Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Colville
Case #: 2:23-cv-02158
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Dec 26, 2023
Terminated:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 23, 2024 6:22 AM EDT
Defendant
TOMOCREDIT, INC.
Defendant
TRANSUNION LLC
Represented By
Krista Ann Rose
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Samantha Southall
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Plaintiff
AVERILL BLANCHARD
Represented By
Eliyahu Babad
Stein Saks, PLLC
contact info
Scott H. Bernstein
Law Offices Of Scott H. Bernstein, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
29 29 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Wed 02/12 5:39 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to TransUnion LLC by AVERILL BLANCHARD. (Babad, Eliyahu)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
28 28 2 pgs order Order for Administrative Case Closing Wed 10/30 11:22 AM
ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING: The Court having been advised that the above captioned case has been resolved and that the only matters remaining to be completed are the payment of the settlement proceeds, if any, and the submission of a stipulation for dismissal under Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a). No further action is required by the Court at this time. The Clerk shall mark the above-captioned case closed. Nothing contained in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this action, and, that should further proceedings therein become necessary or desirable, either party may initiate them in the same manner as if this Order had not been entered. The Court expressly retains jurisdiction in this matter to consider any issue arising during the period when settlement is being finalized, including, butnot limited to, enforcing settlement. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 10/30/24. (cjo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 10/29 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to TransUnion LLC by AVERILL BLANCHARD (Babad, Eliyahu)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
26 26 order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 09/16 12:41 PM
ORDER terminating21 Motion to Stay in light of Notice of Withdrawal filed at25 . Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 9/16/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk) Modified text on 9/16/2024. (tk)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents Mon 09/16 12:38 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion For Stay by TRANSUNION LLC re21 Motion to Stay,, (Southall, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Atty) Wed 07/24 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Tomocredit Inc. by AVERILL BLANCHARD (Babad, Eliyahu)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
23 23 respoth Response in Opposition Tue 07/23 6:33 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to22 Brief in Support of Motion,21 Motion to Stay,,, filed by AVERILL BLANCHARD. (Babad, Eliyahu)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Averill Blanchard in Opposition,
Att: 2 Declaration of Eliyahu Babad in Opposition,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - Trans Union's Declaration in Aikens Matter,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - Trans Union's Brief in Aikens Matter,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 - Trans Union's Motion in Blanchard Matter,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 - Trans Union's Brief in Blanchard Matter,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5 - Trans Union's Declaration in Gottlieb Matter,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6 - Trans Union's Brief in Gottlieb Matter,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7 - Trans Union's Declaration in Miller Matter,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8 - Trans Union's Brief in Miller Matter,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9 - Trans Union's Declaration in Portillo Matter,
Att: 12 Exhibit 10 - Trans Union's Brief in Portillo Matter,
Att: 13 Exhibit 11 - Trans Union's Declaration in Patrick Matter,
Att: 14 Exhibit 12 - Trans Union's Brief in Patrick Matter,
Att: 15 Exhibit 13 - Trans Union's withdawal of the Patrick Matter Motion
misc QC - Attorney Signature Deficient Wed 07/24 8:24 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re23 Response in Opposition. ERROR: Attorney signature missing required information. CORRECTION: Attorney directed to comply with requirements of LCvR 5.2(B) in all future filings. This message is for informational purposes only. (cel)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
22 22 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 07/08 7:09 PM
BRIEF in Support re21 Motion to Stay,, filed by TRANSUNION LLC. (Southall, Samantha)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Stay Mon 07/08 7:08 PM
MOTION to Stay Proceedings by TRANSUNION LLC. (Southall, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Sofer Sanctions Motion,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Experian RICO Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - TU Memorandum iso Motion for Alternative Service,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Yenon Argy,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Declaration of Judah Stein,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Declaration of Tamir Saland,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Patrick Amended Complaint,
Att: 9 Exhibit H - R. Patrick Deposition excerpts,
Att: 10 Exhibit I - B. Patrick Deposition excerpts,
Att: 11 Exhibit J - TU Third Set of Requests for Admission
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 05/22 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to TomoCredit, Inc. by AVERILL BLANCHARD (Babad, Eliyahu)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
19 19 order Case Management Order Mon 04/22 11:33 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 5/15/2024; Amended Pleadings due by 6/3/2024 Joinder of Parties due by 6/3/2024 Discovery due by 11/15/2024 Plaintiff Expert Reports due by 12/16/2024; Defendant Expert Reports due by 1/15/2025; Stipulation due by 11/20/2024; Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 11/25/2024 at 10:00 AM in Telephone Conference before Judge Robert J. Colville. Dial In Information can be found at ECF5 . Details and Deadlines more fully stated in the order. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/22/24. (cjo)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs order Order Implementing Fed Rule of Evidence 502(d) Mon 04/22 11:29 AM
ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Pursuant to LCvR 16.1.D. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/22/24. (cjo)
Related: [-]
17 17 minutes Initial Case Management Conference Mon 04/22 11:28 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Colville: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/22/2024. (cjo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
16 16 misc Preconference Statement Wed 04/17 10:55 AM
PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT by AVERILL BLANCHARD. (Babad, Eliyahu)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
misc QC - Attorney Signature Deficient Fri 04/12 4:01 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. ERROR: Attorney signature missing required information. CORRECTION: Attorney directed to comply with requirements of LCvR 5.2(B) in all future filings. This message is for informational purposes only. (keh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
15 15 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 04/11 4:23 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Babad, Eliyahu)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/09 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Krista Ann Rose on behalf of TRANSUNION, LLC. (Rose, Krista)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
13 13 order Initial Local Rule 16.1 Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 03/07 4:00 PM
INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management set for 4/22/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert J. Colville. Dial In Inforamtion can be found at ECF5 . ADR Stipulation and Rule 26F Report due by 4/8/2024. Joint Pre Conference Statement due by 4/17/2024. Details more fully stated in the order. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 3/7/24. (cjo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1: Stipulation Selecting ADR,
Att: 2 2: Rule 26(f) form
Monday, February 26, 2024
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Mon 02/26 12:36 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by TRANSUNION, LLC. (Southall, Samantha)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/26 12:32 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by TRANSUNION, LLC. (Southall, Samantha)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/26 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Southall on behalf of TRANSUNION, LLC. (Southall, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
9 9 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Wed 01/17 1:56 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by AVERILL BLANCHARD. TOMOCREDIT, INC. served on 1/2/2024, answer due 1/23/2024. (Babad, Eliyahu)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 12/28 11:46 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AVERILL BLANCHARD. TRANSUNION, LLC waiver sent on 12/27/2023, answer due 2/26/2024. (Babad, Eliyahu)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
7 7 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/27 3:47 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Eliyahu Babad to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 12/27/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Wed 12/27 2:59 PM
MOTION for attorney Eliyahu Babad to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-8042358) by AVERILL BLANCHARD. (Babad, Eliyahu)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
5 5 notice Notice - Telephonic Conference (Microsoft Teams) Wed 12/27 2:12 PM
MICROSOFT TEAMS AUDIO CONFERENCING SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES - Every telephonic conference conducted will be via a Microsoft Teams Audio Conferencing call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide a conference ID. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled, you will be instructed to refer back to this notice. This document has a security setting of Case Participants Only, so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (cjo)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order Wed 12/27 2:12 PM
ORDER re 12(b) Motions Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 12/27/23. (cjo)
Related: [-]
3 3 adr Notice of ADR Designation Wed 12/27 2:11 PM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 12/27 10:34 AM
Summons Issued as to TOMOCREDIT, INC., TRANSUNION, LLC (jkn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons TransUnion
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Wed 12/27 10:33 AM
COMPLAINT against TOMOCREDIT, INC., TRANSUNION, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8040991), filed by AVERILL BLANCHARD. (jkn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet