:20 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Embanet-Compass Knowledge Group Inc.. (Byrd, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
19 19 misc Case Management Report Tue 03/05 5:52 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Byrd, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order to comply with electronic filing Fri 03/01 11:09 AM
ORDER for Shawn Matthew Clark to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing on or before 3/15/2024. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/1/2024. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 02/28 7:03 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant's 16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint on or before March 8, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 2/28/2024. (Norway, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Tue 02/27 4:21 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Embanet-Compass Knowledge Group Inc.. (Byrd, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/16 4:50 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Embanet-Compass Knowledge Group Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Alexis Marquez. Related document: 1 Complaintfiled by Alexis Marquez.(Hill, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
misc Fees Paid - Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/30 3:47 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES PAID Related [+] by attorney Shawn Matthew Clark, appearing on behalf of All Defendants. Related document:11 Unopposed MOTION for Shawn M. Clark to appear pro hac vice and/or for special admission . (BGS)
Related: [-] ceipt Number AFLMDC-21712832 for $150
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
14 14 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 01/24 1:00 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Shawn Matthew Clark Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (HAI)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/24 8:34 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice provided counsel shall register for and use the Court's electronic filing system. Counsel can register for a CM/ECF login password through the website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under "CM/ECF." Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 1/24/2024. (JBS)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 01/24 8:31 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant may file its answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before February 22, 2024. Future extension motions in this case shall be filed more than three business days before the expiring deadline and must demonstrate the movant's diligence in meeting the deadline in addition to good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 1/24/2024. (JBS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/23 12:43 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Shawn M. Clark to appear pro hac vice and/or for special admission by Embanet-Compass Knowledge Group Inc.. (Byrd, Jason)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Tue 01/23 12:22 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other responsive pleading by Embanet-Compass Knowledge Group Inc.. (Byrd, Jason)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 14, 2024
9 9 service Summons returned executed Sun 01/14 9:18 AM
RETURN of service executed on January 2, 2024 by Alexis Marquez as to Embanet-Compass Knowledge Group Inc.. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 01/02 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order Tue 01/02 1:30 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/2/2024. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
6 6 4 pgs misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/29 2:59 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Alexis Marquez. (Hill, Brandon)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 12/29 2:59 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Alexis Marquez. Related case(s): No (Hill, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
4 4 2 pgs service Summons issued Wed 12/27 12:55 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Embanet-Compass Knowledge Group Inc. (GL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 12/26 9:52 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:23-cv-02467-WWB-RMN. (JG)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
2 2 2 pgs notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 12/22 7:04 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Brandon J. Hill on behalf of Alexis Marquez. Lead Counsel: Brandon J. Hill. (Hill, Brandon)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/22 7:03 PM
COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Embanet-Compass Knowledge Group Inc. d/b/a Boundless Learning with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21596879) filed by Alexis Marquez.(Hill, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons