California Central District Court
Judge:John F Walter
Case #: 2:23-cv-10826
Nature of Suit510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2023
Terminated:Feb 09, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, October 18, 2024
15 15 appeal Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Thu 10/24 10:07 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL of the Denial of Certificate of Appealability of February 9, 2024- Exhibit A to the 9th CCA filed by Petitioner Neda Mehrabani. Appeal of Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Terminated Case,10 Filed On: 2/9/24; Entered On: 2/13/24; CJA appointed. (mat)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
14 14 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Fri 08/16 12:09 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS REQUEST [filed 8/9/24; Docket No.13 ] by Judge John F. Walter. The IFP Request is DENIED. (iv)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
13 13 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Tue 08/13 12:01 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by petitioner Neda Mehrabani. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
12 12 order Withdraw as Attorney Tue 07/30 3:13 PM
ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT MEDA MEHRABANI AND TO PERMIT HER TO APPEAR AND ACT PRO SE11 by Judge John F. Walter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Counsel Jan L. Handzlik's application to withdraw as defendant's attorney-of-record is granted and his participation in this case is terminated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if defendant seeks appointment of counsel, she shall file an appropriate Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (iv)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 07/30 6:52 AM
First EX PARTE APPLICATION of Jan L. Handzlik to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Neda Mehrabani filed by Petitioner Neda Mehrabani. (Handzlik, Jan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order re Withdrawal as Counsel
Friday, February 09, 2024
10 10 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 02/13 5:01 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE, SET ASIDE, OR CORRECT SENTENCE BY A PERSON IN FEDERAL CUSTODY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2255 AND A MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL PURSUANT TO RULE 33(a) and (b)(1) [filed 12/27/2023; Docket Nos. 39 & 39-2] by Judge John F. Walter. Mehrabani's Motions are DENIED. The Court DECLINES to issue a certificate of appealability. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
9 9 respm Reply (Motion related) Wed 01/31 3:37 PM
REPLY to Government's Opposition to Petitioner's Motions filed by Petitioner Neda Mehrabani. (Handzlik, Jan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
8 8 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 01/03 3:46 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge John F. Walter.The Government shall file its response to the Motion on or before January 10, 2024. Petitioner shall file a Reply on or before January 12, 2024. (iv)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 31, 2023
7 7 misc Declaration Sun 12/31 4:19 PM
DECLARATION of Neda Mehrabani, Arash Ladjevardi and Paphatsiri Ladjevardi in Support of 2255 Motion filed by Petitioner Neda Mehrabani. (Handzlik, Jan)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Miscellaneous Document Sun 12/31 3:54 PM
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of 2255 Motion (Handzlik, Jan)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 12/29 5:59 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Neda Mehrabani. (Handzlik, Jan)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Fri 12/29 11:31 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (28:2255) (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Declaration in Support of Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence, Pursuant to 28 USC 2255 should also be e-filed in both the CV Case and CR case. Currently it was e-filed in CR Case 2:23-cr-00294-JFW-1. (car)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Assignment to US District Judge (CV-17) (2241 and 2255) - optional html form Fri 12/29 11:23 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (car)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
4 4 22 pgs order Order Fri 12/29 2:39 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. Both the Court and counsel bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in Federal Court. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
1 1 cmp Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (28:2255) (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 12/27 4:52 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence, Pursuant to 28 USC 2255 in Criminal Case No. 2:23-cr-294-JFW, filed by Movant Neda Mehrabani. (Attorney Jan Lawrence Handzlik added to party Neda Mehrabani(pty:bkmov))(Handzlik, Jan)
Related: [-]