South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:23-cv-06415
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jun 08, 2024 4:56 AM EDT
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
Defendant
Innotex Corp
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
Defendant
Kidde PLC
Defendant
LN Curtis & Sons
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
Defendant
Milliken & Company
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc.
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Co
Defendant
3M Company, The
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc.
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc.
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
as successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
Veridian Limited
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group
Represented By
Brandon Robert Gottschall
Sweeny Wingate And Barrow (col)
contact info
Madison Killen Kea
Sweeny Wingate And Barrow (col)
contact info
Mark V Gende
Sweeny Wingate And Barrow (col)
contact info
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256
Plaintiff
Kara Crismon
Represented By
Gary A Anderson
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info
Kevin B McKie
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
11 11 misc Status Report Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/27 8:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/27 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
7 7 misc Status Report Thu 02/15 3:29 PM
STATUS REPORT by Witmer Public Safety Group, Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Gende, Mark)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/15 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Robert Gottschall on behalf of Witmer Public Safety Group, Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Gottschall, Brandon)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/15 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Madison Claire Killen on behalf of Witmer Public Safety Group, Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Killen, Madison)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/15 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark V Gende on behalf of Witmer Public Safety Group, Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Gende, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Fri 12/29 7:13 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 12/11/2023), Kara Crimson v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-06415-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern Missouri (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 12/28 3:43 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (pcas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/28 3:42 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11472685), filed by Kara Crimson. Service due by 3/11/2024(pcas)
Related: [-]