New York Western District Court
Judge:Lawrence J Vilardo
Referred: Jeremiah J Mccarthy
Case #: 1:23-cv-01332
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 28, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jun 29, 2024 5:30 AM EDT
Defendant
County of Allegany
Represented By
Chad W. Flansburg
Phillips Lytle LLP
contact info
Defendant
Terri L. Ross
Represented By
Chad W. Flansburg
Phillips Lytle LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Raymond Chouinard
Represented By
David M. Giglio
David M. Giglio & Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Dickens
Represented By
David M. Giglio
David M. Giglio & Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas Eckrote
Represented By
David M. Giglio
David M. Giglio & Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Harding
Represented By
David M. Giglio
David M. Giglio & Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Darci Hoberg
Represented By
David M. Giglio
David M. Giglio & Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kathie Rainero
Represented By
David M. Giglio
David M. Giglio & Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shane Schroeder
Represented By
David M. Giglio
David M. Giglio & Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David Barry
Represented By
David M. Giglio
David M. Giglio & Associates, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
utility E-Filing Notification Missing Caption/Case Number Thu 04/24 9:30 AM
E-Filing Notification: Incorrect case number listed on40 ,41 ,42 ,43 filings. In future filings, please notate correct case number. (DMK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
44 44 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/23 4:22 PM
TEXT ORDER: plaintiff's motions [40, 41, 42, 43] for a waiver of the local counsel requirement of Loc. R. Civ. P. 83.2(a)(1) are granted. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 4/23/2025. (JD)
Related: [-]
43 43 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/23 3:48 PM
RESPONSE in Support re38 Amended MOTION to appear pro hac vice Patrick J. Perotti ,36 MOTION to appear pro hac vice PATRICK J. PEROTTI ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5450865.) filed by Mark Dickens, David Barry, Raymond Chouinard, Richard Harding, Thomas Eckrote, Kathie Rainero, Darci Hoberg, Russell Hill, Shane Schroeder.(Giglio, David) Modified on 4/23/2025: converted to motion (JD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in support of Patrick Perotti motion to appear pro hac vice
42 42 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/23 3:46 PM
RESPONSE in Support re35 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Patrick J. Brickman ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5450765.),37 Amended MOTION to appear pro hac vice Patrick J. Brickman filed by Mark Dickens, David Barry, Raymond Chouinard, Richard Harding, Thomas Eckrote, Kathie Rainero, Darci Hoberg, Russell Hill, Shane Schroeder.(Giglio, David) Modified on 4/23/2025: converted to motion (JD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in support of Patrick Brickman motion to appear pro hac vice
41 41 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/23 2:41 PM
RESPONSE in Support re38 Amended MOTION to appear pro hac vice Patrick J. Perotti ,36 MOTION to appear pro hac vice PATRICK J. PEROTTI ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5450865.) filed by Mark Dickens, David Barry, Raymond Chouinard, Richard Harding, Thomas Eckrote, Kathie Rainero, Darci Hoberg, Russell Hill, Shane Schroeder.(Giglio, David) Modified on 4/23/2025: converted to motion (JD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration declaration in support of waiver of local counsel requirement
40 40 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/23 2:39 PM
RESPONSE in Support re35 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Patrick J. Brickman ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5450765.),37 Amended MOTION to appear pro hac vice Patrick J. Brickman filed by Mark Dickens, David Barry, Raymond Chouinard, Richard Harding, Thomas Eckrote, Kathie Rainero, Darci Hoberg, Russell Hill, Shane Schroeder.(Giglio, David) Modified on 4/23/2025: converted to motion (JD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
39 39 order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/09 10:45 AM
TEXT ORDER: the motions of Patrick J. Perotti and Patrick J. Brickman for pro hac vice admission [35, 36, 37, 38] are granted on the condition that they either obtain local counsel as required by Loc. R. Civ. P. 83.2(a)(1) or a waiver of that requirement by April 23, 2025. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 4/9/2025. (JD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
38 38 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/08 4:41 PM
Amended MOTION to appear pro hac vice Patrick J. Perotti by Mark Dickens, David Barry, Raymond Chouinard, Richard Harding, Thomas Eckrote, Kathie Rainero, Darci Hoberg, Russell Hill, Shane Schroeder.(Carpinello, George)
Related: [-]
37 37 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/08 4:38 PM
Amended MOTION to appear pro hac vice Patrick J. Brickman by Mark Dickens, David Barry, Raymond Chouinard, Richard Harding, Thomas Eckrote, Kathie Rainero, Darci Hoberg, Russell Hill, Shane Schroeder.(Carpinello, George)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/08 3:22 PM
MOTION to appear pro hac vice PATRICK J. PEROTTI ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5450865.) by Mark Dickens, David Barry, Raymond Chouinard, Richard Harding, Thomas Eckrote, Kathie Rainero, Darci Hoberg, Russell Hill, Shane Schroeder.(Carpinello, George)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/08 2:29 PM
MOTION to appear pro hac vice Patrick J. Brickman ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5450765.) by Mark Dickens, David Barry, Raymond Chouinard, Richard Harding, Thomas Eckrote, Kathie Rainero, Darci Hoberg, Russell Hill, Shane Schroeder.(Carpinello, George)
Related: [-]
34 34 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 04/08 12:53 PM
