Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Natalie M Cox
Case #: 2:23-bk-15688
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Jan 25, 2024
Claims Deadline:Mar 04, 2024
Plan Confirmed:May 16, 2024

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Americare, Inc.
2500 W Sahara Ave Ste 206
Las Vegas, NV 89102-4367
Represented By
RYAN A. ANDERSEN
Andersen & Beede
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
CHAPTER 11 - LV
300 LAS VEGAS BLVD., SO. #4300
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11
300 LAS VEGAS BOULEVARD S. SUITE 4300
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
121 121 misc Post Confirmation Report/Chapter 11 Mon 04/21 3:20 PM
Post Confirmation Report/Chapter 11 Filed by RYAN A. ANDERSEN on behalf of AMERICARE, INC. (ANDERSEN, RYAN)
Related: [-]