Iowa Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Lee M Jackwig
Case #: 3:23-bk-01667
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2023
Dismissed:Feb 08, 2024
Terminated:May 20, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Boss Tax and Accounting Services, LLC
2831 Brady St
Davenport, IA 52803-1519
Represented By
Boss Tax and Accounting Services, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Federal Bldg, Room 793 210 Walnut Street
Des Moines, IA 50309
Represented By
Claire Davison
contact info
Alexandria Quinn-Hanse
contact info
L Ashley Wieck
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, May 20, 2024
court Close Case - Bankruptcy Mon 05/20 10:14 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (ccc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
22 22 appeal Decision Re: Appeal Thu 04/18 9:41 AM
Decision Re: Appeal. Dismissed; By Judge Related [+](ccc)
Related: [-] related documents(s)16 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election filed by Debtor Boss Tax and Accounting Services, LLC,20 Notice of Docketing Appeal
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/13 11:07 AM
Order from United States Bankruptcy Appellate Panel for the Eighth Circuit Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 16 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election
Thursday, February 22, 2024
20 20 appeal Notice of Docketing Appeal Thu 02/22 1:22 PM
Notice of Docketing Appeal Check Appeal Status on 8/20/2024. Case Number 2406001 Related [+](ccc)
Related: [-] related documents(s)16 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election filed by Debtor Boss Tax and Accounting Services, LLC, 18 Transmittal of Appeal
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Corrected Creditor Address Tue 02/20 2:20 PM
Notice of Filing Corrected Creditor Address Filed by The Waterloo Building LLC..(ccc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
18 18 appeal Transmittal of Appeal Wed 02/14 9:27 AM
Transmittal of Appeal to BAP ; BAP Number Due by: 2/24/2024. Related [+](ccc)
Related: [-] related documents(s)16 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election filed by Debtor Boss Tax and Accounting Services, LLC
17 17 court Court's Certificate of Service by Mail Wed 02/14 9:16 AM
Court's Certificate of Service by Mail. Parties Served: Boss Tax and Accounting Services, LLC, 2831 Brady St, Davenport, IA 52803. Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 16 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election filed by Debtor Boss Tax and Accounting Services, LLC
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
16 16 appeal Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election Tue 02/13 3:45 PM
Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election. Receipt Number Deficient, Fee Amount $0.00 Filed by Boss Tax and Accounting Services, LLC Related [+] Transmission to BAP on 2/16/2024. (ccc)
Related: [-] related documents(s)14 Order on Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11
Saturday, February 10, 2024
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/10 11:09 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 02/10/2024. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Thursday, February 08, 2024
14 14 order Dismiss Chapter 11 - Order Thu 02/08 4:33 PM
Order Regarding United States Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Debtor's Chapter 11 Case Debtor Dismissed . Related [+].. Follow Up Case Manager Deadline due by 2/22/2024. (tls)
Related: [-] #6 12 Support Document filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee
13 13 misc Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors to a Continued Meeting. Thu 02/08 10:17 AM
Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors to a Continued Meeting (Debtor did not appear) . Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee Related [+]. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/4/2024 at 09:00 AM at Telephone Conference Call. (Wieck, L Ashley)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Meeting of Creditors
12 12 misc Support Document Thu 02/08 10:04 AM
Support Document Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee Related [+]. (Wieck, L Ashley)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
11 11 misc document Thu 01/18 3:38 PM
Document Objection to U.S. Trustee's Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice (submitted by owner of debtor; not by licensed attorney) Filed by Debtor Boss Tax and Accounting Services, LLC Related [+]. (ccc)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee
Friday, January 12, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/12 11:11 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 01/12/2024. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Fri 01/12 11:11 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 01/12/2024. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
8 8 court Notice of Bar Date - 7 day Wed 01/10 4:18 PM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+] Objections Due By 1/17/2024. (tls)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee
7 7 motion Ex Parte Application to Shorten Bar Date Notice Wed 01/10 1:41 PM
Ex Parte Application to Shorten Bar Date Notice Related [+]. Filed by L Ashley Wieck on behalf of United States Trustee. (Wieck, L Ashley)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 filed by United States Trustee
6 6 motion Dismiss Chapter 11 Wed 01/10 1:40 PM
Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Filed by L Ashley Wieck on behalf of United States Trustee. (Wieck, L Ashley)
Related: [-]
5 5 court 341 Meeting - Ch11 - Business Wed 01/10 12:16 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/8/2024 at 09:00 AM at Telephone Conference Call. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 4/8/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 3/6/2024. (kam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
4 4 court Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings - AutoDocket Thu 12/28 6:54 AM
Clerk's Evidence of All Repeat Filings Debtor Case No NoteBoss Tax and Accounting Services, LLC 22-00984 Ch11 filed in Iowa Southern on 09/13/2022, Dismissed for failure to pay filing fee and to file information on 09/23/2022 .(Admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
3 3 misc Initial Statement about an Eviction Judgment Wed 12/27 4:08 PM
Initial Statement about an Eviction Judgment Filed by Debtor Boss Tax and Accounting Services, LLC. (kam)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Pay Installments Wed 12/27 4:06 PM
Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments Filed by Boss Tax and Accounting Services, LLC. (kam)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs court Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 Wed 12/27 4:05 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $ 0.00 Filed by Boss Tax and Accounting Services, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 3/26/2024. (kam)
Related: [-]