Marshall Turman v. The Abyssinian Baptist Church et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Dale E Ho |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-11304 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Dec 29, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 12, 2024 3:48 AM EST |
Defendant
Valerie S. Grant
|
|
Defendant
The Abyssinian Baptist Church
|
|
Plaintiff
Eboni Marshall Turman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, May 10, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
23
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Fri 05/10 8:42 AM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Stay of Discovery . . Document filed by Eboni Marshall Turman..(Stark, Corey) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Fri 04/19 7:08 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Stay of Discovery . . Document filed by Valerie S. Grant, The Abyssinian Baptist Church..(Tebele, Jacob) |
|
18 | 18
2
pgs
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Fri 04/19 7:07 PM
DECLARATION of Brian Pete, Esq. in Support re:17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Stay of Discovery .. Document filed by Valerie S. Grant, The Abyssinian Baptist Church..(Tebele, Jacob) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Abyssinian Bylaws | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Fri 04/19 7:04 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Stay of Discovery . Document filed by Valerie S. Grant, The Abyssinian Baptist Church..(Tebele, Jacob) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 04/01 5:07 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application GRANTED. The parties shall brief Defendants' contemplated motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint in accordance with their proposed schedule. In light of Defendants' representation that they intend to file a new motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint, Defendants' motion to dismiss the Complaint (and for a stay of proceedings pending resolution of that motion) is DENIED, as moot. So Ordered. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motions at ECF Nos. 10 and 15.. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 4/1/2024) (ks) |
|
15 | 15
2
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 04/01 11:26 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File amended Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Dale E. Ho from Jacob Tebele, Esq. and Brian Pete, Esq. dated 04/01/2024. Document filed by Valerie S. Grant, The Abyssinian Baptist Church..(Tebele, Jacob) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 04/01 5:08 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 4/19/2024. Responses due by 5/10/2024 Replies due by 5/24/2024. (ks) |
||
Sunday, March 24, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
14
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Sun 03/24 8:19 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Valerie S. Grant, The Abyssinian Baptist Church with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Eboni Marshall Turman. Related document:1 Complaint..(Stark, Corey) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Amended Complaint (Redlined) | ||
Tuesday, March 05, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 03/05 12:32 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file any amended complaint by March 25, 2024. Any amended complaint shall be filed with a redline showing all differences between the original and revised filing. If Plaintiff does amend, Plaintiff shall file a letter on ECF, not to exceed two pages, regarding the stay of discovery by March 25, 2024. Such letter shall either state that Plaintiff consents to the stay or shall explain why the motion to stay should be denied. If Plaintiff does amend, by April 5, 2024, the Moving Defendants shall: (1) file an answer; (2) file a new motion to dismiss; or (3) file a letter on ECF stating that they rely on the previously filed motion to dismiss. If the Moving Defendants file an answer or a new motion to dismiss, the Court will deny the previously filed motion to dismiss as moot. If the Moving Defendants file a new motion to dismiss or indicate that they rely on their previously filed motion to dismiss, any opposition shall be filed by April 19, 2024, and any reply shall be filed by April 26, 2024. If Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint, Plaintiff shall file any opposition to the motion to dismiss by March 25, 2024. Plaintiff's opposition shall address the motion to stay discovery. The Moving Defendants' reply shall be filed by April 3, 2024. The initial pretrial conference and requirement to submit a joint status letter and proposed case management plan are ADJOURNED, pending further order of the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 3/5/2024) ( Amended Pleadings due by 3/25/2024., Motions due by 4/5/2024., Responses due by 4/19/2024, Replies due by 4/26/2024.) (ks) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
28
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Mon 03/04 9:09 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Stay of Discovery . . Document filed by Valerie S. Grant, The Abyssinian Baptist Church..(Pete, Brian) |
|
11 | 11
2
pgs
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Mon 03/04 9:08 PM
DECLARATION of Brian Pete in Support re:10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Stay of Discovery .. Document filed by Valerie S. Grant, The Abyssinian Baptist Church..(Pete, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-By-Laws | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Mon 03/04 9:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Stay of Discovery . Document filed by Valerie S. Grant, The Abyssinian Baptist Church..(Pete, Brian) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/04 8:10 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacob Tebele on behalf of Valerie S. Grant, The Abyssinian Baptist Church..(Tebele, Jacob) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/04 8:08 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Pete on behalf of Valerie S. Grant, The Abyssinian Baptist Church..(Pete, Brian) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 01/04 10:32 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Valerie S. Grant waiver sent on 1/3/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. Document filed by Eboni Marshall Turman..(Stark, Corey) |
|
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 01/04 10:30 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The Abyssinian Baptist Church waiver sent on 1/3/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. Document filed by Eboni Marshall Turman..(Stark, Corey) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Wed 01/03 5:01 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/13/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale E. Ho. The conference will be held via Microsoft Teams. The parties should dial in by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 453 099 7, followed by the pound (#) sign. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 1/3/2024) (ks) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/02 2:36 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Valerie S. Grant, The Abyssinian Baptist Church. (vf) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Tue 01/02 1:58 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Corey Scott Stark. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 01/02 2:00 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Dale E. Ho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 01/02 2:01 PM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 01/02 2:01 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Friday, December 29, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 12/29 4:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stark, Corey) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 12/29 3:59 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Abyssinian Baptist Church and Valerie S. Grant, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Eboni Marshall Turman..(Stark, Corey) |
|
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/29 3:58 PM
COMPLAINT against Valerie S. Grant, The Abyssinian Baptist Church. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28751997)Document filed by Eboni Marshall Turman..(Stark, Corey) |