Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Stephen R Clark
Case #: 4:24-mc-08888
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Dec 28, 2023
Terminated:Dec 28, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
28 28 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Tue 08/13 9:53 AM
CJA Panel Application of James W. Schottel, Jr. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
27 27 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Wed 07/24 11:42 AM
CJA Panel Renewal Application of Susan McGraugh.(BAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
26 26 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Mon 07/22 7:56 AM
CJA Panel Renewal Application of Andrew Sottile. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
25 25 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Fri 07/19 3:29 PM
CJA Mentee Panel Application of Neil Martin Barron. (BAS)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Fri 07/19 2:56 PM
CJA Mentee Panel Application of Rachel M. Mosqueda. (BAS)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Fri 07/19 2:21 PM
CJA Mentee Panel Application of Deidre D. Jewel. (BAS)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Fri 07/19 2:19 PM
CJA Panel Application of Gregory N. Wittner. (BAS)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Fri 07/19 2:17 PM
CJA Panel Application of Charles W. Billings. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
20 20 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Thu 07/18 9:52 AM
CJA Panel Application of Brandon Lamar Jackson. (BAS)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Thu 07/18 8:55 AM
CJA Panel Renewal Application of David Bryant. (BAS)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Thu 07/18 8:52 AM
CJA Panel Renewal Application of Evan Greenberg. (BAS)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Thu 07/18 8:51 AM
CJA Panel Renewal Application of Andrew "Mick" Henderson. (BAS)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Thu 07/18 8:45 AM
CJA Panel Renewal Application of Daniel A. Juengel. (BAS)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Thu 07/18 8:43 AM
CJA Panel Renewal Application of Zachary J. Borowiak. (BAS)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Thu 07/18 8:40 AM
CJA Mentee Panel Application of Anna Lammert. (BAS)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Thu 07/18 8:39 AM
CJA Mentee Panel Application of Jordan Wellinghoff. (BAS)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Thu 07/18 8:38 AM
CJA Panel Renewal Application of Kathryn Parish. (BAS)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Thu 07/18 8:30 AM
CJA Panel Application of Michael P. O'Neill. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
10 10 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Wed 07/17 12:27 PM
CJA Mentee Panel Application of David Michael Remley. (BAS)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Wed 07/17 12:26 PM
CJA Panel Renewal Application of Cira Duffe. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
8 8 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Fri 07/05 8:08 AM
CJA Panel Renewal Application of Joseph M. Hogan. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
7 7 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Wed 07/03 9:24 AM
CJA Lead Panel Application for Nicole E. Gorovsky. (Gorovsky, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
6 6 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Tue 07/02 3:21 PM
CJA Panel Renewal Application of Steven E. Sokolik. (BAS)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Tue 07/02 3:19 PM
CJA Panel Renewal Application of Timothy J. Smith. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
4 4 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Tue 06/25 12:29 PM
CJA Panel Renewal Application of Edward K. Fehlig, Jr. (BAS)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Tue 06/25 12:28 PM
CJA Panel Renewal Application of J. Martin Hadican. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
2 2 misc CJA Panel Re-Registration / Application Wed 06/12 8:49 AM
CJA Panel Renewal Application of William Jerome Ekiss. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
1 1 cmp Miscellaneous Case (COURT USE ONLY) Thu 12/28 2:24 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER (GJL)
Related: [-]