Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Halil S Ozerden
Referred: Robert P Myers, Jr
Case #: 1:23-cv-00375
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 29, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jun 29, 2024 4:28 AM CDT
Defendant
Pascagoula Gautier School District
Plaintiff
Anne' McMillion
P. O. Box 8059
Moss Point, MS 39562


Docket last updated: 86 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
27 27 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 04/22 12:18 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re26 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Witness filed by Pascagoula Gautier School District (Sessoms, Alexander)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Exclude Tue 04/22 12:17 PM
MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Witness by Pascagoula Gautier School District(Sessoms, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
25 25 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 04/08 6:55 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pascagoula Gautier School District (Sessoms, Alexander)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Summary Judgment Tue 04/08 6:53 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Pascagoula Gautier School District(Sessoms, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Deposition,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Photographs,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - 3/9/23 Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Tamesha Ard,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Cynthia Vaxter,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Malika Keys,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Kimberly Brammer,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Affidavit of Brandi Honore',
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Affidavit of Dr. Elizabeth Bailey,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Determination & Notice of Rights Form,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - Cell Phone Policy
Thursday, April 03, 2025
notice Notice of Calendar Setting Thu 04/03 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Calendar Setting: Reminder of the settlement conference previously set for 6/5/2025 09:30 AM in Courtroom 881 (Gulfport) before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. Counsel are instructed to submit to Judge Myers, seven (7) days prior to the conference, a memorandum (3-page maximum in PDF format) setting forth a brief explanation of the case, and a candid appraisal of their respective positions, including possible settlement figures. This document is NOT to be exchanged and will be viewed only by the Court. The settlement memoranda should be sent to Judge Myers via e-mail (myers_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov). LOCAL COUNSEL, LEAD COUNSEL AND PARTIES WITH FULL SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY MUST BE PHYSICALLY PRESENT AT THE CONFERENCE (INCLUDING INSURANCE CARRIERS WHO HAVE AUTHORITY). Company policies limiting or prohibiting travel will no longer be accepted as a valid excuse for a corporate representative's failure to personally appear at the settlement conference. FAILURE TO APPEAR MAY RESULT IN SANCTIONS. (SR)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
23 23 order Protective Order Fri 02/07 11:20 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on February 7, 2025 (SK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
misc Docket Annotation Wed 02/05 8:10 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #22. Attorney is advised to type in the deponent's name when docketing a notice of deposition in future filings. (wld)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
22 22 discov Notice to Take Deposition Tue 02/04 3:17 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition by Pascagoula Gautier School District (Sessoms, Alexander)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 02/04 2:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr: TELEPHONIC Status Conference held on 2/4/2025 with attorneys Catouche J. L. Body and Alexander Kelly Sessoms, III. Discovery is proceeding. Defendant will submit a revised agreed protective order for the Courts approval. (SR)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
21 21 motion Protective Order Fri 01/24 10:43 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Pascagoula Gautier School District (Sessoms, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
minutes Telephonic Discovery Conference Thu 12/19 10:55 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 12/19/2024 with attorneys Catouche J. L. Body and Alexander Kelly Sessoms, III. Plaintiff shall provide discovery responses on or before Monday, December 23, 2024. The Court will conduct a telephonic status call on Tuesday, February 4, 2025, at 1:30 pm. (SR)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 12/19 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 2/4/2025 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. Defendant will place the telephone call to Judge Myers' chambers with all necessary counsel on the line. (SR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
notice Notice of Hearing Tue 12/17 1:41 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Discovery Conference set for 12/19/2024 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. Defendant will place the telephone call to Judge Myers' chambers with all necessary counsel on the line. (SR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
20 20 discov Notice of Service of Designation of Experts Tue 12/03 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Pascagoula Gautier School District (Sessoms, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
19 19 3 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 11/06 2:44 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re18 MOTION to Strike17 Notice of Service of Designation of Experts filed by Pascagoula Gautier School District (Sessoms, Alexander)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Strike Wed 11/06 2:43 PM
MOTION to Strike17 Notice of Service of Designation of Experts by Pascagoula Gautier School District (Sessoms, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
misc Docket Annotation Tue 11/05 9:15 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #17. Actual designation of experts are not to be filed with the Court. Only a Notice of Service of Designation of Experts is to be filed with the court. Attorney is directed to correct the error by refiling the correct document. (wld)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
