Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Amos L Mazzant, III
Referred: Bill Davis
Case #: 4:23-cv-01143
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2023
Terminated:Dec 02, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jun 24, 2024 3:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Western Extrusions
1725 Sandy Lake Road
Carrollton, TX 75006
Plaintiff
Don E. Thompson, Jr.
4141 Rosemeade Pkwy #116
Dallas, TX 75287


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, December 02, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Mon 12/02 10:16 AM
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE7 . It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff Thompson's claims against Defendant Western Extrusions are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and the Clerk is directed to close this civil action. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/2/2024. (xl)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
9 9 misc Mail Returned Undeliverable Mon 11/25 9:59 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order7 sent to Don E. Thompson, Jr. returned marked "RETURN TO SENDER - NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED - UNABLE TO FORWARD" (xl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
8 8 misc Mail Returned Undeliverable Thu 10/31 9:21 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order6 sent to D. Thompson returned marked "RETURN TO SENDER - UNCLAIMED - UNABLE TO FORWARD" (jmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
7 7 motion Report and Recommendations Tue 10/29 8:40 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 . It is therefore RECOMMENDED that the plaintiff's claims be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for want of prosecution. Within 14 days after service of this report, any party may serve and file written objections to the findings and recommendations of the magistrate judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis on 10/28/2024. (xl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Wed 09/25 8:24 AM
ORDER. Thompson is ORDERED to serve the defendant within 30 days of this order. If Thompson fails to do so, the court will recommend that all claims be dismissed without prejudice. If dismissal is satisfactory to Thompson, no further action is necessary. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court send a copy of this order to the plaintiff by certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis on 9/25/2024. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/03 4:56 PM
Pursuant to[LINK:General Order 24-06] , case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Bill Davis. Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson no longer assigned to the case. (mcg)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
misc Filing Fee Received Fri 07/12 2:16 PM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 6-67535 (wea)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 06/14 12:48 PM
ORDER. The Motion (Dkt.2 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of receipt of this Order, Plaintiff shall either pay the filing fee or submit another application to proceed in forma pauperis rectifying the deficiencies identified above. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 6/14/2024. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 12/27 1:36 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Western Extrusions. (dlw, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Non-Pris Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Notice Wed 12/27 1:34 PM
Non-prisoner pro se consent to receive electronic notice filed by Don E. Thompson, Jr. (dlw, )
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 12/27 1:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Don E. Thompson, Jr.(dlw, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit/Declaration
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/27 1:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Western Extrusions, filed by Don E. Thompson, Jr.(dlw, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 12/27 1:37 PM
Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (dlw, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Wed 12/27 1:37 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (dlw, )
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 12/28 9:07 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (dlw, )
Related: [-]