California Eastern District Court
Judge:Troy L Nunley
Referred: Allison Claire
Case #: 2:23-cv-03015
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jun 24, 2024 1:15 AM PDT
Defendant
California Sun Grower Services Company, LLC
Represented By
Limor Lehavi
Lehavi Stargardter, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lethesia Guzman
Defendant
L.M.
Defendant
Liberty Packing Company, LLC
Represented By
Limor Lehavi
Lehavi Stargardter, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Eduardo Marquez
Represented By
Limor Lehavi
Lehavi Stargardter, LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Morning Star Company
Represented By
Limor Lehavi
Lehavi Stargardter, LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Morning Star Trucking Company, LLC
Represented By
Limor Lehavi
Lehavi Stargardter, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Great American Insurance Company
Represented By
Yvonne Marie Schulte
Clyde & Co
contact info

GPO Apr 02 2024
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/2/2024 GRANTING the Joint Motion (ECF No. 7) and STAYING this Action pending resolution of the Underlying Action. The parties are ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report not later than thirty (30) days from the resolution of the Underlying Action notifying the Court as to whether the stay should be lifted and proposing dates and deadlines moving forward. (Krueger, M)

Docket last updated: 52 minutes ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
13 13 order Minute Order ~Util - Motions Submitted/Under Advisement Mon 05/05 3:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/5/2025: On the Court's own motion, Defendants' Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (ECF No.12 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 6/12/2025 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Deputy Clerk MDK)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
12 12 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 04/18 10:38 AM
MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY for Defendants by California Sun Grower Services Company, LLC, Liberty Packing Company, LLC, Eduardo Marquez, The Morning Star Company, The Morning Star Trucking Company, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley.(Lehavi, Limor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Limor Lehavi in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Case Stayed Order on Motion to Stay Tue 04/02 9:38 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/2/2024 GRANTING the Joint Motion (ECF No.7 ) and STAYING this Action pending resolution of the Underlying Action. The parties are ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report not later than thirty (30) days from the resolution of the Underlying Action notifying the Court as to whether the stay should be lifted and proposing dates and deadlines moving forward. (Krueger, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
10 10 misc Status Report Mon 04/01 12:04 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Great American Insurance Company. (Schulte, Yvonne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
9 9 order Minute Order ~Util - Motions Submitted/Under Advisement Wed 03/27 2:58 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/27/2024: On the Court's own motion, the Joint Motion to Stay (ECF No.7 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 4/18/2024 is VACATED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
8 8 respm Withdrawal of Motion Thu 03/07 3:34 PM
WITHDRAWAL of6 Motion to Dismiss, filed by The Morning Star Trucking Company, LLC, Liberty Packing Company, LLC, The Morning Star Company, California Sun Grower Services Company, LLC, Eduardo Marquez. (Lehavi, Limor)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Stay Thu 03/07 10:55 AM
MOTION to STAY by California Sun Grower Services Company, LLC, Liberty Packing Company, LLC, Eduardo Marquez, The Morning Star Company, The Morning Star Trucking Company, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley.(Lehavi, Limor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, February 26, 2024
6 6 motion Dismiss Mon 02/26 10:32 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by California Sun Grower Services Company, LLC, Liberty Packing Company, LLC, Eduardo Marquez, The Morning Star Company, The Morning Star Trucking Company, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley.(Lehavi, Limor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Limor Lehavi in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
5 5 misc Stipulation Wed 01/24 2:44 PM
STIPULATION for Extension to Respond to Complaint to February 26, 2024 by California Sun Grower Services Company, LLC, Liberty Packing Company, LLC, Eduardo Marquez, The Morning Star Company, The Morning Star Trucking Company, LLC. Attorney Lehavi, Limor added. (Lehavi, Limor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
4 4 misc Civil New Case Documents for TLN Wed 12/27 3:22 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
3 3 service Summons Wed 12/27 3:22 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *California Sun Grower Services Company, LLC, Lethesia Guzman, L.M., Liberty Packing Company, LLC, Eduardo Marquez, The Morning Star Company, The Morning Star Trucking Company, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Yvonne Marie Schulte* *Clyde & Co* *355 S Grand Avenue Suite 1400* *Los Angeles, CA 90071*. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Interested Parties Wed 12/27 2:53 PM
NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Great American Insurance Company. (Schulte, Yvonne)
Related: [-]
1 1 92 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 12/27 2:51 PM
COMPLAINT against California Sun Grower Services Company, LLC, Lethesia Guzman, L.M., Liberty Packing Company, LLC, Eduardo Marquez, The Morning Star Company, The Morning Star Trucking Company, LLC by Great American Insurance Company. Attorney Schulte, Yvonne Marie added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11261380)(Schulte, Yvonne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet