Consolidated
Lead case: 1:25-md-03143

New York Southern District Court
Judge:Sidney H Stein
Referred: Ona T Wang
Case #: 1:23-cv-11195
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jun 24, 2024 4:23 AM EDT
Defendant
OpenAI GP, LLC
Represented By
R. James Slaughter
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Sarah Salomon
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Sarang Damle
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Michelle S. Ybarra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allison Levine Stillman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Nicholas S Goldberg
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Eric Nikolaides
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Rose Lee
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Luke Budiardjo
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Vera Ranieri
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Allyson R. Bennett
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Robert A. Van Nest
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Thomas Edward Gorman
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Elana Nightingale Dawson
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Andrew Gass
Latham & Watkins, Llp (sanfran)
contact info
Katie Lynn Joyce
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Joseph C. Gratz
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Paven Malhotra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Defendant
OpenAI Global LLC
Represented By
R. James Slaughter
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Sarah Salomon
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Sarang Damle
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Michelle S. Ybarra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allison Levine Stillman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Nicholas S Goldberg
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Eric Nikolaides
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Rose Lee
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Luke Budiardjo
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Vera Ranieri
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Allyson R. Bennett
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Robert A. Van Nest
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Thomas Edward Gorman
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Elana Nightingale Dawson
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Andrew Gass
Latham & Watkins, Llp (sanfran)
contact info
Katie Lynn Joyce
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Joseph C. Gratz
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Paven Malhotra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Defendant
OpenAI Holdings, LLC
Represented By
R. James Slaughter
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Sarah Salomon
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Sarang Damle
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Michelle S. Ybarra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allison Levine Stillman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Nicholas S Goldberg
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Eric Nikolaides
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Rose Lee
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Luke Budiardjo
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Vera Ranieri
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Allyson R. Bennett
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Robert A. Van Nest
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Thomas Edward Gorman
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Elana Nightingale Dawson
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Andrew Gass
Latham & Watkins, Llp (sanfran)
contact info
Katie Lynn Joyce
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Joseph C. Gratz
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Paven Malhotra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Defendant
OpenAI LLC
Represented By
R. James Slaughter
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Sarah Salomon
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Sarang Damle
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Michelle S. Ybarra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allison Levine Stillman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Nicholas S Goldberg
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Eric Nikolaides
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Rose Lee
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Luke Budiardjo
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Vera Ranieri
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Allyson R. Bennett
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Robert A. Van Nest
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Thomas Edward Gorman
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Elana Nightingale Dawson
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Andrew Gass
Latham & Watkins, Llp (sanfran)
contact info
Katie Lynn Joyce
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Joseph C. Gratz
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Paven Malhotra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Defendant
OpenAI LP
Represented By
R. James Slaughter
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Sarah Salomon
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Sarang Damle
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Michelle S. Ybarra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allison Levine Stillman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Nicholas S Goldberg
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Eric Nikolaides
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Rose Lee
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Luke Budiardjo
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Vera Ranieri
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Allyson R. Bennett
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Robert A. Van Nest
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Thomas Edward Gorman
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Elana Nightingale Dawson
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Andrew Gass
Latham & Watkins, Llp (sanfran)
contact info
Katie Lynn Joyce
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Joseph C. Gratz
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Paven Malhotra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Defendant
OpenAI OpCo LLC
Represented By
R. James Slaughter
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Sarah Salomon
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Sarang Damle
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Michelle S. Ybarra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allison Levine Stillman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Nicholas S Goldberg
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Eric Nikolaides
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Rose Lee
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Luke Budiardjo
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Vera Ranieri
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Allyson R. Bennett
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Robert A. Van Nest
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Thomas Edward Gorman
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Elana Nightingale Dawson
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Andrew Gass
Latham & Watkins, Llp (sanfran)
contact info
Katie Lynn Joyce
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Joseph C. Gratz
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Paven Malhotra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Defendant
OpenAI, Inc.
Represented By
R. James Slaughter
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Sarah Salomon
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Sarang Damle
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Michelle S. Ybarra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allison Levine Stillman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Nicholas S Goldberg
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Eric Nikolaides
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Rose Lee
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Luke Budiardjo
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Vera Ranieri
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Allyson R. Bennett
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Robert A. Van Nest
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Thomas Edward Gorman
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Elana Nightingale Dawson
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Andrew Gass
Latham & Watkins, Llp (sanfran)
contact info
Katie Lynn Joyce
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Joseph C. Gratz
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Paven Malhotra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Defendant
Microsoft Corporation
Represented By
Sheryl Koval Garko
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Annette Louise Hurst
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp (san Francisco)
contact info
Jared Barrett Briant
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Laura Brooks Najemy
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Christopher Cariello
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Jeffrey S. Jacobson
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
OAI Corporation, LLC
Represented By
R. James Slaughter
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Sarah Salomon
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr.,
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Sarang Damle
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Michelle S. Ybarra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Allison Levine Stillman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Nicholas S Goldberg
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Eric Nikolaides
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Rose Lee
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Luke Budiardjo
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Vera Ranieri
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Allyson R. Bennett
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Robert A. Van Nest
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Thomas Edward Gorman
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Elana Nightingale Dawson
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Andrew Gass
Latham & Watkins, Llp (sanfran)
contact info
Katie Lynn Joyce
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Joseph C. Gratz
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Paven Malhotra
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
The New York Times Company
620 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Katherine Marie Peaslee
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Zachary B. Savage
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Genevieve Vose Wallace
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Ian B. Crosby
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Ellie Rae Dupler
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Scarlett Collings
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Eudokia Spanos
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Davida Brook
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Emily K. Cronin
Susman Godfrey LLP
contact info
Kristen Logan
Rothwell Figg Erst & Manbeck, P.C.
contact info
Jennifer Maisel
Rothwell Figg Ernst & Manbeck, P.C.
contact info
Steven M Lieberman
Rothwell Figg Ernst & Manbeck PC
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Ta-Nehisi Coates
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Junot Daz
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Christopher Golden
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Andrew Sean Greer
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
David Henry Hwang
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Richard Kadrey
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Matthew Klam
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Laura Lippman
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Sarah Silverman
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Rachel Louise Snyder
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Paul Tremblay
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Ayelet Waldman
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Jacqueline Woodson
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Michael Chabon
Represented By
Christopher James Hydal
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
548 548 order Scheduling Order Mon 05/12 3:20 PM
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the News Plaintiffs' supplemental letter, (ECF 21-1), Defendants' response at ECF 24, and the News Plaintiffs' letter at ECF 29 (see also ECF 28). The Court will hold an In-Person Status Conference for all actions under 25-md-3143 regarding potential spoliation motions for the deletion of output log data on May 27, 2025, at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. The parties may submit supplemental briefing related to the deletion of output log data only, in accordance with the following schedule: (1) the News Plaintiffs' supplemental letter is due by Friday, May 16, 2025, and (2) Defendants' supplemental opposition is due by Friday, May 23, 2025. The parties' supplemental briefing is limited to 10 pages. Status Conference set for 5/27/2025 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 5/12/2025) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-11195-SHS-OTW (rro)
Related: [-]
547 547 motion Seal Mon 05/12 1:22 PM
MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Supplemental Letter regarding OpenAIs destruction of output log data . Document filed by Chicago Tribune Company, LLC, DP Media Network, LLC, Daily News LP, Northwest Publications, LLC, ORB Publishing, LLC, Orlando Sentinel Communications Company, LLC, San Jose Mercury-News, LLC, Sun-sentinel Company, LLC, The Center for Investigative Reporting, Inc., The New York Times Company, The New York Times Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-11195-SHS-OTW.(Lieberman, Steven)
Related: [-]
546 546 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 05/12 1:05 PM
LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Steven Lieberman, Ian B. Crosby and Matt Topic dated May 12, 2025 re: (379 in 1:23-cv-11195-SHS-OTW) LETTER MOTION to Compel OpenAI to To preserve output log data on a going-forward basis addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Steven Lieberman and Ian Crosby dated January 13, 2025., (483 in 1:23-cv-11195-SHS-OTW) LETTER MOTION to Compel OpenAI to identify destroyed output logs addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Steven Lieberman and Ian Crosby dated March 25, 2025. . Document filed by Chicago Tribune Company, LLC, DP Media Network, LLC, Daily News LP, Northwest Publications, LLC, ORB Publishing, LLC, Orlando Sentinel Communications Company, LLC, San Jose Mercury-News, LLC, Sun-sentinel Company, LLC, The Center for Investigative Reporting, Inc., The New York Times Company, The New York Times Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-11195-SHS-OTW.(Lieberman, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit J. Maisel Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - March 31, 2025, letter Elana Nightingale Dawson sent on behalf of OpenAI to J. Maisel,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - April 30, 2025, email chain between counsel for News Plaintiffs and counsel for OpenAI.,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Dr. Lillian Dais declaration describing her and her teams review and analysis of OpenAIs output log metadata,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - April 2, 2025, letter J. Maisel sent on behalf of News Plaintiffs to Elana Nightingale Dawson, counsel for OpenAI
545 545 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 05/12 12:44 PM
***EX-PARTE***LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Steven Lieberman, Ian B. Crosby and Matt Topic dated May 12, 2025 re: (379 in 1:23-cv-11195-SHS-OTW) LETTER MOTION to Compel OpenAI to To preserve output log data on a going-forward basis addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Steven Lieberman and Ian Crosby dated January 13, 2025., (483 in 1:23-cv-11195-SHS-OTW) LETTER MOTION to Compel OpenAI to identify destroyed output logs addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Steven Lieberman and Ian Crosby dated March 25, 2025. . Document filed by Chicago Tribune Company, LLC, DP Media Network, LLC, Daily News LP, Northwest Publications, LLC, ORB Publishing, LLC, Orlando Sentinel Communications Company, LLC, San Jose Mercury-News, LLC, Sun-sentinel Company, LLC, The Center for Investigative Reporting, Inc., The New York Times Company, The New York Times Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-11195-SHS-OTWMotion or Order to File Under Seal:540 .(Lieberman, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit J. Maisel Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - March 31, 2025, letter Elana Nightingale Dawson sent on behalf of OpenAI to J. Maisel,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - April 30, 2025, email chain between counsel for News Plaintiffs and counsel for OpenAI.,
Att: 4 Exhibit - Dr. Lillian Dais declaration describing her and her teams review and analysis of OpenAIs output log metadata,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - April 2, 2025, letter J. Maisel sent on behalf of News Plaintiffs to Elana Nightingale Dawson, counsel for OpenAI
544 544 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 05/12 12:23 PM
LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Steven Lieberman, Ian B. Crosby and Matt Topic dated May 12, 2025 re: (379 in 1:23-cv-11195-SHS-OTW) LETTER MOTION to Compel OpenAI to To preserve output log data on a going-forward basis addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Steven Lieberman and Ian Crosby dated January 13, 2025., (483 in 1:23-cv-11195-SHS-OTW) LETTER MOTION to Compel OpenAI to identify destroyed output logs addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Steven Lieberman and Ian Crosby dated March 25, 2025. . Document filed by Chicago Tribune Company, LLC, DP Media Network, LLC, Daily News LP, ORB Publishing, LLC, Orlando Sentinel Communications Company, LLC, San Jose Mercury-News, LLC, Sun-sentinel Company, LLC, The Center for Investigative Reporting, Inc., The New York Times Company, The New York Times Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-11195-SHS-OTW.(Lieberman, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit J. Masisel Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - March 31, 2025, letter Elana Nightingale Dawson sent on behalf of OpenAI to me,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - April 30, 2025, email chain between counsel for News Plaintiffs and counsel for OpenAI.,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Dr. Lillian Dais declaration describing her and her teams review and analysis of OpenAIs output log metadata,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - April 2, 2025, letter I sent on behalf of News Plaintiffs to Elana Nightingale Dawson, counsel for OpenAI
Friday, May 09, 2025
543 543 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Fri 05/09 6:30 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (21) in case 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Plaintiffs may file their supplemental letter to Judge Wang on the docket. Any sealing motions related to plaintiffs' letter should be addressed to Judge Wang. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/9/2025) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-11195-SHS-OTW (jca) Modified on 5/9/2025 (jca). Modified on 5/10/2025 (lab).
Related: [-]
542 542 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 05/09 3:49 PM
ORDER: The Court will hold an In-Person Discovery Status Conference for all actions under 25-md-3143 on May 27, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. The parties to each case or consolidated case are directed to file a joint dispute chart by May 20, 2025. For any parties new to this Court, joint dispute charts should identify: (1) the relevant dispute, (2) each party's position in no more than two short paragraphs,1 (3) the relevant ECF numbers for such dispute (including oppositions and replies), and (4) hyperlinks2 to relevant ECF filings cited. As the Court has noted before, (see, e.g., Case No. 23-cv-8292, ECF 321), the parties should NOT include any "issues" for which the parties have not fully engaged in the meet and confer process; any such disputes will be denied outright. The parties are encouraged to refer to previous joint dispute charts filed in Case Nos. 23-cv-8292 and 23-cv-11195 for formatting. (See, e.g., 23-cv-8292, ECF No. 397; 23-cv-11195, ECF No. 518). The Court will issue a separate order regarding the News Plaintiffs' supplemental letter re: potential spoliation of output log data. SO ORDERED. ( Discovery Hearing set for 5/27/2025 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 5/9/2025) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW et al. (jjc)
Related: [-]
541 541 misc Letter Fri 05/09 12:07 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Elana Nightingale Dawson, Edward A. Bayley, and Joseph C. Gratz dated May 8, 2025 re: Letter Response to News Plaintiffs' Request for Permission to File Supplemental Letter Regarding Certain Private User Conversation Data (ECF 21). Document filed by OAI Corporation, LLC, OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI LP, OpenAI OpCo LLC, OpenAI, Inc., OpenAI, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-11195-SHS-OTW.(Nightingale Dawson, Elana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
540 540 motion Seal Wed 05/07 7:37 PM
MOTION to Seal Request for Permission to File Supplemental Letter . Document filed by Chicago Tribune Company, LLC, DP Media Network, LLC, Daily News LP, ORB Publishing, LLC, San Jose Mercury-News, LLC, Sun-sentinel Company, LLC, The Center for Investigative Reporting, Inc., The New York Times Company, The New York Times Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-11195-SHS-OTW.(Lieberman, Steven)
Related: [-]
539 539 misc Letter Wed 05/07 6:59 PM
***EX-PARTE*** LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Steven Lieberman, Ian B. Crosby and Matt Topic dated 05/07/2025 re: Requesting Permission to File Supplemental Letter. Document filed by Chicago Tribune Company, LLC, DP Media Network, LLC, Daily News LP, Northwest Publications, LLC, ORB Publishing, LLC, San Jose Mercury-News, LLC, The Center for Investigative Reporting, Inc., The New York Times Company, The New York Times Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-11195-SHS-OTWMotion or Order to File Under Seal:127 .(Lieberman, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter to Hon. Ona T. Wang
538 538 misc Letter Wed 05/07 6:31 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Steven Lieberman, Ian B. Crosby and Matt Topic dated 05/07/2025 re: Requesting Permission to File Supplemental Letter. Document filed by Chicago Tribune Company, LLC, DP Media Network, LLC, Daily News LP, Northwest Publications, LLC, ORB Publishing, LLC, San Jose Mercury-News, LLC, Sun-sentinel Company, LLC, The Center for Investigative Reporting, Inc., The New York Times Company, The New York Times Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW, 1:23-cv-11195-SHS-OTW.(Lieberman, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter to Hon. Ona T. Wang
537 537 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 05/07 5:50 PM
ORDER denying (18) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW. OpenAIs request for an adjournment of the initial case management conference scheduled for May 22 at 10:00 a.m. [Doc. No. 18] is denied. Mr. Van Nest may appear by MS Teams as long as OpenAI has an attorney in the courtroom with authority to speak on behalf of OpenAI. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/7/2025) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW et al. (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
536 536 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 05/06 7:51 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for May 22, 2025 by OpenAI addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Robert A. Van Nest, Herman Yue, and Joseph C. Gratz dated May 6, 2025. Document filed by OpenAI Inc., OpenAI OpCo LLC, OAI Corporation LLC, OAI Corporation, LLC, OpenAI GP LLC, OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Global, L.L.C., OpenAI Holdings LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI LLC, OpenAI LP, OpenAI OpCo LLC(a Delaware limited liability corporation), OpenAI OpCo, L.L.C., OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC(a Delaware limited liability company), OpenAI Startup Fund I LP, OpenAI Startup Fund I LP(a Delaware limited partnership), OpenAI Startup Fund Management LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund Management LLC(a Delaware limited liability company), OpenAI, Inc., OpenAI, Inc. Copyright Infringement Litigation, OpenAI, LLC, OpenAI GP LLC, OpenAI Inc., OpenAI LP(a Delaware limited partnership).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW et al..(Van Nest, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
535 535 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/06 3:14 PM
MOTION for Brian M. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by OAI Corporation, LLC, OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI, LLC, OpenAI Inc., OpenAI LP, OpenAI OpCo LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund I LP, OpenAI Startup Fund Mangement, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW et al..(Kramer, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Brian M. Kramer,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Brian Kramer PHV Admission
misc Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/06 9:53 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. (16 in 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW) MOTION for Brian M. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-31034919. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Affidavit must be stamped and notarized;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW et al.(rju)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 05/06 3:29 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (535 in 1:23-cv-11195-SHS-OTW, 160 in 1:24-cv-01515-SHS-OTW, 45 in 1:25-cv-03291-SHS-OTW, 413 in 1:23-cv-08292-SHS-OTW, 17 in 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW, 77 in 1:25-cv-03297-SHS-OTW, 144 in 1:24-cv-01514-SHS-OTW) MOTION for Brian M. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW et al.(rju)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
534 534 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/05 8:24 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Brian M. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-31034919. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI, Inc., OpenAI GP LLC, OpenAI Inc., OpenAI LP, OpenAI OpCo LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund I LP, OpenAI Startup Fund Mangement, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW et al..(Kramer, Brian) Modified on 5/6/2025 (rju).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Brian M. Kramer,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order
533 533 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/05 8:06 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Drew Alan Hillier on behalf of OAI Corporation, LLC, OpenAI GP, LLC, OpenAI Global LLC, OpenAI Holdings, LLC, OpenAI, Inc., OpenAI, LLC, OpenAI LP, OpenAI OpCo LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund GP I LLC, OpenAI Startup Fund I LP, OpenAI Startup Fund Mangement, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:25-md-03143-SHS-OTW et al..(Hillier, Drew)
Related: [-]