DECISION AND ORDER re32 motion for leave to file second amended complaint. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 4/8/2025. (JD)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/07 12:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Clyde Roberts on behalf of All Defendants (Roberts, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
32 32 motion Leave to File Document Tue 04/01 3:40 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Robert B. Calihan, Esq, Mark Dickens, David Barry, Raymond Chouinard, Richard Harding, Thomas Eckrote, Kathie Rainero, Darci Hoberg, Russell Hill, Shane Schroeder.(Giglio, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit proposed 2nd amd complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Redlined Version of Proposed Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Notice of Motion,
Att: 4 Declaration Declaration of David Giglio
Monday, March 24, 2025
31 31 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 03/24 9:41 AM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint30 is denied, without prejudice to refiling upon a showing of good cause for failing to meet my Case Management Order's February 3, 2025 deadline for motions to amend (26 , paragraph 5). SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 3/24/2025. (JLV)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 23, 2025
30 30 motion Leave to File Document Sun 03/23 11:23 AM
First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Mark Dickens, David Barry, Raymond Chouinard, Richard Harding, Thomas Eckrote, Kathie Rainero, Darci Hoberg, Russell Hill, Shane Schroeder.(Giglio, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Proposed Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Redlined Version of Proposed Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Notice of Motion,
Att: 4 Declaration Declaration of David Giglio
Friday, March 21, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/21 9:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by George F. Carpinello on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Carpinello, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
28 28 misc Status Report Tue 02/25 2:53 PM
STATUS REPORT by Mark Dickens, David Barry, Raymond Chouinard, Richard Harding, Thomas Eckrote, Kathie Rainero, Darci Hoberg, Russell Hill, Shane Schroeder. (Giglio, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
27 27 adr Stipulation-Selection of Mediator Fri 11/08 1:52 PM
Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by Terri L. Ross, County of Allegany(Flansburg, Chad)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
26 26 order Scheduling Order Fri 10/18 10:24 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) . Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 10/18/24. (MDY)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Fri 10/18 10:17 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 10/18/2024. Counsel for the parties appear by telephone. Initial issues relating to joinder of parties briefly discussed. Case Management Order (CMO) dates discussed and set. CMO to follow. The court instructs the parties that good cause must be shown to amend CMO dates. The court also informs the parties of its informal discovery dispute resolution procedures, and encourages them to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction over the case. APPEARANCES (by phone): David Giglio for plaintiffs; Chad Flansburg for defendants (FTR Gold) (EG)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
24 24 order Pretrial Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 09/20 1:35 PM
ORDER OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. As set forth in the order, a teleconference is set for 10/18/2024 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. To access the teleconference, the parties shall dial 888-808-6929 and enter access code 1533000# sufficiently in advance of the proceeding. It remains the parties' responsibility to read and comply with the attached Order. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 9/20/2024. (EG)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 09/20 11:19 AM
TEXT REFERRAL ORDER - Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall not hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B) and (C), unless further ordered by this Court. All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 9/20/2024. (ZHM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
22 22 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 09/18 2:56 PM
ANSWER to21 Amended Complaint by County of Allegany, Terri L. Ross.(Flansburg, Chad)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/19 12:41 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kathie Rainero, Raymond Chouinard, Darci Hoberg, David Barry, Shane Schroeder, Mark Dickens, Richard Harding, Thomas Eckrote.(Giglio, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, August 15, 2024
20 20 order Text Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 08/15 4:12 PM
TEXT ORDER: On 4/19/2024, this Court granted the defendants' unopposed motion to stay this case pending resolution of a motion to transfer before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Docket Item 13 . On 8/14/2024, the plaintiffs filed a letter informing the Court that the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation denied the motion to transfer. Docket Item19 . The Clerk of the Court therefore shall lift the stay. The plaintiffs also requested a status conference to discuss "a timeline for an answer" and their intention "to amend the complaint and add a new plaintiff." Id. The Court finds that a status conference is unnecessary at this juncture; the plaintiffs may amend the complaint within 30 days of the date of this order and the defendants shall respond to any amended complaint within 30 days of the date the amended complaint is filed. If the plaintiffs do not file an amended complaint, the defendants shall respond to the complaint within 60 days of the date of this order. The parties may move for an extension of time if necessary. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 8/15/2024. (DJ)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Vacate Thu 08/15 11:45 AM
MOTION to Vacate Case Stayed by David Barry, Raymond Chouinard, Mark Dickens, Thomas Eckrote, Richard Harding, Darci Hoberg, Kathie Rainero, Shane Schroeder.(Giglio, David)
Related: [-]
utility E-Filing Notification Thu 08/15 11:15 AM
E-Filing Notification regarding18 LETTER: this document contains a request for relief and should be filed as a motion. ACTION REQUIRED: Re-file document using the motion event. (SG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
18 18 misc Letter Wed 08/14 2:14 PM
Letter filed by David Barry, Raymond Chouinard, Mark Dickens, Thomas Eckrote, Richard Harding, Darci Hoberg, Kathie Rainero, Shane Schroeder Status Update and request conference . (Giglio, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
17 17 5 pgs order Order Tue 08/06 11:06 AM
MDL ORDER denying transfer/centralization of actions listed in Schedule A. Signed by Nathaniel M. Gorton, Acting Chair of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel.(SG)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
16 16 order Text Order Mon 07/22 10:50 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties shall file a status report by 10/22/2024 updating the Court on the status of the transfer motion. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 7/22/2024. (DJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
15 15 misc Letter Thu 07/18 1:51 PM
Letter filed by David Barry, Raymond Chouinard, Mark Dickens, Thomas Eckrote, Richard Harding, Darci Hoberg, Kathie Rainero, Shane Schroeder . (Giglio, David)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Letter Thu 07/18 11:06 AM
Letter filed by County of Allegany, Terri L. Ross . (Flansburg, Chad)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
13 13 order Text Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 04/19 12:12 PM
TEXT ORDER: The unopposed motion to stay filed by the defendants, Docket Item12 , is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall stay this case. All deadlines shall be held in abeyance pending resolution of the motion to transfer before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. The parties shall file a status report by 7/18/2024 updating the Court on the status of the transfer motion. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 4/19/2024. (DJ)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Mon 04/22 11:55 AM
Case Stayed (SG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
12 12 motion Stay Thu 04/18 3:32 PM
First MOTION to Stay by County of Allegany, Terri L. Ross.(Flansburg, Chad)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
11 11 order Text Order Fri 03/29 3:14 PM
TEXT ORDER: The stipulation, Docket Item10 , extending the defendants' time to respond to the complaint until 5/7/2024 is SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 3/29/2024. (DJ)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Stipulation Fri 03/29 1:50 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, by Terri L. Ross. (Flansburg, Chad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Tue 02/20 10:42 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet served on Jeanne Kelly for Terri Ross, Treasurer on 1/17/24, filed by David Barry, Raymond Chouinard, Mark Dickens, Thomas Eckrote, Richard Harding, Darci Hoberg, Kathie Rainero, Shane Schroeder. (Giglio, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Tue 02/20 10:40 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet served on Aaron Moore for County of Allegany on 1/17/24, filed by David Barry, Raymond Chouinard, Mark Dickens, Thomas Eckrote, Richard Harding, Darci Hoberg, Kathie Rainero, Shane Schroeder. (Giglio, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
7 7 order Text Order Wed 02/14 8:59 AM
TEXT ORDER: The stipulation, Docket Item6 , extending the defendants' time to respond to the complaint until 4/16/2024 and amending the caption of the summons is SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 2/14/2024. (DJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation Tue 02/13 2:30 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, by County of Allegany, Terri Ross. (Flansburg, Chad)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/09 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chad W. Flansburg on behalf of County of Allegany, Terri Ross (Flansburg, Chad)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 01/08 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by David M. Giglio (Giglio, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 01/05 12:00 PM
Summons Issued as to County of Allegany, Terri Ross. (SG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
2 2 misc Continuation of Exhibits Thu 01/04 3:50 PM
CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by David Barry, Raymond Chouinard, Mark Dickens, Thomas Eckrote, Richard Harding, Darci Hoberg, Kathie Rainero, Shane Schroeder. to1 Complaint, filed by David Barry, Raymond Chouinard, Mark Dickens, Thomas Eckrote, Richard Harding, Darci Hoberg, Kathie Rainero, Shane Schroeder.(Giglio, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/04 1:22 PM
Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
Related: [-]
adr Automatic Referral to Mediation Thu 01/04 1:23 PM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation: the ADR Plan is available for download at[LINK:http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution] .(SG)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Thu 01/04 1:23 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (SG)
Related: [-]
utility E-Filing Notification Thu 01/04 1:34 PM
E-Filing Notification: re1 COMPLAINT, attorney is directed to submit an AO-440 Summons for each individual defendant using the Continuation of Exhibits event, found under Responses and Replies. (SG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/28 4:06 PM
COMPLAINT Mark Dickens et al against County of Allegany, Terri Ross $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5067438, filed by Kathie Rainero, Raymond Chouinard, Darci Hoberg, David B. Barry, Shane Schroeder, Mark Dickens, Richard Harding, Thomas Eckrote.(Giglio, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplement Proposed Summons