17 17 discov Notice of Service of Designation of Experts Mon 11/04 10:31 PM
NOTICE of Service of Designation of Experts by Anne' McMillion (Body, Catouche)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
order Order on Motion to Compel Wed 10/16 2:03 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER withdrawing15 Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures. Defendant has filed a notice16 withdrawing the motion to compel. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on October 16, 2024 (SK)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
16 16 notice Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY Mon 10/14 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion to Comepl by Pascagoula Gautier School District re15 MOTION to Compel Initial Disclosures (Sessoms, Alexander)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Compel Mon 10/14 12:03 PM
MOTION to Compel Initial Disclosures by Pascagoula Gautier School District(Sessoms, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Emails
Thursday, September 19, 2024
14 14 discov Notice of Service of Request for Production Thu 09/19 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Service of First Set of Request for Production by Pascagoula Gautier School District (Sessoms, Alexander)
Related: [-]
13 13 discov Notice of Service of Interrogatories Thu 09/19 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Service of First Set of Interrogatories by Pascagoula Gautier School District (Sessoms, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
12 12 order Case Management Order Wed 09/04 3:20 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Disclosure due by 9/9/2024. Jury Trial set during a three-week term of court beginning on 10/14/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 806 (Gulfport) before District Judge Halil S. Ozerden. Pretrial Conference set for 9/16-18/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 806 (Gulfport) before District Judge Halil S. Ozerden. Discovery due by 4/8/2025. Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 10/4/2024. Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 10/4/2024. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 11/4/2024. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 12/4/2024. Motions due by 4/22/2025. Settlement Conference set for 6/5/2025 09:30 AM in Courtroom 881 (Gulfport) before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. ADR Report due by 9/9/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/16/2025. EDT: 3 days. Parties do not consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 9/4/2024 (SR)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephonic Case Management Conference Wed 09/04 3:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 9/4/2024 with attorneys Catouche J. L. Body and Alexander Kelly Sessoms, III. (SR)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/30 7:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Catouche J. L. Body on behalf of Anne' McMillion (Body, Catouche)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
10 10 discov Notice of Service of Disclosure Wed 08/28 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Service of Rule 26 Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Pascagoula Gautier School District (Sessoms, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
9 9 notice Rule 16(a) Initial Order Mon 07/22 3:08 PM
Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2024 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers Jr. (SR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
8 8 service Certificate of Service Thu 07/18 2:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pascagoula Gautier School District re7 Answer to Complaint (Sessoms, Alexander)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Thu 07/18 11:16 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 7. A certificate of service is required in a case that involves a pro se party that receives filings by U.S. mail. Attorney should prepare a Certificate of Service as to document # 7 and file it under the "Service of Process" category and link it to document # 7. All future filings should have a Certificate of Service attached. (JCH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/16 2:33 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Pascagoula Gautier School District.(Sessoms, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/01 2:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Pascagoula Gautier School District served on 6/26/2024, answer due 7/17/2024. (JCH)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 06/24 11:07 AM
Summons Issued as to Pascagoula Gautier School District. (JCH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order Wed 06/12 11:10 AM
ORDER: Ordered that the Clerk of Court shall mail to Plaintiff the appropriate summons forms. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on 6/12/24. (JCH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
minutes Omnibus Hearing Wed 06/05 10:30 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr: Omnibus Hearing held on 6/5/2024. Plaintiff was placed under oath. The Court screened plaintiff's claims. APPEARANCES: Anne' McMillion (Plaintiff), S. King (Law Clerk), E. Acosta (CSO), and Court Reporter/Transcriber G. Chambless, Telephone Number: 601-255-6432, E-mail: gabrielle_chambless@mssd.uscourts.gov. (SR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 03/28 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Omnibus Hearing set for 6/5/2024 09:30 AM, United States District Court, Dan M. Russell, Jr., United States Courthouse, 2012 15th Street, Gulfport, MS 39501 in Courtroom 881 (Gulfport) before Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. (SR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
3 3 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 03/26 2:26 PM
ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Staying Service of Process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on March 26, 2024 (SK)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 12/29 4:31 PM
*RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Anne' McMillion (RLW)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/29 4:26 PM
COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against Pascagoula Gautier School District, filed by Anne' McMillion (RLW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A - Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 2 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Notice of Assignment