Maine District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-00136
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Dec 23, 2023 2:20 AM EST
Defendant
LISA CAMPOS (1)
Represented By
DAVID J. BOBROW
Bedard & Bobrow, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
F. TODD LOWELL
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
NICHOLAS S. HEIMBACH
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/19/2024 4:02 PM EST
Friday, May 12, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to LISA CAMPOS (1). (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Sean Sullivan
2 2 SYNOPSIS as to LISA CAMPOS (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
3 3 Arrest Warrant Issued by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF as to LISA CAMPOS. Warrant provided to U.S. Marshals Service. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
4 4 (Access to document is restricted to case participants only) Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued on 6/6/23 for Lisa Campos as to LISA CAMPOS to appear on 6/15/23 by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF (slg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
5 5 NOTICE OF HEARING as to LISA CAMPOS: Initial Appearance and Attorney Appointment set for 6/15/2023 09:30 AM in Portland Hearing Room before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
6 6 MOTION for Detention by USA as to LISA CAMPOS Responses due by 7/5/2023. (HEIMBACH, NICHOLAS) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
7 7 Pretrial Services Report as to LISA CAMPOS filed by U.S. Probation. (Access to document is restricted to USA and applicable defendant only)(METCALFE, JENNIFER) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Conditions
8 8 RESPONSE to6 MOTION for Detention by LISA CAMPOS and Request for Release Reply due by 6/28/2023. (BOBROW, DAVID) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
CJA 20 Appointment of Attorney DAVID J. BOBROW for LISA CAMPOS. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF on 6/15/2023. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF: Initial Appearance held as to LISA CAMPOS. Attorney Appointment Hearing held as to LISA CAMPOS, DAVID J. BOBROW appointed. Preliminary Hearing Waived as to LISA CAMPOS. Defendant ordered temporarily detained and remanded to the custody of the US Marshals Service. (Court Reporter: FTR) (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
10 10 Financial Affidavit by LISA CAMPOS (Access to document is restricted to USA and applicable defendant only) (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER approving10 Financial Affidavit as to LISA CAMPOS (1) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
12 12 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by LISA CAMPOS (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER as to LISA CAMPOS: Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, Pub.L.No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21,2020) and Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is reminded of its obligation to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant, that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland 383 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. So Ordered. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to LISA CAMPOS By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
15 15 NOTICE OF HEARING as to LISA CAMPOS Detention Hearing set for 6/20/2023 11:00 AM in Portland Hearing Room before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER ON ELIGIBILITY FOR PRETRIAL DETENTION as to LISA CAMPOS By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (lcb) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2023
17 17 17 pgs MEMORANDUM by LISA CAMPOS in support of8 Response to Motion (BOBROW, DAVID) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
18 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF: Detention Hearing held as to LISA CAMPOS, Bond set as to LISA CAMPOS (1) $10,000.00 Unsecured, Unsecured Bond Made by LISA CAMPOS in amount of $10,000.00, and order setting conditions of release issued. Defendant ordered released after processing. (Court Reporter: Lori Dunbar) (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
19 19 Appearance Bond ( Unsecured ) as to LISA CAMPOS. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
20 20 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to LISA CAMPOS. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
21 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict until September 8, 2023 by USA as to LISA CAMPOS Responses due by 7/31/2023. (HEIMBACH, NICHOLAS) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER granting21 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict until September 8, 2023. Time excluded from July 10, 2023 until September 8, 2023 as to LISA CAMPOS (1) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (lcb) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
23 23 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LISA CAMPOS Detention Hearing held on 6/20/23 before Judge Karen Frink Wolf. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lori Dunbar, Telephone Number: (207) 749-4072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2023. (DUNBAR, LORI) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
24 24 MOTION to Revoke Bail and MOTION for Warrant by USA as to LISA CAMPOS(nrg) Modified on 8/1/2023 to unseal (nrg). [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jennifer Metcalfe
25 25 ORDER granting24 Motion for Warrant; Sealed until Arrest or until Detainer is Lodged as to LISA CAMPOS (1) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) Modified on 8/1/2023 to unseal (nrg). [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
26 26 Arrest Warrant Issued by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF as to LISA CAMPOS. Warrant provided to U.S. Marshals Service. (nrg) Modified on 8/1/2023 to unseal (nrg). [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
Arrest of LISA CAMPOS in Southern District of New York. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
