Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Federico A Moreno
Case #: 1:23-cv-24894
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Dec 26, 2023
Terminated:Jul 01, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 23, 2024 6:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Jeanette Ivankovich
Represented By
Ramses Jalalpour
Johnson & Bell, Ltd.
contact info
Alexandra Lyn Tifford
contact info
Joseph R. Marconi
Johnson & Bell, Ltd
contact info
Defendant
Schiller Ducanto & Fleck LLP
Represented By
Ramses Jalalpour
Johnson & Bell, Ltd.
contact info
Alexandra Lyn Tifford
contact info
Joseph R. Marconi
Johnson & Bell, Ltd
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Ivankovich
Represented By
Allison Rub-Rodriguez
Allison Rub-Rodriguez, P.A.
contact info
Jason Matthew Wandner
contact info

GPO Jul 01 2024
ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and denying as moot 12 Plaintiff's Motion for Remand. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/1/2024. See attached document for full details. (jl00)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
30 30 appeal USCA Order Wed 09/11 4:00 PM
ORDER of DISMISSAL from USCA. Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellant Steven Ivankovich is GRANTED by clerk re27 Notice of Appeal, filed by Steven Ivankovich. USCA 24-12480 F. (apz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Tue 09/03 9:03 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Steven Ivankovich (Wandner, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
28 28 appeal Acknowledgment of Receipt from USCA Mon 08/05 9:07 AM
Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re27 Notice of Appeal, filed by Steven Ivankovich. Date received by USCA: 8/2/2024. USCA Case Number: 24-12480 F. (apz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Thu 08/01 9:43 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re27 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
27 27 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 07/31 5:12 PM
Notice of Appeal as to26 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion to Remand to State Court by Steven Ivankovich. Filing fee $ 605.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17721820. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under All Forms and look for Transcript Order Form[LINK:www.flsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] .(Wandner, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 1Certificate of Interested Person
Monday, July 01, 2024
26 26 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Mon 07/01 1:07 PM
ORDER granting9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and denying as moot12 Plaintiff's Motion for Remand. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/1/2024. See attached document for full details. (jl00)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
25 25 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 05/08 2:18 PM
CORRECTED REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, filed by Jeanette Ivankovich, Schiller Ducanto & Fleck LLP. (Tifford, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
24 24 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 03/01 4:55 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting23 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Corrected Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/1/2024. (jl00)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
23 23 motion Leave to File Document Wed 02/21 2:45 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Jeanette Ivankovich, Schiller Ducanto & Fleck LLP.(Tifford, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, February 12, 2024
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 02/12 6:23 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jeanette Ivankovich, Schiller Ducanto & Fleck LLP. (Tifford, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
21 21 respm Response to Motion Mon 02/05 6:43 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re9 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM filed by Steven Ivankovich. Replies due by 2/12/2024. (Wandner, Jason)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Response to Motion Mon 02/05 3:55 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re12 Plaintiff's Corrected MOTION to Remand and Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1447 (C), and Alternatively,MOTION for the Court to Abstain and Remand the Court to State Court filed by Jeanette Ivankovich, Schiller Ducanto & Fleck LLP. Replies due by 2/12/2024.(Tifford, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Thursday, February 01, 2024
19 19 misc Status Report Thu 02/01 10:49 AM
STATUS REPORT Defendants' Removal Status Report by Jeanette Ivankovich, Schiller Ducanto & Fleck LLP(Tifford, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 01/23 5:45 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying10 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. However, the Response to12 Plaintiff's Corrected Motion to Remand is due 2/5/2024. Plaintiff has until that date (2/5/2024) to respond to the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/23/2024. (jl00)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Tue 01/23 5:39 PM
ORDER denying as withdrawn11 Plaintiff's Motion for Remand. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/23/2024. See attached document for full details. (jl00)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Tue 01/23 1:32 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re10 MOTION for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS re9 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Filer Selected the Wrong Motion Relief(s) ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/23 11:32 AM
ORDER granting4 and5 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (jl00)
Related: [-]
14 14 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 01/23 10:13 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (jl00)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
13 13 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Mon 01/22 2:48 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re11 MOTION to Remand and Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1447 (C), and Alternatively,MOTION for the Court to Abstain and Remand the Court to State Court,12 Plaintiff's Corrected MOTION to Remand and Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1447 (C), and Alternatively,MOTION for the Court to Abstain and Remand the Court to State Court. Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief ; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. Filer Selected the Wrong Motion Relief(s) ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (jas)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Attorney Fees Remand to State Court Mon 01/22 1:26 PM
Plaintiff's Corrected MOTION to Remand and Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1447 (C), and Alternatively, MOTION for the Court to Abstain and Remand the Court to State Court by Steven Ivankovich. (Wandner, Jason) Added MOTION to Remand to State Court on 1/22/2024 (jas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 01/19 8:12 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND AND ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1447 ( C); AND ALTERNATIVELY FOR THE COURT TO ABSTAIN AND REMAND THE COURT TO STATE COURT re1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by Steven Ivankovich. (Wandner, Jason)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time Fri 01/19 4:30 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS re9 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Steven Ivankovich. Responses due by 2/2/2024. (Wandner, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 01/05 11:41 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jeanette Ivankovich, Schiller Ducanto & Fleck LLP. Responses due by 1/19/2024(Tifford, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 01/05 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Matthew Wandner on behalf of Steven Ivankovich. Attorney Jason Matthew Wandner added to party Steven Ivankovich(pty:pla). (Wandner, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 01/04 12:34 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting6 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for 3-Day Extension to Respond to Complaint. Deadline is 1/5/2024. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/4/2024. (jl00)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 01/02 11:47 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by Jeanette Ivankovich, Schiller Ducanto & Fleck LLP.(Tifford, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 29, 2023
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Fri 12/29 1:58 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ramses Jalalpour. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17176977 by Jeanette Ivankovich, Schiller Ducanto & Fleck LLP. Responses due by 1/12/2024(Tifford, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Fri 12/29 1:50 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joseph R. Marconi. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17176928 by Jeanette Ivankovich, Schiller Ducanto & Fleck LLP. Responses due by 1/12/2024(Tifford, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
3 3 misc Bar Letter Wed 12/27 1:10 PM
Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Allison Rub-Rodriguez, mailing date December 27, 2023, (pt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 12/27 11:54 AM
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (caw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Tue 12/26 6:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF THAT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ASSETS ARE NOT ASSETS OF STEVEN IVANKOVICH; DECLARATION OF RIGHTS OF JEANETTE IVANKOVICH IF ANY MARITAL RIGHTS TO MEMBERSHIP INTERESTS IN LIMITED LIABILITY ENTITIES; AND DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS' OBLIGATION TO COMPLY WITH THE CHARGING ORDER ENTERED BY THIS COURT; PRELIMINARY AND PERMENANT INJUNCTION) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17169307, filed by Schiller Ducanto & Fleck LLP, Jeanette Ivankovich.(Tifford, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet