Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sam R Cummings
Case #: 5:23-cv-00312
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Dec 28, 2023
Terminated:Dec 30, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 29, 2024 5:55 AM CDT
Defendant
Pfizer Inc
Represented By
Edward Donald Burbach
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Carlton Wessel
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Robert F Johnson, III
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Lianna Bash
Dla Piper Llp Us
contact info
Meagan Dyer Self
Dla Piper Us LLP
contact info
Robert W St Clair
Fargason Booth St Clair Richards & Wilkins LLP
contact info
Andrew Hoffman
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
James Franklin Perrin
Fargason Booth St Clair Richards & Wilkins LLP
contact info
Movant
Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
Represented By
Brett A Shumate
Jones Day - Washington
contact info
Noel John Francisco
Jones Day - Washington
contact info
Alexis Zhang
Jones Day
contact info
Jonathan David Guynn
Jones Day
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Texas
Represented By
Robert Eugene Farquharson
Office Of The Attorney General Of Texas
contact info
Jason C McKenney
Office Of The Attorney General Of Texas
contact info
Ryan S Baasch
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Christin Cobe Vasquez
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Matt D Matzner
Crenshaw Dupree & Milam
contact info
David Grant Shatto
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, February 03, 2025
appeal Appeal Record Certified/Transmitted Mon 02/03 1:11 PM
Record on Appeal for USCA5 25-10182 Related [+]: Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by[LINK:contacting the appeals deputy] in advance to arrange delivery. (bdg)
Related: [-] lated to45 appeal
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
appeal USCA Case Number Wed 01/15 4:01 PM
USCA Case Number 25-10182 in USCA Fifth Circuit for45 Notice of Appeal filed by State of Texas. (bdg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
45 45 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 01/08 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit by State of Texas. Filing fee $605, receipt number ATXNDC-15175825. T.O. form to appellant electronically at[LINK:Transcript Order Form] or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions[LINK:here] . (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Kennedy, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
44 44 order Judgment Mon 12/30 10:57 AM
JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Court's Oder of even date granting Defendant Pfizer, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant are hereby DISMISSED. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 12/30/2024) (bdg)
Related: [-]
43 43 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 12/30 10:51 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Court finds that as a matter of law under the circumstances of this case, the Defendant is entitled to immunity under the Public Readiness and Emergency Act ("PREP Act"). Plaintiff's claims against Defendant are hereby DISMISSED for essentially the reasons argued in the Motion and Reply. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 12/30/2024) (bdg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
42 42 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Wed 08/28 11:17 AM
ADDENDUM TO NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENT AUTHORITY to40 Order on Motion for Leave to File,39 Motion for Leave to File by Defendant Pfizer Inc. (Hoffman, Andrew) Modified text on 8/28/2024 (bdg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 4
Monday, August 26, 2024
41 41 3 pgs respm Response/Objection Mon 08/26 1:03 PM
RESPONSE filed by State of Texas re:39 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority (McKenney, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit(s) Exhibit A
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
40 40 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 08/20 11:38 AM
ORDER granting39 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. Plaintiff may file a response of no more than 350 words by August 26, 2024. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/20/2024) (bdg)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
39 39 motion Leave to File Mon 08/19 6:28 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Pfizer Inc (Self, Meagan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Notice of Suppl. Authority,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B - Proposed Order
Monday, June 24, 2024
38 38 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 06/24 11:03 AM
ORDER granting36 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Stay Proceedings. The Court finds good cause exists to GRANT the Joint Motion andSTAY discovery in the civil action pending the resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss premised on the defense of immunity under the Public Readiness and Emergency Preparedness Act. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 6/24/2024) (bdg)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
37 37 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Fri 06/21 2:35 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Pfizer Inc re36 Joint MOTION to Stay Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Stay Proceedings (Self, Meagan)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Stay Fri 06/21 2:34 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Stay Proceedings filed by Pfizer Inc (Self, Meagan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 13, 2024
35 35 1 pgs order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/13 11:51 AM
ORDER granting29 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Noel J. Francisco. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/13/2024) (bdg)
Related: [-]
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/13 11:50 AM
ORDER granting31 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alexis Zhang. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/13/2024) (bdg)
Related: [-]
33 33 1 pgs order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/13 11:29 AM
ORDER granting30 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brett A Shumate. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/13/2024) (bdg)
Related: [-]
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 05/13 11:27 AM
ORDER denying26 Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Brief. The Court finds the Motion to be untimely and that an amicus brief would not be helpful in resolving the issues in the civil action. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/13/2024) (bdg)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
31 31 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/10 3:29 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Alexis Zhang (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14608989) filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America (Guynn, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
30 30 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/10 3:22 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Brett A. Shumate (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14608958) filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America (Guynn, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
29 29 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/10 3:16 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Noel J. Francisco (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14608943) filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America (Guynn, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
28 28 9 pgs respm Response/Objection Fri 05/10 3:15 PM
RESPONSE filed by State of Texas re:26 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Supporting Defendant Pfizer Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (McKenney, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
27 27 respm Reply Thu 05/09 9:50 PM
REPLY filed by Pfizer Inc re:17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Self, Meagan)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Leave to File Thu 05/09 4:29 PM
OPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Supporting Defendant Pfizer Inc's Motion to Dismiss filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America with Brief/Memorandum in Support.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Brief of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America as Amicus Curiae Supporting Defendant Pfizer Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Proposed Order. Party Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America added with Attorney Jonathan David Guynn (Guynn, Jonathan) Docket text modified on 5/9/2024 (twd). Modified text on 5/9/2024 (bdg)
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 05/01 8:55 AM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (The requesting party must file the document with the clerk.) Defendant may file its reply (not to exceed 10 pages) on or before 5/9/2024. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/1/2024) (bdg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
24 24 motion Leave to File Tue 04/30 7:21 PM
Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Pfizer Inc (Self, Meagan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 29, 2024
23 23 33 pgs respm Response/Objection Mon 04/29 4:13 PM
RESPONSE filed by State of Texas re:17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (McKenney, Jason)
Related: [-]
22 22 25 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 04/29 1:13 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER: Granting21 Motion for Protective Order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 4/29/2024) (bdg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
21 21 motion Protective Order Wed 04/24 4:42 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Pfizer Inc (Self, Meagan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 04/02 8:40 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Pfizer, Inc.;s Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Responses due by 4/29/2024. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 4/2/2024) (bdg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
19 19 4 pgs motion Extension of Time Mon 04/01 3:29 PM
Agreed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion filed by State of Texas with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Matzner, Matt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
18 18 33 pgs respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Mon 03/25 5:51 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Pfizer Inc re17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Self, Meagan)
Related: [-]
17 17 3 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/25 5:49 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Pfizer Inc (Self, Meagan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 22, 2024
16 16 3 pgs notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 03/22 5:45 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matt D Matzner on behalf of State of Texas. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Matzner, Matt)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
15 15 2 pgs notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 01/22 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan S Baasch on behalf of State of Texas. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Baasch, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Modify Hearings/Deadlines (Full List) Wed 01/17 11:05 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join other parties and amend the pleadings must be filed by 3:00p.m. on 05/15/2024. Motions for summary judgment must be filed by 3:00p.m. on 01/15/2025. Deadline for mediation is by 3:00p.m. on or before 1/15/2025. Motions in Limine and Discovery must be completed by 3:00p.m. on 6/16/2025. Bench Trial set for 7/7/2025 at 09:00 A.M. in the U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom C-216, 1205 Texas Avenue, Lubbock, TX 79401-4091 before Senior Judge Sam R. Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R. Cummings on 1/17/2024) (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 01/17 11:06 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:14. Wed Jan 17 11:06:08 CST 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 01/11 7:22 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason C McKenney on behalf of State of Texas. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (McKenney, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 01/09 5:18 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Eugene Farquharson on behalf of State of Texas. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Farquharson, Robert)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 01/09 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Grant Shatto on behalf of State of Texas. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Shatto, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/02 12:57 PM
ORDER granting4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lianna Bash. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R. Cummings on 1/2/2024) (krr)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/02 12:56 PM
ORDER granting3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Carlton Wessel. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 1/2/2024) (krr)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/02 12:53 PM
ORDER granting5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew J. Hoffman, II. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R. Cummings on 1/2/2024) (krr)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 01/02 12:58 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8,9,10. Tue Jan 2 12:58:04 CST 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
7 7 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Thu 12/28 4:10 PM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, by Defendant Pfizer, Inc.. (Self, Meagan)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Thu 12/28 4:07 PM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, by Defendant Pfizer, Inc.. (Self, Meagan) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/28/2023) (bdg)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/28 4:05 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Andrew J. Hoffman, II (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14275426) filed by Pfizer, Inc. (Self, Meagan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Page(s),
Att: 2 Proposed Order
4 4 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/28 2:21 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Lianna Bash (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14274735) filed by Pfizer, Inc. (Self, Meagan) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/28/2023) (bdg). (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/28/2023) (bdg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Page(s),
Att: 2 Proposed Order
3 3 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/28 2:18 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Carlton Wessel (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14274706) filed by Pfizer, Inc. (Self, Meagan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 12/28 1:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pfizer, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Self, Meagan) (Main Document 2 replaced with flatten document on 12/28/2023) (bdg)
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs notice Notice of Removal Thu 12/28 1:50 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (Filing fee $405; receipt number ATXNDC-14274440) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Self, Meagan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 72 pgs Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 56 pgs Exhibit(s),
Att: 3 36 pgs Exhibit(s),
Att: 4 Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Cover Sheet Supplement