Maryland District Court
Judge:Deborah L Boardman
Case #: 8:23-cv-03463
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2023
Re-opened:Mar 13, 2025
Terminated:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 18, 2024 4:32 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
MGM National Harbor, LLC
Represented By
Jeremy Schneider
Jackson Lewis
contact info
Counter Defendant
Harold H. Hodge, Jr.
Defendant
John Doe
Represented By
Jeremy Schneider
Jackson Lewis
contact info
Defendant
William Hornbuckle
Represented By
Jeremy Schneider
Jackson Lewis
contact info
Defendant
Masud Hossain
Represented By
Jeremy Schneider
Jackson Lewis
contact info
Defendant
MGM National Harbor, LLC
Represented By
Jeremy Schneider
Jackson Lewis
contact info
Defendant
MGM Resort International
Represented By
Jeremy Schneider
Jackson Lewis
contact info
Defendant
Edward Pitoniak
Represented By
Jeremy Schneider
Jackson Lewis
contact info
Defendant
Vici Properties, Inc.
Represented By
Jeremy Schneider
Jackson Lewis
contact info
Plaintiff
Harold H. Hodge, Jr.
10242 Prince Place Unit 208
Upper Marlboro, MD 20774

GPO Feb 28 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 2/28/2025. (c/m p 3/3/25 ols, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
38 38 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 04/08 1:53 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re36 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Harold H. Hodge, Jr. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit X,
Att: 2 Exhibit Z
Thursday, March 27, 2025
37 37 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 03/27 4:18 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re36 Case Reopened. MOTION for Reconsideration re35 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,, Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider filed by John Doe, William Hornbuckle, Masud Hossain, MGM National Harbor, LLC, MGM Resort International, Vici Properties, Inc..(Schneider, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, March 13, 2025
36 36 motion Reconsideration Fri 03/14 8:53 AM
Case Reopened. MOTION for Reconsideration re35 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Harold H. Hodge, Jr.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
35 35 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/03 8:02 AM
ORDER granting in part14 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiff's remaining claims or the defendants' counterclaims, all of which arise under state law; denying as moot25 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss; granting31 Plaintiff's Motion to File an Untimely Reply; denying33 Plaintiff's Motion to File a Surreply. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 2/28/2025. (c/m p 3/3/25 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
34 34 13 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Mon 03/03 7:59 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 2/28/2025. (c/m p 3/3/25 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
33 33 motion Leave to File Document Mon 10/28 12:04 PM
MOTION asking the Court to Accept Motion of Strong Points in his Pleadings by Harold H. Hodge, Jr (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Motion
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
32 32 5 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 08/13 11:52 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re31 MOTION to Add Pleasdings and Argument why the Defendants Counter-Calims should be Dismissed Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion filed by John Doe, William Hornbuckle, Masud Hossain, MGM National Harbor, LLC, MGM Resort International, Vici Properties, Inc..(Schneider, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, July 29, 2024
31 31 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 07/30 8:23 AM
MOTION to Add Pleadings and Argument why the Defendants Counter-Claims should be Dismissed by Harold H. Hodge, Jr (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continued Argument
Monday, July 15, 2024
30 30 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 07/15 11:50 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by John Doe, William Hornbuckle, Masud Hossain, MGM National Harbor, LLC, MGM Resort International.(Schneider, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Mon 07/15 10:31 AM
QC NOTICE:27 Response in Support of Motion, filed by John Doe, Masud Hossain, MGM National Harbor, LLC, William Hornbuckle, MGM Resort International was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect even used. Please refile using the correct event under Responses and Replies > Reply to Response to Motion. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
28 28 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 07/12 4:57 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MGM National Harbor, LLC.(Schneider, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
27 27 respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 07/12 4:35 PM
RESPONSE in Support re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant's Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss filed by John Doe, William Hornbuckle, Masud Hossain, MGM National Harbor, LLC, MGM Resort International.(Schneider, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 06/28 3:57 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Harold H. Hodge, Jr. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
25 25 motion Dismiss Fri 06/28 3:56 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counter-Claims by Harold H. Hodge, Jr (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Sanctions Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 06/04 11:55 AM
ORDER denying19 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; granting20 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 6/4/2024. (c/m p 6/4/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
23 23 corresp Miscellaneous Fri 05/31 3:30 PM
Correspondence from Harold H. Hodge, Jr. re: Request for Ruling on Pending Motions (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Friday, May 17, 2024
22 22 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/17 4:43 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION for Sanctions filed by John Doe, William Hornbuckle, Masud Hossain, MGM National Harbor, LLC, MGM Resort International, Vici Properties, Inc..(Schneider, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
21 21 respm Response Fri 05/17 4:42 PM
RESPONSE re20 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by John Doe, William Hornbuckle, Masud Hossain, MGM National Harbor, LLC, MGM Resort International, Vici Properties, Inc..(Schneider, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, May 03, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time Fri 05/03 3:30 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Harold H. Hodge, Jr (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Sanctions Fri 05/03 3:29 PM
MOTION for Sanctions by Harold H. Hodge, Jr (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit X,
Att: 2 Exhibit Y
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/24 11:14 AM
NOTICE by MGM National Harbor, LLC re15 Counterclaim Correction to Exhibit A(Schneider, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/23 5:14 PM
NOTICE by MGM National Harbor, LLC re15 Counterclaim Correction of Exhibit(Schneider, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
16 16 misc Rule 12/56 Tue 04/23 8:09 AM
Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Harold H. Hodge, Jr (c/m p 4/23/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
15 15 cmp Counterclaim Mon 04/22 6:23 PM
COUNTERCLAIM against Harold H. Hodge, Jr, filed by MGM National Harbor, LLC.(Schneider, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
14 14 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/22 6:01 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by John Doe, William Hornbuckle, Masud Hossain, MGM National Harbor, LLC, MGM Resort International, Edward Pitoniak, Vici Properties, Inc.(Schneider, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
13 13 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 03/20 12:15 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MGM National Harbor, LLC, MGM Resort International identifying Corporate Parent MGM Resorts International for MGM National Harbor, LLC; Party with Financial Interest IAC/Interactive Corporation for MGM Resort International.(Schneider, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
11 11 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Tue 03/19 2:53 PM
-FILED IN ERROR- Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MGM National Harbor, LLC, MGM Resort International identifying Corporate Parent MGM Resorts International for MGM National Harbor, LLC, MGM Resort International.(Schneider, Jeremy) Modified on 3/19/2024 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 03/19 3:06 PM
QC NOTICE:11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by MGM National Harbor, LLC, MGM Resort International was filed incorrectly. **All entities listed on the Corporate Disclosure must be entered into the system when prompted. Please refile and add all entities as either a corporate parent, other affiliate or as having a financial interest. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/15 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Schneider on behalf of John Doe, William Hornbuckle, Masud Hossain, MGM National Harbor, LLC, MGM Resort International, Edward Pitoniak, Vici Properties, Inc. (Schneider, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/15 2:00 PM
ORDER granting8 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 3/15/2024. (c/m p 3/15/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/15 10:00 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by John Doe, William Hornbuckle, Masud Hossain, MGM National Harbor, LLC, MGM Resort International, Edward Pitoniak, Vici Properties, Inc.(Schneider, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
notice Deficiency Notice Fri 03/15 11:21 AM
Deficiency Notice for MGM National Harbor, LLC, Vici Properties, Inc., and MGM Resort International-- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statements have not been filed. The Statements must be filed by 3/22/2024 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/12 4:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harold H. Hodge, Jr. William Hornbuckle served on 2/29/2024, answer due 3/21/2024; Masud Hossain served on 3/1/2024, answer due 3/22/2024; MGM National Harbor, LLC served on 3/1/2024, answer due 3/22/2024; MGM Resort International served on 2/29/2024, answer due 3/21/2024; Edward Pitoniak served on 2/26/2024, answer due 3/18/2024; Vici Properties, Inc. served on 3/1/2024, answer due 3/22/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/12/2024 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Return for MGM Resort,
Att: 2 Return for Masud Hossain,
Att: 3 Return for MGM National Harbor LLC,
Att: 4 Return for William Hornbuckle,
Att: 5 Return for Edward Pitoniak,
Att: 6 USPS Receipts
Friday, February 09, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 02/09 10:32 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to William Hornbuckle, Masud Hossain, MGM National Harbor, LLC, MGM Resort International, Edward Pitoniak, Vici Properties, Inc.. (c/m p 2/9/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 02/09 10:26 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
5 5 3 pgs order Order Tue 01/30 1:26 PM
ORDER directing that within 21 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall submit completed summons as instructed herein, to the Clerk and the Clerk shall issue summons and return summons to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 1/30/2024. (c/m p 1/30/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
misc Filing Fee Paid Mon 01/29 3:32 PM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 1706 (dhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 01/08 10:40 AM
ORDER denying2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting Plaintiff 21 days from the date of this Order to pay the full civil filing fee of $405. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 1/8/2024. (c/m p 1/8/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
3 3 misc New Case Notification Letter Wed 12/27 12:22 PM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Harold Hodge. (c/m 12/27/2023 bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 12/27 12:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Harold Hodge(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/27 11:59 AM
COMPLAINT against John Doe, William Hornbuckle, Masud Hossain, MGM National Harbor, LLC, MGM Resort International, Edward Pitoniak, Vici Properties, Inc., filed by Harold Hodge.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet