Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Timothy J Savage
Referred: Scott W Reid
Case #: 2:23-cv-05126
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2023
Terminated:Feb 11, 2025
Case in other court:Court of Common Pleas of Chester County, 23-08132-TT
Last checked: Monday Jun 24, 2024 4:26 AM EDT
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER BASHORE
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER GALLAGHER
Thomas Thomas And Hafer LLP
contact info
Paul Alexander
Thomas, Thomas & Hafer LLP
contact info
Defendant
WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP
1025 Paoli Pike
West Chester, PA 19380
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER GALLAGHER
Thomas Thomas And Hafer LLP
contact info
Paul Alexander
Thomas, Thomas & Hafer LLP
contact info
Defendant
WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER GALLAGHER
Thomas Thomas And Hafer LLP
contact info
Paul Alexander
Thomas, Thomas & Hafer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DOREEN WOODWARD
Represented By
Max H. Dehon
Saltz Mongeluzzi Bendesky P.C.
contact info
FRANCIS C. MILLER
contact info
JEFFREY P. GOODMAN
Saltz Mongeluzzi & Bendesky PC
contact info
SAMUEL B. DORDICK
Saltz Mongeluzzi & Bendesky PC
contact info
E. DOUGLAS DISANDRO, JR.
Dashevsky Horwitz Kuhn Novello
contact info

GPO Jun 25 2024
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/25/24. 6/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
GPO Jun 25 2024
ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/25/24. 6/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
GPO Feb 11 2025
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/11/25. 2/12/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
GPO Feb 11 2025
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/11/25. 2/12/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)

Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
40 40 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Wed 02/12 9:59 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/11/25. 2/12/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
Related: [-]
39 39 12 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Wed 02/12 9:51 AM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 2/11/25. 2/12/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
38 38 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 02/04 3:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGEin Courtroom 9A. Motion Hearing held on 2/4/25. Court Reporter: Bobbie Shanfelder. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
37 37 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/27 3:51 PM
ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS SCHEDULED FOR 2/4/2025 AT 11:30 AM IN COURTROOM 9A BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/27/25. 1/27/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
36 36 15 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/25 1:31 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re29 MOTION to Preclude filed by DOREEN WOODWARD.(DORDICK, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-D,
Att: 2 Exhibit E-F
Friday, October 18, 2024
35 35 19 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 10/18 3:00 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re28 MOTION for Summary Judgment WITH SUPPORTING BRIEF filed by CHRISTOPHER BASHORE, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS.(Alexander, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Certificate of Service
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
34 34 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 10/16 11:06 AM
ORDER THAT ALL REMAINING DEADLINES IN THE 6/13/24 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER ARE STAYED PENDING DISPOSITION OF THE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/15/24. 10/16/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
33 33 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 10/15 4:11 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Second Amended Complaint filed by DEFENDANTS CHRISTOPHER BASHORE, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP and WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS. (mbh)
Related: [-]
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 10/15 4:07 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER OUT-OF-TIME IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT A TO THE MOTION IS DEEMED FILED AS OF THIS DATE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 10/15/24. 10/15/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Leave to File Document Tue 10/15 10:07 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Answer filed by CHRISTOPHER BASHORE, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS.Motion for Leave to File Answer Out of Time.(Alexander, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Brief,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit A
Friday, October 11, 2024
30 30 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/11 9:21 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re28 MOTION for Summary Judgment WITH SUPPORTING BRIEF filed by DOREEN WOODWARD.(DORDICK, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 60 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 25 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 2 pgs Exhibit F,
Att: 7 281 pgs Exhibit G,
Att: 8 100 pgs Exhibit H,
Att: 9 133 pgs Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 230 pgs Exhibit K,
Att: 12 2 pgs Exhibit L,
Att: 13 2 pgs Exhibit M,
Att: 14 9 pgs Exhibit N,
Att: 15 4 pgs Exhibit O,
Att: 16 75 pgs Exhibit P,
Att: 17 128 pgs Exhibit Q
Friday, October 04, 2024
29 29 motion Preclude Fri 10/04 4:43 PM
MOTION to Preclude filed by CHRISTOPHER BASHORE, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS.Brief and Certificate of Service.(Alexander, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 6 3 pgs Exhibit Exhibit E
Friday, September 27, 2024
28 28 motion Summary Judgment Fri 09/27 3:56 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment WITH SUPPORTING BRIEF filed by CHRISTOPHER BASHORE, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS.Brief, Cert of Service.(Alexander, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 15 pgs Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 29 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 4 88 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 35 pgs Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I,
Att: 11 32 pgs Exhibit J,
Att: 12 Exhibit K
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Tue 06/25 3:04 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/25/24. 6/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
26 26 12 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Tue 06/25 2:59 PM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/25/24. 6/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