27 27 Rule 5 Documents Received as to LISA CAMPOS(nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Charles Kemmlein,
Att: 2 Bail Disposition,
Att: 3 Commitment Order
Friday, August 18, 2023
28 28 NOTICE OF HEARING as to LISA CAMPOS Initial Appearance on Bail Revocation Proceedings set for 8/23/2023 11:00 AM in Portland Hearing Room before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (lcb) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
29 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF: Initial Appearance on Bail Revocation Hearing held as to LISA CAMPOS re24 MOTION to Revoke Bail filed by USA. Defendant ordered temporarily detained, and remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. (Court Reporter: Michelle Feliccitti) (lcb) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
30 30 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION PENDING HEARING ON GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO REVOKE BAIL as to LISA CAMPOS By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (lcb) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
31 31 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed as to LISA CAMPOS (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
32 32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict (Second) by USA as to LISA CAMPOS Responses due by 9/20/2023. (HEIMBACH, NICHOLAS) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
33 33 SPEEDY TRIAL ORDER granting32 Motion for Extension of Time to Indictment - Time excluded from September 8, 2023, until October 19, 2023, as to LISA CAMPOS (1) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
34 34 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION Re:24 MOTION to Revoke Bail as to LISA CAMPOS: Bail Revocation Hearing set for 9/27/2023 02:00 PM in Portland Hearing Room before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
35 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF: Conference of Counsel held re release order as to LISA CAMPOS (no court reporter present), Bond Hearing held as to LISA CAMPOS, Bond set as to LISA CAMPOS (1), Bond Made by LISA CAMPOS. Order setting conditions of release issued. Defendant ordered released after processing. (Court Reporter: Michelle Feliccitti) (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
36 36 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to LISA CAMPOS. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (lcb) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
37 37 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict (Third) by USA as to LISA CAMPOS Responses due by 11/6/2023. (HEIMBACH, NICHOLAS) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
38 38 SPEEDY TRIAL ORDER granting37 Motion for Extension of Time to Indictment - Time excluded from October 19, 2023, until December 21, 2023, as to LISA CAMPOS (1) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
39 39 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing to Review Conditions of Release and To Modify Conditions of Release by USA as to LISA CAMPOS Responses due by 12/4/2023. (HEIMBACH, NICHOLAS). Added MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release on 11/15/2023 (mnd).[2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
40 40 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing by Video by LISA CAMPOS Responses due by 12/4/2023. (BOBROW, DAVID) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
41 41 ORDER granting39 Motion for Hearing to Review Conditions of Release as to LISA CAMPOS (1). The Clerk's office is directed to set this matter for a video hearing as soon as feasible. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
42 42 ORDER granting40 Motion for Hearing by Video as to LISA CAMPOS (1). By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
43 43 NOTICE OF HEARING as to LISA CAMPOS Hearing to Review Conditions of Release set for 11/15/2023 11:00 AM in VIDEO HEARING before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
44 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF: Motion Hearing held as to LISA CAMPOS re39 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing to Review Conditions of Release and To Modify Conditions of Release filed by USA. Compliance Hearing held as to LISA CAMPOS. (Court Reporter: Tammy Martell) (lcb) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
45 45 ORDER granting39 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to LISA CAMPOS (1)ORDER amending Order Setting Conditions of Release (ECF No.36). Additional Condition of Release 7(g) is amended as follows: Reside as approved in advance by supervising officer, with placement by November 16 in a residential substance use treatment program. Defendant shall successfully complete the program and abide by all program rules. Travel limited to Southern District of New York. Travel to Maine prohibited except for court/legal purposes with advance approval from supervising officer. Additional Conditions of Release 7(p) and 7(q) are TERMINATED. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (lcb) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 18, 2023
46 46 MOTION for Warrant, MOTION to Revoke, MOTION for Detention by USA as to LISA CAMPOS(mtm) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Melanie Holton
47 47 ORDER granting46 Motion for Warrant; Sealed until Arrest or until Detainer is Lodged as to LISA CAMPOS (1) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (mtm) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
48 48 Arrest Warrant Issued by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF as to LISA CAMPOS. Warrant provided to U.S. Marshals Service. (mtm) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
Arrest of LISA CAMPOS in Southern District of New York. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00138-KFW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
(Access to document is restricted to case participants and public terminal) Unredacted Document Containing Jury Foreperson Signature re:49 Indictment as to LISA CAMPOS (jad)
Related: [-]
49 49 6 pgs INDICTMENT as to LISA CAMPOS (1) count(s) 1-3, 4-6, 7-9. (jad)
Related: [-]
50 50 SYNOPSIS as to LISA CAMPOS (jad)
Related: [-]