Connecticut District Court
Judge:Janet C Hall
Referred: Robert A Richardson
Case #: 3:23-cv-01669
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2023
Re-opened:Nov 04, 2024
Terminated:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jun 21, 2024 4:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Viktor Berisha
Defendant
Roblen, LLC
Plaintiff
Milton Robinson Teletor Cojom
Represented By
Richard Rapice
Law Office Of Richard J. Rapice, LLC
contact info

GPO Apr 09 2025
RULING: For the reasons provided herein, the court grants the plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Doc. No. 20) in part. The court enters judgment on Counts One and Two in the amount of $58,070.26. The court enters judgment on Counts Three and Four in the amount of $214,293.22. Because these damages are duplicative, the court enters judgment in the amount of $214,293.22 in damages. The Court grants the Mr. Cojoms Motion for Attorneys' Fees (Doc. No. 26), and the court dismisses Counts Five through Seven of the Complaint without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Mr. Cojoms Motion to Withdraw Certain Claims (Doc. No. 33) is granted, and Counts Eight through Ten of the Complaint are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is ordered to enter judgment for the plaintiff in the amount of $214,293.22, $12,600 in attorneys fees, and $758 in costs, and close the case. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/9/2025. (DeRubeis, B.)

Docket last updated: 77 minutes ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
37 37 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/12 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Stich on behalf of Milton Robinson Teletor Cojom (Stich, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
36 36 order Judgment - Default Fri 04/11 3:36 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of Milton Robinson Teletor Cojom against Roblen, LLC, Viktor Berisha. Signed by Clerk on 4/11/2025. (Barry, L.)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Fri 04/11 3:37 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Barry, L.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
35 35 21 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Wed 04/09 4:58 PM
RULING: For the reasons provided herein, the court grants the plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Doc. No.20 ) in part. The court enters judgment on Counts One and Two in the amount of $58,070.26. The court enters judgment on Counts Three and Four in the amount of $214,293.22. Because these damages are duplicative, the court enters judgment in the amount of $214,293.22 in damages. The Court grants the Mr. Cojoms Motion for Attorneys' Fees (Doc. No.26 ), and the court dismisses Counts Five through Seven of the Complaint without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Mr. Cojoms Motion to Withdraw Certain Claims (Doc. No.33 ) is granted, and Counts Eight through Ten of the Complaint are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is ordered to enter judgment for the plaintiff in the amount of $214,293.22, $12,600 in attorneys fees, and $758 in costs, and close the case. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/9/2025. (DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
34 34 minutes Status Conference Mon 03/24 4:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/24/2025. Total Time: 10 minutes (Court Reporter Cassie Zayas.) (Barry, L.)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Withdraw Mon 03/24 2:06 PM
MOTION to Withdraw1 Complaint Certain Counts by Milton Robinson Teletor Cojom. (Rapice, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
32 32 utility Calendar Entry Fri 03/21 2:03 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Show Cause Hearing set for 3/24/2025 at 12:00 PM in Chambers Room 107, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Counsel are requested to participate in this conference, via telephone. Please use the following dial-in for this call: 202-503-1666. Access code: 692577389#. (Barry, L.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
31 31 misc Affidavit Tue 03/11 1:30 PM
Supplemental AFFIDAVIT re25 Supplemental MOTION for Declaratory Judgment ,26 MOTION for Attorney Fees & Default Judgment Signed By Richard Rapice filed by Milton Robinson Teletor Cojom. (Rapice, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
30 30 trial Witness List Thu 03/06 8:18 AM
Marked Witness List. (Barry, L.)
Related: [-]
29 29 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Default Judgment Wed 03/05 1:58 PM
Minute Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Motion Hearing held on 3/4/2025 re20 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Milton Robinson Teletor Cojom. Defendant did not appear. Counsel shall file an amended table of hourly calculations and supplement motion for attorney fees by 3/7/2025. Total Time: 37 minutes (Court Reporter Cassie Zayas.) (Barry, L.)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Order on Motion for Hearing Tue 03/04 11:22 AM
ORDER granting27 Motion for Hearing with Permission to Bring Translator. The motion is granted, in that the plaintiff is permitted to retain and use, at his own expense, a qualified interpreter. However, the court will not provide such an interpreter. Section 1827 of Title 28, the court only provides interpreters "in judicial proceedings instituted by the United States". 28 U.S.C. § 1827. "Interpreters services needed to assist parties in civil proceedings not instituted by the United States...are the responsibility of the parties to the action". Guide to Judiciary Policy, Vol. 5 at § 260. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/4/2025. (Barry, L.)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Hearing Tue 03/04 8:11 AM
MOTION for Hearing with Permission to Bring Translator by Milton Robinson Teletor Cojom. (Rapice, Richard)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Attorney Fees Tue 03/04 8:09 AM
MOTION for Attorney Fees by Milton Robinson Teletor Cojom.Responses due by 3/25/2025(Rapice, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Richard J. Rapice,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 3 Supplement Notice
25 25 motion Declaratory Judgment Tue 03/04 8:06 AM
Supplemental MOTION for Declaratory Judgment by Milton Robinson Teletor Cojom.Responses due by 3/25/2025 (Rapice, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
24 24 utility Calendar Entry - Motion Hearing Mon 02/03 4:01 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 2/20/2025 . Motion Hearing re:20 MOTION for Default Judgment has been changed to 3/4/2025 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. The plaintiff is expected to attend this hearing. (DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
23 23 utility Calendar Entry - Motion Hearing Wed 01/08 3:15 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2025 at 02:00 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall re:20 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Roblen LLC and Viktor Berisha (Barry, L.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
22 22 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Default Judgment Wed 01/08 3:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Motion Hearing held on 1/7/2025 re20 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Milton Robinson Teletor Cojom. Defendant did not appear. Counsel shall file a supplemental memorandum. Total Time: 19 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Barry, L.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
21 21 utility Calendar Entry - Motion Hearing Tue 12/10 2:02 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall re:20 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Roblen LLC and Viktor Berisha. (DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
20 20 motion Default Entry 55(a) Wed 12/04 10:31 PM
First MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Roblen LLC and Viktor Berisha by Milton Robinson Teletor Cojom.(Rapice, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, November 04, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a) Mon 11/04 3:11 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Default Entry 55(a). Motion for default judgment due by 12/4/2024. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/4/2024. (Barry, L.)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Docket Annotation Mon 11/04 3:08 PM
Docket Entry Correction re 15 Order granting14 Motion to Set Aside Default. Default against plaintiff for failure to prosecute is lifted. The clerk is directed to reopen this case. (Barry, L.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
16 16 motion Default Entry 55(a) Wed 10/30 11:13 AM
Second MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Roblen, LLC f/d/b/a Vicolo Pizza Restaurant and Viktor Berisha by Milton Robinson Teletor Cojom. (Rapice, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion to Set Aside Default Wed 10/16 4:03 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Set Aside Default. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/16/2024. (Barry, L.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
14 14 motion Set Aside Default Tue 10/15 10:58 AM
MOTION to Set Aside Default by Milton Robinson Teletor Cojom. (Rapice, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a) Mon 09/09 3:53 PM
ORDER: Motion for Default Entry 55(a)12 is denied. The case was dismissed for failure to prosecute, plaintiff having failed to respond to this court's order (Doc. No. 10). Plaintiff may seek to set aside the dismissal by showing case for failure to prosecute or to respond to the court's order, if he does so by September 30. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/9/2024. (Barry, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
12 12 motion Default Entry 55(a) Fri 09/06 2:05 PM
First MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Roblen, LLC f/d/b/a Vicolo Pizza Restaurant and Viktor Berisha by Milton Robinson Teletor Cojom.(Rapice, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Military Exhibit
Friday, May 24, 2024
11 11 order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/24 1:45 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The plaintiff having not responded to the Court's Order (Doc. No. 10 ) by May 21, 2024, and having failed to move for default entry against the defendants, and no request for an extension of time having been filed, it is hereby ordered that the case is dismissed for failure to prosecute, and failure to comply with the Court's Order. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/24/2024.(Barry, L.)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Fri 05/24 1:49 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Barry, L.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
10 10 order Order Tue 05/07 11:34 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff should explain by MAY 21, 2024, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and move for default against the defendants. Plaintiff commenced this action on December 23, 2023. On January 25, 2024, plaintiff filed a Return of Service, indicating the defendants were served on January 8, 2024, and answers were due on January 29, 2024. Certificate of Service (Doc No. 9). To date, the defendants have failed to appear and respond to the Complaint. Plaintiff's response is due by MAY 21, 2024. If plaintiff fails to respond and move for default entry by MAY 21, 2024, this case will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/7/2024. (DeRubeis, B.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
utility Update Answer Deadline Wed 02/14 3:22 PM
Answer deadline updated for Viktor Berisha to 1/29/2024; Roblen, LLC to 1/29/2024. (Barry, L)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
9 9 service Certificate of Service Thu 01/25 8:56 AM
First CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Milton Robinson Teletor Cojom (Rapice, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
8 8 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 12/26 3:00 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Viktor Berisha, Roblen, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Richard Rapice- Goldman Gruder & Woods, LLC* *200 Connecticut Avenue* *Norwalk, CT 06854*. (Sichanh, Christina)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Electronic Service Documents Tue 12/26 2:56 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of1 Complaint filed by Milton Robinson Teletor Cojom,4 Electronic Filing Order,5 Protective Order,3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,6 Order Signed by Clerk on 12/26/2023.(Sichanh, Christina)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 24, 2023
service Request to Issue Summons Sun 12/24 11:45 AM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Rapice, Richard)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 23, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order Tue 12/26 2:49 PM
STANDING ORDER re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/23/2023.(Sichanh, Christina)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Protective Order Tue 12/26 2:48 PM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/23/2023.(Sichanh, Christina)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Electronic Filing Order Tue 12/26 2:47 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/23/2023.(Sichanh, Christina)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Tue 12/26 2:46 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/21/2024 Discovery due by 6/23/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 7/28/2024 Signed by Clerk on 12/23/2023.(Sichanh, Christina)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 12/23 6:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Milton Cojom ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7593390.), filed by Milton Cojom.(Rapice, Richard)
Related: [-]
notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Tue 12/26 1:47 PM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 12/23/2023.(Maturo, F.)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 12/26 1:49 PM
Judge Janet C. Hall and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Maturo, F.)
Related: [-]