25 25 order Scheduling Order Fri 06/14 8:50 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED NO LATER 7/19/24. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY 9/27/24. DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 10/4/24. NO LATER THAN 11/1/24 EACH PARTY SHALL FILE WITH THE CLERK OF COURT A PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED BY 11/8/24. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 11/26/24 AT 10:00 AM IN CHAMBERS. THIS CASE WILL BE LISTED FOR TRIAL ON 11/28/24 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 9A. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/13/24. 6/14/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 06/13 7:43 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by CHRISTOPHER BASHORE, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS.Certificate of Service.(GALLAGHER, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Schedule of Deadlines,
Att: 2 Complaint Certificate of Compliance,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order Wed 06/12 4:26 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S 4/8/24 LETTER, WHICH SHALL BE TREATED AS A MOTION TO COMPEL, AND THE DEFENDANTS' INVOCATION OF THE ATTORNEY CLIENT AND WORK PRODUCT PRIVILEGES, AND AFTER AN IN CAMERA REVIEW, IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/12/24. 6/12/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/30 8:38 AM
ORDER THAT A MOTION HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS15 SET FOR 6/10/2024 09:30 AM IN Courtroom 9A BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 5/29/24. 5/30/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
21 21 minutes Discovery Hearing Mon 04/08 4:44 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. Conference re: discovery dispute held on 4/8/24. (mbh)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/08 12:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Alexander on behalf of CHRISTOPHER BASHORE, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS with Certificate of Service(Alexander, Paul)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/08 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by E. DOUGLAS DISANDRO, JR on behalf of DOREEN WOODWARD (DISANDRO, E.)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Letter Mon 04/08 9:08 AM
Letter dated 4/8/2024 by DOREEN WOODWARD. (Dehon, Max)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
17 17 8 pgs respm Response in Support of Motion Thu 02/29 11:39 AM
RESPONSE in Support re15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by CHRISTOPHER BASHORE, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS.(GALLAGHER, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, February 23, 2024
16 16 28 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 02/23 3:29 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by DOREEN WOODWARD. (DORDICK, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
15 15 motion Dismiss Fri 02/09 11:19 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by CHRISTOPHER BASHORE, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS.Brief in Support of Motion, Order and Certificate of Service.(GALLAGHER, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 30 pgs Brief,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Wed 01/31 9:33 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 6/21/24. COUNSEL SHALL PARTICIPATE IN A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY 8/30/24. DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 9/6/24. NO LATER THAN 10/4/24 EACH PARTY SHALL FILE WITH THE CLERK OF COURT A PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED BY 10/11/24. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 10/29/24 AT 10:00 AM IN CHAMBERS. THIS CASE WILL BE LISTED FOR TRIAL ON 10/31/24 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 9A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/30/24. 1/31/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
13 13 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 01/30 12:11 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. In Person Pretrial Conference held on 1/30/24. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 01/25 2:51 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/25/24. 1/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
11 11 misc Report Of Wed 01/24 3:00 PM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by DOREEN WOODWARD. (DORDICK, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 01/24 12:21 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against CHRISTOPHER BASHORE, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS, filed by DOREEN WOODWARD.(GOODMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 01/17 9:27 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 1/24/2024. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/16/24. 1/17/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Stipulation Tue 01/16 11:46 AM
STIPULATION CONSENTING TO PLAINTIFF'S FILING OF A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by DOREEN WOODWARD. (DORDICK, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
7 7 motion Dismiss Wed 01/03 11:45 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by CHRISTOPHER BASHORE, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS.Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Certificate of Service.(GALLAGHER, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Brief,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/03 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Max Dehon on behalf of DOREEN WOODWARD with Certificate of Service(Dehon, Max)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/03 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL B. DORDICK on behalf of DOREEN WOODWARD with Certificate of Service(DORDICK, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/03 11:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY P. GOODMAN on behalf of DOREEN WOODWARD with Certificate of Service(GOODMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
3 3 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 12/28 12:20 PM
ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, JANUARY 30, 2024, AT 9:00 A.M., IN CHAMBERS, ROOM 9400. ALL MOTIONS TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT AND TO JOIN OR ADD ADDITIONAL PARTIES SHALL BE FILED WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; THE PARTIES SHALL MAKE THE REQUIRED INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 26(A) WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 24, 2024, COUNSEL SHALL COMPLETE AND FILE WITH THE CLERK THE REQUIRED REPORT OF RULE 26(F) MEETING INCORPORATING ALL THE INFORMATION DESCRIBED IN THE ATTACHED FORM REPORT, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/28/23. 12/28/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Thu 12/28 11:14 AM
NOTICE by CHRISTOPHER BASHORE, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP BOARD OF SUPERVISORS re1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), Designation Form (GALLAGHER, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Attorney) Wed 12/27 11:20 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by West Goshen Township Board of Supervisors, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP, Christopher Bashore (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17154282), filed by West Goshen Township Board of Supervisors, WEST GOSHEN TOWNSHIP, Christopher Bashore.(GALLAGHER, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C
misc Attorney Required Forms Wed 12/27 11:38 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Form is missing. (sbt)
Related: [-]