Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Steven D Merryday
Referred: Julie S Sneed
Case #: 8:23-cv-02965
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
CauseAmericans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Dec 26, 2023
Terminated:Apr 04, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 23, 2024 4:59 AM EDT
Defendant
Jim N Nicks Niceville, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth M. Rodriguez
Fordharrison
contact info
Mediator
Charles N. Castagna
Represented By
Charles N. Castagna
Charles N. Castagna Mediation, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Shawn Gettinger
Represented By
Justin Zeig
Zeig Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 17, 2024
22 22 order Order Fri 05/17 4:20 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: In accord with the parties' stipulation (Doc. 21 ), the action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/17/2024. (CJR)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 05/17 2:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Shawn Gettinger. (Zeig, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
20 20 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 04/05 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
19 19 order Order Thu 04/04 3:04 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The parties announce (Doc. 18 ) a settlement. Under Local Rule 3.09(b), this action is DISMISSED subject to the right of any party within sixty days (1) to submit a stipulated form of final order or (2) to move to vacate the dismissal for good cause. The clerk must close the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/4/2024. (CJR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of settlement Wed 04/03 2:19 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Shawn Gettinger (Zeig, Justin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Mon 03/18 4:44 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on May 31, 2024, at 10:30 am before Charles N. Castagna.(Zeig, Justin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
16 16 6 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Mon 03/11 3:40 PM
ORDER appointing Charles N. Castagna as mediator; designating Justin Zeig as lead counsel; directing lead counsel to coordinate the date and time of mediation and to file a notice of mediation within seven days after this order; directing the parties to mediate no later than May 31, 2024. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/11/2024. (CJR)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 03/11 3:37 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: A separate order will schedule the pre-trial conference in February 2025; jury trial set for March 2025 trial calendar in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/11/2024. (CJR)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
14 14 misc Case Management Report Fri 03/08 4:53 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Saks, Yaakov)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
13 13 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/04 3:48 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 8:23-cv-02965-SDM-UAM. Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed no longer assigned to the case. (SAO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
12 12 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 02/01 10:03 AM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 01/31 4:06 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Jim N Nicks Niceville, LLC. Related case(s): No (Rodriguez, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/31 4:04 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jim N Nicks Niceville, LLC. (Rodriguez, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 01/31 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Elizabeth M. Rodriguez on behalf of Jim N Nicks Niceville, LLC. Lead Counsel: Elizabeth M. Rodriguez. (Rodriguez, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/31 3:57 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Jim N Nicks Niceville, LLC.(Rodriguez, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
7 7 service Summons returned executed Fri 01/19 12:33 PM
RETURN of service executed on 1/10/2024 by Shawn Gettinger as to Jim N Nicks Niceville, LLC. (Zeig, Justin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 01/02 3:06 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Shawn Gettinger. Related case(s): No (Zeig, Justin)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/02 3:05 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 3 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Shawn Gettinger. (Zeig, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
4 4 service Summons issued Fri 12/29 8:43 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Jim N Nicks Niceville, LLC. (LD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 12/28 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2). -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. - (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 12/27 8:35 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:23-cv-02965-SDM-JSS. (AM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/26 6:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Jim N Nicks Niceville, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21598337) filed by Shawn Gettinger.(Zeig, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons