New York Southern District Court
Judge:Valerie E Caproni
Case #: 1:23-cv-11275
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Civil Enforcement of Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Dec 29, 2023
Terminated:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jun 30, 2024 5:00 AM EDT
Cross Claimant
ABC Construction Contracting Inc.
Represented By
Gerasimos Dimitrios Liberatos
contact info
Richard S.K. Diorio
Sitaras & Associates, PLLC
contact info
Cross Claimant
Biltmore General Contractors Inc.
Represented By
Lisa A Gutman
Rabinowitz And Galina, Esqs.
contact info
Gayle A. Rosen
Rabinowitz & Galina, Esqs.
contact info
Cross Claimant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Joanne M. Bonacci
Dreifuss, Bonacci & Parker, LLP
contact info
Margaret A Palmeri
Dreifuss, Bonacci & Parker, PC
contact info
Gayle A. Rosen
Rabinowitz & Galina, Esqs.
contact info
Cross Claimant
The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Gerasimos Dimitrios Liberatos
contact info
Richard S.K. Diorio
Sitaras & Associates, PLLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
ABC Construction Contracting Inc.
Represented By
Gerasimos Dimitrios Liberatos
contact info
Richard S.K. Diorio
Sitaras & Associates, PLLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Biltmore General Contractors Inc.
Represented By
Lisa A Gutman
Rabinowitz And Galina, Esqs.
contact info
Gayle A. Rosen
Rabinowitz & Galina, Esqs.
contact info
Cross Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Joanne M. Bonacci
Dreifuss, Bonacci & Parker, LLP
contact info
Margaret A Palmeri
Dreifuss, Bonacci & Parker, PC
contact info
Gayle A. Rosen
Rabinowitz & Galina, Esqs.
contact info
Defendant
Biltmore General Contractors Inc.
Represented By
Lisa A Gutman
Rabinowitz And Galina, Esqs.
contact info
Gayle A. Rosen
Rabinowitz & Galina, Esqs.
contact info
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Joanne M. Bonacci
Dreifuss, Bonacci & Parker, LLP
contact info
Margaret A Palmeri
Dreifuss, Bonacci & Parker, PC
contact info
Gayle A. Rosen
Rabinowitz & Galina, Esqs.
contact info
Defendant
ABC Construction Contracting Inc.
Represented By
Gerasimos Dimitrios Liberatos
contact info
Richard S.K. Diorio
Sitaras & Associates, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Gerasimos Dimitrios Liberatos
contact info
Richard S.K. Diorio
Sitaras & Associates, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York
Represented By
Marlena Smith
New York City Law Department
contact info
Maura S. Moosnick
Virginia & Ambinder LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund
Represented By
Marlena Smith
New York City Law Department
contact info
Maura S. Moosnick
Virginia & Ambinder LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund
Represented By
Marlena Smith
New York City Law Department
contact info
Maura S. Moosnick
Virginia & Ambinder LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
72 72 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 05/02 2:30 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiffs, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Trustees of the New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, and the Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York and Defendants Biltmore General Contractors Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, ABC Construction Contracting Inc. and the Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, through their undersigned counsel, that whereas no party hereto is an infant, incompetent person, or conservatee, the above-captioned action is hereby dismissed with prejudice, without cost to any party as against the other, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that this Stipulation may be executed in facsimile and/or electronically scanned counterparts and may be filed without further notice with the Clerk of Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/2/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
71 71 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Thu 05/01 3:53 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Moosnick, Maura)
Related: [-]