Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 2:23-cv-02151
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Case Filed:Dec 28, 2023
Terminated:Oct 09, 2024
Case in other court:Eighth Judicial District Court Clark County Nevada, A-23-882064-C
Last checked: Saturday Jun 29, 2024 3:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Cole Custer
McDonald Carano LLP 2300 West Sahara Avenue Suite 1200
Las Vegas, NV 89102
Represented By
Karyna Armstrong
Mcdonald Carano LLP
contact info
Ryan Jefferson Works
Mcdonald Carano LLP
contact info
Defendant
Amanda Custer
McDonald Carano LLP 2300 West Sahara Avenue, Suite 1200
Las Vegas, NV 89102
Represented By
Karyna Armstrong
Mcdonald Carano LLP
contact info
Ryan Jefferson Works
Mcdonald Carano LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jen Eusterwiemann
Represented By
Karyna Armstrong
Mcdonald Carano LLP
contact info
Defendant
Joshua Eusterwiemann
Represented By
Karyna Armstrong
Mcdonald Carano LLP
contact info
Defendant
Christian Oertel
Represented By
Karyna Armstrong
Mcdonald Carano LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jemma Wilson
Represented By
Karyna Armstrong
Mcdonald Carano LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
International Markets Live, Inc.
Represented By
P. Sterling Kerr
Kerr Simpson Attorneys At Law
contact info
George E Robinson
Kerr Simpson Attorneys At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Case Wed 10/09 11:44 AM
ORDER granting27 STIPULATION TO DISMISS Case With Prejudice. Each side to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/9/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
27 27 motion Stipulation Tue 10/08 3:04 PM
STIPULATION TO DISMISS Case With Prejudice by Defendants Amanda Custer, Cole Custer, Jen Eusterwiemann, Joshua Eusterwiemann, Christian Oertel, Jemma Wilson. (Armstrong, Karyna) (dismiss)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
26 26 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Scheduling Order Tue 08/20 1:44 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Extend Discovery. Discovery due by 9/30/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/19/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
24 24 respm Reply Fri 08/09 12:28 PM
REPLY to21 Motion for Reconsideration, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Robinson, George)
Related: [-]
misc QC Notice Fri 08/09 1:44 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No.24 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (HAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
minord Minute Order Order on Motion to Reconsider Fri 08/02 11:08 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/2/2024. Order GRANTING21 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court's 20 Order is VACATED. The Clerk of Court is directed to reopen19 Motion to Extend Time. The Court construes21 Motion as an opposition to19 Motion. Plaintiff's reply is due 8/9/2024. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ANS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
22 22 misc Declaration Thu 08/01 3:37 PM
DECLARATION re21 Motion for Reconsideration, by Defendants Amanda Custer, Cole Custer, Jen Eusterwiemann, Joshua Eusterwiemann, Christian Oertel, Jemma Wilson. (Armstrong, Karyna)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Motion Reconsider Thu 08/01 3:35 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re 20 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,, Minute Order, by Defendants Amanda Custer, Cole Custer, Jen Eusterwiemann, Joshua Eusterwiemann, Christian Oertel, Jemma Wilson. Responses due by 8/15/2024. (Armstrong, Karyna) (MJorder)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
minord Minute Order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Wed 07/17 10:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/17/2024. Having shown both excusable neglect and good cause, the Court GRANTS19 Motion to Extend Time. Close of Discovery is September 30, 2024. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ANS)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
19 19 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Mon 07/15 5:18 PM
First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re15 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. Responses due by 7/29/2024. (Robinson, George) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
18 18 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 07/12 10:27 AM
ORDER Granting17 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 8/30/2024. Motions due by 9/27/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/31/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/11/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
17 17 motion Stipulation Wed 07/10 3:37 PM
First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re14 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc.. (Robinson, George) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
15 15 5 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 02/23 4:34 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Granting14 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/15/2024. Motions due by 8/14/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/23/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Fri 02/23 4:34 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
14 14 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 02/22 3:24 PM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff International Markets Live, Inc... (Robinson, George)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 02/14 2:36 PM
ORDER granting11 Stipulation of Waiver of Arbitration Provision. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/14/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
12 12 4 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/09 2:45 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Jen Eusterwiemann, Joshua Eusterwiemann, Christian Oertel, Jemma Wilson.(Armstrong, Karyna)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Stipulation Fri 02/09 2:40 PM
Joint STIPULATION of Waiver of Arbitration Provision by Defendants Amanda Custer, Cole Custer, Jen Eusterwiemann, Joshua Eusterwiemann, Christian Oertel, Jemma Wilson. (Armstrong, Karyna) (other) (nondispositive)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Acceptance of Service Fri 02/09 1:04 PM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Jemma Wilson on 2/6/2024 executed by International Markets Live, Inc. re8 Acceptance of Service. (Robinson, George)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Acceptance of Service Fri 02/09 1:03 PM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Christian Oertel on 2/6/2024 executed by International Markets Live, Inc.. (Robinson, George)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Acceptance of Service Fri 02/09 12:58 PM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Jemma Wilson on 2/6/2024 executed by International Markets Live, Inc.. (Robinson, George)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
7 7 misc Status Report Wed 01/24 2:02 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendants Amanda Custer, Cole Custer, Jen Eusterwiemann, Joshua Eusterwiemann..(Armstrong, Karyna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
6 6 4 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/17 4:40 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Amanda Custer, Cole Custer. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/27/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/2/2024.(Works, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
5 5 misc Statement in Removal Case Wed 01/03 11:51 AM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Amanda Custer, Cole Custer.. (Works, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
4 4 notice Notice Other Tue 01/02 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Compliance With The December 29, 2023 Court Minutes by Amanda Custer, Cole Custer re3 Minute Order Removal Case,.. (Works, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
3 3 2 pgs minord Minute Order Removal Case Fri 12/29 1:56 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/29/2023. By Deputy Clerk: ALZ. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/13/2024. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/28/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 12/29 1:55 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ALZ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 12/28 4:14 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cole Custer, Amanda Custer d/b/a Forex For Women or FX For Women. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Works, Ryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Petition Removal Thu 12/28 4:12 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court Clark Conty Nevada, Case Number A-23-882064-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7537816) by Amanda Custer d/b/a Forex For Women or FX For Women, Cole Custer. Proof of service due by 2/19/2024. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/7/2024. (Works, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 14 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet