Massachusetts District Court
Case #: 3:23-mj-03197
Case Filed:Nov 29, 2023
Last checked: Friday Dec 29, 2023 2:35 AM EST
Defendant
Daniel Tocci (1)
Represented By
Peter A. Slepchuk
Law Offices Of Peter Slepchuk Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Catherine G. Curley
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/29/2023 3:26 AM EST
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
Arrest (Rule 5) of Daniel Tocci. (Rivera, Melissa)
Related: [-]
2 2 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Daniel Tocci.(Rivera, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Redacted Statement of Facts,
Att: 2 Redacted Arrest Warrant
4 4 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered. CJA 20 as to Daniel Tocci: Appointment of Attorney Peter A. Slepchuk. (Rivera, Melissa)
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Rule 5 and 5.1 Hearings by Daniel Tocci. (Rivera, Melissa)
Related: [-]
6 6 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Daniel Tocci held on 11/29/2023. Present: AUSA Catherine G. Curley, AUSA Kathryn Bolas, Atty Peter A. Slepchuk, USPO LaValley and Deft. After reviewing the Financial Affidavit, the Court deemed it appropriate to appoint counsel. The defendant will be represented by Atty Slepchuk. A copy of the Rule 5 documents were provided and discussed with counsel. Defendant was notified of the charge(s), Rule 20 and advised as to his rights. Order pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) was read in open court and a written order shall issue. The defendant filed a Waiver of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings waiving the identity hearing and production of warrant. Based on the waiver filed and the reliable warrant made available, the Court found that Mr. Tocci is the named defendant. It is unclear at this time if the first count on the Complaint will be charged as felony (depends on the dollar amount). If it it's deemed to be a felony, the defendant is entitled to a Preliminary Hearing. He asked that the Preliminary Hearing be held in the District of Massachusetts. A Preliminary Examination is set for 12/18/2023 at 2:30 PM in Hampshire Courtroom (IN PERSON) before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. The Govt is to notify the Court as soon as possible if the first count in the Complaint is a felony or a misdemeanor. The Govt was not seeking detention. Conditions of release, as recommended by Pretrial Services, were established. See Order Setting Conditions of Release for complete details. The District of Columbia provided a date, time and video conference information for the defendant's Initial Appearance. An Initial Appearance (in the District of Columbia) is set for 12/5/2023 at 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. Video conference information provided to the defendant. (Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please email the Court at[LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/Audio.html] . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact the Court by email at mad_transcripts@mad.uscourts.gov.) (Rivera, Melissa)
Related: [-]
7 7 Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Daniel Tocci. See attached Order for complete details. (Rivera, Melissa)
Related: [-]